This case was last updated from PACER on 09/05/2020 at 11:41:54 (UTC).

Locastro v. Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.

Case Summary

On 07/07/2020 Locastro filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores East, L P. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Charmiane G. Claxton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-02487

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Samuel H. Mays, Jr

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tian Locastro

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant

Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.

Not Classified By Court

Temiika Gipson

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Elaine Sheng

Attorney at MORGAN AND MORGAN

One Commerce Square, Suite 2600

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorneys

Russell E. Reviere

Attorney at RAINEY KIZER REVIERE & BELL, PLC - Jackson

209 E. Main Street, P.O. Box 1147

Jackson, TN 38302-1147

Bailey L. Walden

Attorney at RAINEY KIZER REVIERE & BELL, PLC

650 N. Front Street, Ste. 610

Memphis, TN 38103

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. Service of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Tian Locastro (Walden, Bailey) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

#15

(#15) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 9/20/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr.; Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 9/10/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr.; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/3/2021. (jam) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#14

(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: The following ddls/scheds were established: join parties ddl 10/12/20; amend pleadings ddl 10/12/20; ADR/Mediation ddl 04/16/21; complete all discovery 04/02/21; expert disclosure for pltfs ddl 02/01/21 and 03/03/21 for deft; supplementation ddl 04/02/21; document production, interrogatories and request for admissions ddl 04/02/21; dispositive motions ddl 05/03/21; Jury Trial set Monday, 09/20/2021 at 9:30 a.m. (est. 2-3 days); Pretrial Conference set Friday, 09/10/2021 at 9:30 A.M.; Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due 09/03/2021. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 08/14/20. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE by Tian Locastro Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Sheng, Elaine) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

#11

(#11) NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures (Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#10

(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

#9

(#9) SETTING LETTER: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 01:45 PM before Judge Samuel H. Mays Jr.(der) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/15/2020) (der). (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/16/2020) (ebk). (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Bailey L. Walden on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Walden, Bailey) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#3

(#3) Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (agj) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. for Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P... (Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-2201-20 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3382789), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. Service of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Tian Locastro (Walden, Bailey) (Entered: 08/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial set for Monday, 9/20/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr.; Pretrial Conference set for Friday, 9/10/2021 at 9:30 AM before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr.; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/3/2021. (jam) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SCHEDULING ORDER: The following ddls/scheds were established: join parties ddl 10/12/20; amend pleadings ddl 10/12/20; ADR/Mediation ddl 04/16/21; complete all discovery 04/02/21; expert disclosure for pltfs ddl 02/01/21 and 03/03/21 for deft; supplementation ddl 04/02/21; document production, interrogatories and request for admissions ddl 04/02/21; dispositive motions ddl 05/03/21; Jury Trial set Monday, 09/20/2021 at 9:30 a.m. (est. 2-3 days); Pretrial Conference set Friday, 09/10/2021 at 9:30 A.M.; Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due 09/03/2021. Signed by Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. on 08/14/20. (Mays, Samuel) (Entered: 08/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • Docket(#13) MINUTES: TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 08/13/2020 before Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr. Atty Elaine Sheng appeared for the pltf; Atty Bailey Walden appeared for the deft. Proposed scheduling order was adopted. The following ddls/scheds were established: join parties ddl 10/12/20; amend pleadings ddl 10/12/20; ADR/Mediation ddl 04/16/21; complete all discovery 04/02/21; expert disclosure for pltfs ddl 02/01/21 and 03/03/21 for deft; supplementation ddl 04/02/21; document production, interrogatories and request for admissions ddl 04/02/21; dispositive motions ddl 05/03/21; Jury Trial set Monday, 09/20/2021 at 9:30 a.m. (est. 2-3 days); Pretrial Conference set Friday, 09/10/2021 at 9:30 A.M.; Joint Proposed Pretrial Order due 09/03/2021. (Court Reporter: Mark Dodson) (jam) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE by Tian Locastro Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures (Sheng, Elaine) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. of Service of Defendant's Initial Disclosures (Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting . (Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 08/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SETTING LETTER: TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 8/13/2020 at 01:45 PM before Judge Samuel H. Mays Jr.(der) (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/15/2020) (der). (Main Document 9 replaced on 7/16/2020) (ebk). (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Answer, Affirmative Defenses, and Jury Demand of Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East, LP by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P..(Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Bailey L. Walden on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. (Walden, Bailey) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (agj) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (agj) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (agj) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Judge Samuel H. Mays, Jr and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (agj) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. for Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P... (Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P. from Shelby County Circuit Court, case number CT-2201-20 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-3382789), filed by Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Reviere, Russell) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elaine Sheng