This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/17/2021 at 08:02:54 (UTC).

Lobbin et al v. Target Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/18/2021 Lobbin filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Target Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Anthony J. Battaglia, Barbara Lynn Major, Todd W. Robinson and Jill L. Burkhardt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01785

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Anthony J. Battaglia

Todd W. Robinson

Referral Judges

Barbara Lynn Major

Jill L. Burkhardt

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Stephen M. Lobbin

La Jolla, CA 92037

SML Avvocati P.C.

Defendants

Target Corporation

Kmart Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Stephen M. Lobbin

Attorney at SML Avvocati P.C.

888 Prospect Streetsuite 200

La Jolla, CA 92037

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#4

(#4) ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major for all further proceedings. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia, Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:15-cv-01411-TWR-BLM. The new case number is 3:21-cv-01785-TWR-BLM. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/1/2021. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 11/30/2021.(jrm) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/09/2021
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major is no longer assigned per Minute Order of Recusal ECF. No. 3 . Case reassigned back to Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21-cv-1785-TWR-JLB.(no document attached) (dsn) (Entered: 12/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Todd W. Robinson and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major for all further proceedings. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia, Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:15-cv-01411-TWR-BLM. The new case number is 3:21-cv-01785-TWR-BLM. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 12/1/2021. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 11/30/2021.(jrm) (Entered: 12/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt for all further proceedings. The new case number is 21cv1785-AJB-JLB.(no document attached) (ggv) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (axc) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Target Corporation, Kmart Corporation ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16229883.), filed by Stephen M. Lobbin, SML Avvocati P.C.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:21-cv-1785-AJB-BLM. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Lobbin, Stephen)(axc) Modified on 10/20/2021 to correct filed date to date all documents received, NEF regenerated (rmc). (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KMART CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Target Corporation, a Minnesota corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen M. Lobbin