This case was last updated from PACER on 12/29/2020 at 08:08:28 (UTC).

Lloyd v. Medtronic, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/30/2020 Lloyd filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Medtronic, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Stephen P. McGlynn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01156

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Stephen P. McGlynn

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gina Lloyd

Defendants

medtronic logistics, LLC

Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co.

Medtronic, Inc.

Medtronic USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy Jon Freiberg

Attorney at Freiberg Law Office

4545 Spring Brook Road

Rockford, IL 61114

Laura J. Baughman

Attorney at Martin Baughman, PLLC

3141 Hood Street, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75219

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gina Lloyd. Medtronic, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gina Lloyd. Medtronic USA, Inc. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gina Lloyd. Medtronic Puerto Rico Operations Co. waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gina Lloyd. Medtronic Logistics, LLC waiver sent on 12/11/2020, answer due 2/9/2021. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Laura J. Baughman. (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Laura J. Baughman $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4353180 by on behalf of Gina Lloyd. (Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 12/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Judge Stephen P. McGlynn for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 20-1156-SPM. (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Freiberg, Timothy) (Entered: 11/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy Jon Freiberg on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Freiberg, Timothy) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs.(Freiberg, Timothy) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE STRIKING ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS striking #1 Complaint, filed by Gina Lloyd. Login used and signature do not match. Filer should re-file Complaint, using correct login/signature. (ack)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Gina Lloyd. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 20-1156-RJD. Refer to Civil/Removal Case Processing Requirements, found on the ILSD website, for further service information. Consent due by 11/23/2020 (ack) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) STRICKEN COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0754-4323408.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit `12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Freiberg, Timothy) Modified on 11/2/2020 (ack). (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Medtronic Logistics, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Medtronic, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy Jon Freiberg