This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/15/2021 at 12:43:51 (UTC).

LM General Insurance Company v. Moore et al

Case Summary

On 11/16/2020 LM General Insurance Company filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Moore. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gregory F. VanTatenhove and Edward B. Atkins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00074

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gregory F. VanTatenhove

Referral Judge

Edward B. Atkins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LM General Insurance Company

Defendants

Dennis G. Moore, Jr.

MC Express, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey E. Hiatt

Attorney at Barber, Banaszynski & Hiatt, P.S.C.

802 Lily Creek Road, Suite 101

Louisville, KY 40243

Defendant Attorneys

Lee A. Rosenthal

Attorney at Casey, Bailey & Maines, PLLC

3151 Beaumont Centre Circle, Suite 200

Lexington, KY 40513

Sarah E. Boggs

Attorney at Casey, Bailey & Maines, PLLC

3151 Beaumont Centre Circle, Suite 200

Lexington, KY 40513

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A - Process and Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit B - Affidavit of Counsel

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

State Court Record

#3

#4

#5

#6

6 #1

Consent Form

#7

#8

#9

#10

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Note: Counsel may disregard #10 Notice of Deficiency re: Rule 7.1 Disclosures. This entry was docketed in error and has been marked as incorrectly filed. (CBD) (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) INCORRECTLY FILED - NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE: FAILURE TO FILE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURES to counsel of record, Jeffrey E. Hiatt. #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting has been filed by LM General Insurance Company without the required Rule 7.1 Disclosure statement. Rule 7.1 Disclosures must be filed within fourteen (14) calendar days. Failure to file the Disclosure Statement will cause the case to be submitted to the presiding judge for further action. cc: COR (CBD) Modified on 12/28/2020 (CBD). (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/30/2021. Pltf's disclosures due 6/20/2021. Dft's disclosures due9/30/2021. Amended Pleadings/Motion to Join Additional Parties due by 6/1/2021. Dispositive Motions, Motions in Limine and daubert motions due by 11/30/2021. Pretrial Filings due by 1/28/2022. FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 2/16/2022 at 11:00 AM in FRANKFORT before Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove. NLT 10 days prior to FPTC, file pretrial filings. NLT 2/11/2022, file objections. Court copies submitted to chambers via email. JURY TRIAL set for 3/1/2022 at 10:00 AM in FRANKFORT before Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove. Requests for extensions submitted upon motion. Referred to Magistrate Judge Edward B. Atkins for discovery and pretrial/status conferences, ruling on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions referred to Clerk to US District Judge. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/18/2020.(JJ)cc: COR,Frankfort Clerk (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Interrogatories and Requests for Production of Documents by MC Express, LLC (Boggs, Sarah) Modified text on 12/14/2020 (CBD). (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review: #7 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (CBD) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Boggs, Sarah) (Entered: 12/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER FOR MEETING AND REPORT: No later than thirty (30) days from the date of entry and service of this order, counsel for the parties shall conduct the meeting of parties required by Rule 26(f). At the time of the meeting, counsel for the parties shall exchange the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1) and, in the future, shall make supplemental disclosures when required by Rule 26(e). 3. No later than ten (10) days after the meeting, counsel for the parties shall file a written joint report outlining the proposed discovery plan. Signed by Judge Gregory F. VanTatenhove on 12/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(CBD)cc: COR (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by LM General Insurance Company. (Hiatt, Jeffrey) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Judge Van Tatenhove for review and possible scheduling: #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Answer to Complaint (Notice of Removal) (CBD) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketConflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by MC Express, LLC. (CBD) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by MC Express, LLC, Dennis G. Moore, Jr. (CBD) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Henry Circuit Court, case number 20-CI-00165. ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4828420), filed by MC Express, LLC, Dennis G. Moore, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Process and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit of Counsel, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 State Court Record)(CBD) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LM General Insurance Company is a litigant