This case was last updated from PACER on 09/26/2020 at 07:37:11 (UTC).

Lock Logistics, LLC v. Harun Transportation, Inc.

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 Lock Logistics, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Harun Transportation, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William O. Bertelsman and Candace J. Smith. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00136

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William O. Bertelsman

Referral Judge

Candace J. Smith

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lock Logistics, LLC

Defendant

Harun Transportation, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicole M. Lundrigan

Attorney at Lundrigan Law Group CO, LPA

1080 Nimitzview Drive, Suite 402

Cincinnati, OH 45230

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Lundrigan, Nicole. #1 Complaint has been filed by Lock Logistics, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SLG) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#3

(#3) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings is required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William 0. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 06/18/2020.(SLG)cc: COR (Entered: 09/25/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit A - Contract

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4785326), filed by Lock Logistics, LLC.(SLG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Contract) (SLG). Modified on 9/25/2020 (SLG). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY TO Lundrigan, Nicole re #1 Complaint attorney notified clerk the summons should be returned via Secretary of State; however, a prepared summons was not attached to the electronic filing of the complaint in the fictitious miscellaneous case number 20-99999. A summons may beissued by presenting the prepared summons to the Clerk for issuance onpaper or by electronically filing a document entitled Notice of Filing with theprepared summons as an attachment within 7 calendar days. cc: COR (SLG) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Lundrigan, Nicole. #1 Complaint has been filed by Lock Logistics, LLC without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (SLG) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, hold hearings is required, and rule on nondispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of court to the undersigned. Subject to other provisions of law, the final pretrial conference and trial will be before the undersigned, unless the parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Signed by Judge William 0. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 06/18/2020.(SLG)cc: COR (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketConflict Check run. (SLG) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4785326), filed by Lock Logistics, LLC.(SLG) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/25/2020: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Contract) (SLG). Modified on 9/25/2020 (SLG). (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less