This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 05:13:07 (UTC).

Lo v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Finance - Consumer Credit case was filed by Lo against Experian Information Solutions, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00606

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Sheri Polster Chappell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chuilin Lo

Defendant

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #6

Exhibit F

#22

(#22) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

#21

(#21) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#20

(#20) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantage Score Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#18

(#18) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

16 #1

Exhibit 1 - Case Management Report

#16

(#16) Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Case Management Report)(Ruiz, Maria) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 10/07/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER GOVERNING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/27/2019. (jmc) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

#12

(#13) ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Substitute Exhibit. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove Exhibit I of the Verified Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial (Doc. [1-9)) from the docket. The Clerk of Court is directed to substitute Exhibit I of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Substitute Exhibit (Doc. [12-1]) in place of the removed Exhibit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/25/2019. (NM) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate Vantage Score Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. Related case(s): yes (Ruiz, Maria) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 10/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Joint Motion to Appear Telephonically at Case Management Conference. The parties may finalize their Case Management Report via telephone. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 10/8/2019. (NM) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Joint MOTION to Appear Telephonically by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Case Management Report)(Ruiz, Maria) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 10/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER GOVERNING PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/27/2019. (jmc) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • (#14) NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 11:00 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 C before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties shall file a joint Case Management Report no later than 11/4/2019. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held.(jmc) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ENDORSED ORDER granting #12 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Substitute Exhibit. The Clerk of Court is directed to remove Exhibit I of the Verified Complaint and Demand for Jury Trial (Doc. [1-9)) from the docket. The Clerk of Court is directed to substitute Exhibit I of Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Substitute Exhibit (Doc. [12-1]) in place of the removed Exhibit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 9/25/2019. (NM) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Ruiz, Maria) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RETURN of service executed on 8/28/2019 by Chuilin Lo as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Interested persons order by Chuilin Lo. (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of pendency of related cases re #5 Related case order and track 2 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Chuilin Lo. Related case(s): yes (LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) INTERESTED PERSONS ORDER Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement due by 9/10/2019. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/27/2019. (jmc) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Notice of pendency of other actions due by 9/10/2019. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 8/27/2019. (jmc) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING ORDER: Filing of documents that exceed twenty-five pages. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 8/22/2019. (MLJ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (MLJ) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • (#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:19-cv-606-FtM-38MRM. (SJB) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Experian Information Solutions, Inc. with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15836180) filed by Chuilin Lo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Exhibit I)(LoTempio, Joseph) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.