This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2019 at 12:06:52 (UTC).

LM Insurance Corporation v. J.C.B. Roofing-II, Inc.

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 LM Insurance Corporation filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against J C B Roofing-II, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William T. Moore, Jr and Christopher L. Ray. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00067

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William T. Moore, Jr

Referral Judge

Christopher L. Ray

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LM Insurance Corporation

Defendant

J.C.B. Roofing-II, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Megan H. Lane

Attorney at Howard & Whatley, PC

P.O. Box 10225

Savannah, GA 31412

Scott J. Crosby

Attorney at Burch, Porter & Johnson, PLLC

130 N. Court Avenue

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorney

R. Jonathan Hart

Attorney at Hart & Associates Law Firm, LLC

6349 Abercorn Street, Suite D

Savannah, GA 31405

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MOTION for Leave of Absence as to LM Insurance Corporation for dates of : 09/23/2019 - 01/02/2020 by LM Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 7/25/2019. (Lane, Megan) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Restriction/Return of Discovery Related Materials as to LM Insurance Corporation - re 10 Notice (Other). (cmr) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Crosby, Scott) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

7 #2

Text of Proposed Order

7 #1

Supplement

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2612747, Fee Amount $200, by LM Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Crosby, Scott) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint by J.C.B. Roofing-II, Inc..(Hart, R.) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

#4

(#4) GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/29/19. (jrb) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to J.C.B. Roofing-II, Inc. (jrb) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

#2

(#2) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by LM Insurance Corporation. (jrb) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against J.C.B. Roofing-II, Inc., filed by LM Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jrb) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #12 MOTION for Leave of Absence as to LM Insurance Corporation for dates of : 09/23/2019 - 01/02/2020. (loh) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION for Leave of Absence as to LM Insurance Corporation for dates of : 09/23/2019 - 01/02/2020 by LM Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 7/25/2019. (Lane, Megan) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Restriction/Return of Discovery Related Materials as to LM Insurance Corporation - re 10 Notice (Other). (cmr) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Crosby, Scott) (Entered: 06/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 05/29/19. (sff) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED: #7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2612747, Fee Amount $200. (trb) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Receipt Number 113J-2612747, Fee Amount $200, by LM Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 6/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Crosby, Scott) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to Complaint by J.C.B. Roofing-II, Inc..(Hart, R.) (Entered: 05/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • (#5) Notice to All Counsel of Record : Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray has updated the Standard Procedures for Discovery Disputes and Settlement Conferences, Notice of Discovery Dispute Form and Request for Settlement Conference Form. #CLICK HERE TO READ. (jrb) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher L. Ray on 3/29/19. (jrb) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to J.C.B. Roofing-II, Inc. (jrb) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • Filing fee: $400.00, receipt number 113J-2570736. (jrb) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by LM Insurance Corporation. (jrb) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against J.C.B. Roofing-II, Inc., filed by LM Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jrb) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less