This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/22/2022 at 08:15:52 (UTC).

Loadholt v. HSN, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 Loadholt filed a Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination lawsuit against HSN, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lorna G. Schofield. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-04231

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lorna G. Schofield

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Christopher Loadholt

Defendant

HSN, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Yitzchak Zelman

Attorney at Marcus & Zelman, LLC

701 Cookman Avenue, Suite 300

Asbury Park, NJ 07712

Defendant Attorneys

Douglas T. Schwarz

Attorney at Morgan Lewis & Bockius, LLP (NY)

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

Michael Friel Fleming

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP (New York)

101 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10178

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against HSN, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26185894)Document filed by Christopher Loadholt..(Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HSN, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Loadholt..(Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HSN, Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. HSN, Inc. served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. Service was accepted by Cierra Young, Clerk. Document filed by Christopher Loadholt..(Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas T. Schwarz on behalf of HSN, Inc...(Schwarz, Douglas) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Friel Fleming on behalf of HSN, Inc...(Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#8

(#8) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint to July 27, 2022 addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Michael F. Fleming dated June 22, 2022. Document filed by HSN, Inc...(Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint to July 27, 2022 addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Michael F. Fleming dated June 22, 2022. Application GRANTED. Defendant shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint by July 27, 2022 HSN, Inc. answer due 7/27/2022. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/22/2022) (mml) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER: Initial Conference by telephone set for 8/10/2022 at 4:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/24/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER: Initial Conference by telephone set for 8/10/2022 at 4:20 PM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. The parties shall call (888) 363-4749 and enter the access code 558-3333. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/24/2022) (vfr) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint to July 27, 2022 addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Michael F. Fleming dated June 22, 2022. Application GRANTED. Defendant shall answer, move or otherwise respond to the Complaint by July 27, 2022 HSN, Inc. answer due 7/27/2022. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/22/2022) (mml) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint to July 27, 2022 addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Michael F. Fleming dated June 22, 2022. Document filed by HSN, Inc...(Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Friel Fleming on behalf of HSN, Inc...(Fleming, Michael) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas T. Schwarz on behalf of HSN, Inc...(Schwarz, Douglas) (Entered: 06/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. HSN, Inc. served on 6/6/2022, answer due 6/27/2022. Service was accepted by Cierra Young, Clerk. Document filed by Christopher Loadholt..(Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 06/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to HSN, Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah L. Cave is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vf) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(vf) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Yitzchak Zelman. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code XX Out of State. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Bronx. (vf) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to HSN, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christopher Loadholt..(Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against HSN, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26185894)Document filed by Christopher Loadholt..(Zelman, Yitzchak) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less