This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2021 at 09:17:09 (UTC).

Lobato v. Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 Lobato filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert E. Blackburn and Kathleen M. Tafoya. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02699

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert E. Blackburn

Referral Judge

Kathleen M. Tafoya

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Lobato

Defendant

Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Colin V. McIver

Attorney at Zaner Harden Law LLP

1610 Wynkoop Street, Suite 120

Denver, CO 80202

Marc Philip Harden

Attorney at Zaner Harden Law LLP

1610 Wynkoop Street, Suite 120

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Winslow Russell Taylor, III

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

Kurt Hans Henkel

Attorney at Tucker Holmes PC

7400 East Caley Avenue, Quebec Centre Ii

Centennial, CO 80111-6714

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#17

(#17) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Colin V. McIver on behalf of Christopher LobatoAttorney Colin V. McIver added to party Christopher Lobato(pty:pla) (McIver, Colin) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marc Philip Harden on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Marc Philip Harden added to party Christopher Lobato(pty:pla) (Harden, Marc) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/1/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/7/2021. (evaug ) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

#12

(#12) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#11

(#11) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Notice of Dismissal of Defendant Cesar De Avila by El Paso County District Judge Eric Bentley, on September 8, 2021 by Plaintiff Christopher Lobato. (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#10

(#10) ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#9

(#9) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by El Paso County District Judge Eric Bentley, on August 30,2021 by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint and Jury Demand upon Allstate Insurance on 6/21/21 (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#7

(#7) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal Of Defendant AmGuard Insurance Company Pursuant to CRCP 42(a)(1)(A) by El Paso County District Judge Eric Bentley, on August 8, 2021, by Plaintiff Christopher Lobato. (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#6

(#6) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Defendant AmGaurd Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time By El Paso County District Judge Eric Bentley, on July 23, 2021 by Defendant Amguard Insurance Company. (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#5

(#5) CIVIL COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Amguard Insurance Company, Cesar De Avila, filed by Christopher Lobato.(norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

#2

1 #12

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit G

1 #5

Exhibit D

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Colin V. McIver on behalf of Christopher LobatoAttorney Colin V. McIver added to party Christopher Lobato(pty:pla) (McIver, Colin) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Marc Philip Harden on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Marc Philip Harden added to party Christopher Lobato(pty:pla) (Harden, Marc) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER Proposed Scheduling Order due 12/1/2021. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/7/2021. (evaug ) (Entered: 10/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docket(#13) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b), enter a Scheduling Order that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders as appropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, further that the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of Judge Blackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred, subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referred as defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/6/21. Text Only Entry (rebsec) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Notice of Dismissal of Defendant Cesar De Avila by El Paso County District Judge Eric Bentley, on September 8, 2021 by Plaintiff Christopher Lobato. (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ANSWER to #5 Complaint by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company.(norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer by El Paso County District Judge Eric Bentley, on August 30,2021 by Defendant Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint and Jury Demand upon Allstate Insurance on 6/21/21 (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Notice of Dismissal Of Defendant AmGuard Insurance Company Pursuant to CRCP 42(a)(1)(A) by El Paso County District Judge Eric Bentley, on August 8, 2021, by Plaintiff Christopher Lobato. (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATE COURT ORDER Granting Defendant AmGaurd Insurance Company's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time By El Paso County District Judge Eric Bentley, on July 23, 2021 by Defendant Amguard Insurance Company. (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CIVIL COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company, Amguard Insurance Company, Cesar De Avila, filed by Christopher Lobato.(norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • Docket(#3) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, ) (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Winslow Russell Taylor, III on behalf of Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Winslow Russell Taylor, III added to party Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Taylor, Winslow) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company from El Paso County, Case Number 2021CV030845. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-8110165), filed by Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N)(Henkel, Kurt) (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Allstate Fire and Casualty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Winslow Russell Taylor, III

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kurt Hans Henkel