This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2019 at 07:46:14 (UTC).

Locati Architects, LLC et al v. Nolte

Case Summary

On 07/17/2019 Locati Architects, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Nolte. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Sam E Haddon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00032

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sam E Haddon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Locati Architects, LLC

Locati Enterprises, Inc.

Defendant

Abraham Boone Nolte

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel J. Frederick

Attorney at CROWLEY FLECK, PLLP - BOZEMAN

1915 South 19Th Avenue, Po Box 10969

Bozeman, MT 59719-0969

Robert C. Griffin

Attorney at CROWLEY FLECK PLLP - BILLINGS

490 North 31St Street, Suite 500, Po Box 2529

Billings, MT 59103-2529

Defendant Attorneys

James Devlan Geddes

Attorney at GOETZ, BALDWIN & GEDDES, P.C.

35 North Grand, Po Box 6580

Bozeman, MT 59771-6580

Trent M. Gardner

Attorney at GOETZ, BALDWIN & GEDDES, P.C.

35 North Grand, Po Box 6580

Bozeman, MT 59771-6580

 

Court Documents

#11

10 #2

Exhibit B - File Theft Structure

10 #1

Exhibit A - Non - Disclosure Agreement and Receipt of Acknowledgment

#10

#9

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

civil cover sheet

1 #2

Ex B - Defendant File Theft Structure

1 #1

Ex A - Non-Disclosure Agreement

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDERED: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss and for a More Definite Statement are DENIED as MOOT. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 9/9/2019. (HEG) (Entered: 09/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) AMENDED COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Abraham Boone Nolte, filed by Locati Architects, LLC, Locati Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Non - Disclosure Agreement and Receipt of Acknowledgment, #2 Exhibit B - File Theft Structure) (Griffin, Robert) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT Responses due by 9/5/2019. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/28/2019. (HEG) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendant's Motion for More Definite Statement Robert C. Griffin appearing for Plaintiffs Locati Architects, LLC, Locati Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Griffin, Robert) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Robert C. Griffin on behalf of Locati Architects, LLC, Locati Enterprises, Inc. (Griffin, Robert) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM AND FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT filed by Abraham Boone Nolte. (Geddes, James) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM, MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT. James Devlan Geddes appearing for Defendant Abraham Boone Nolte (Geddes, James). (Added additional motion event.) (NOS) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) AO 121 Copyright form transmitted to the U.S. Copyright Office. Original to filer. (AEC) (Entered: 08/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Abraham Boone Nolte on 7/26/19 , filed by Locati Architects, LLC, Locati Enterprises, Inc. (Frederick, Samuel) (Modified to amend docket text.) (NOS) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Abraham Boone Nolte. Original picked up at Butte counter. (ASG) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Filing fee: $400.00 paid, receipt number 0977-2338069. (ASG) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Locati Architects, LLC and Locati Enterprises, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Ex A - Non-Disclosure Agreement, #2 Ex B - Defendant File Theft Structure, #3 civil cover sheet) (ASG) (Entered: 07/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert C. Griffin