Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2019 at 07:59:47 (UTC).

Lloyd v. Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC et al

Case Summary

On 08/14/2019 Lloyd filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Abdul K Kallon. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01312

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Abdul K Kallon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cretest Theodore Lloyd

Defendants

M & T Bank

Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC

Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc

Movement Mortgage LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth J Lay

Attorney at HOOD & LAY LLC

1117 South 22Nd Street

Birmingham, AL 35205

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew T Mitchell

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN LLP

420 North 20Th Street, Suite 3100

Birmingham, AL 35203

Rachel R Friedman

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN LLP

420 North 20Th Street, Suite 3400

Birmingham, AL 35203

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/2/2019. (JLC) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#11

(#11) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Cretest Theodore Lloyd III by Cretest Theodore Lloyd. filed by Cretest Theodore Lloyd (Lay, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. The Plaintiff's amended complaint is due 9/17/2019. No further extensions will be given. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 9/16/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time For Filing Amended Complaint by Cretest Theodore Lloyd. (Lay, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#8

(#8) ORDER denying #7 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying #6 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/30/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Motion to Dismiss by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, M & T Bank, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Movement Mortgage LLC. (Friedman, Rachel) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

6 #2

Exhibit B- Note

6 #1

Exhibit A- Mortgage

#6

(#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, M & T Bank, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Movement Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B- Note)(Friedman, Rachel) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by M & T Bank. filed by M & T Bank (Mitchell, Matthew) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC. filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC (Friedman, Rachel) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc (Friedman, Rachel) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Movement Mortgage LLC, M & T Bank, Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc from Circuit Court Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-cv-2019-900717.00., filed by Movement Mortgage LLC, M & T Bank, Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(AFS) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 10/2/2019. (JLC) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to Cretest Theodore Lloyd III by Cretest Theodore Lloyd. filed by Cretest Theodore Lloyd (Lay, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. The Plaintiff's amended complaint is due 9/17/2019. No further extensions will be given. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 9/16/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time For Filing Amended Complaint by Cretest Theodore Lloyd. (Lay, Kenneth) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER denying #7 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages; denying #6 Joint Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Abdul K Kallon on 8/30/2019. (AFS) (Entered: 08/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in Motion to Dismiss by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, M & T Bank, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Movement Mortgage LLC. (Friedman, Rachel) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Dismiss by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, M & T Bank, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Movement Mortgage LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Mortgage, #2 Exhibit B- Note)(Friedman, Rachel) (Entered: 08/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by M & T Bank. filed by M & T Bank (Mitchell, Matthew) (Entered: 08/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC. filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC (Friedman, Rachel) (Entered: 08/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc (Friedman, Rachel) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Movement Mortgage LLC. filed by Movement Mortgage LLC (Friedman, Rachel) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2019
  • Filing Fee: $400, receipt_number 1126-3413204 (ALND B4601099912) (Friedman, Rachel) Modified on 8/19/2019 (AFS). (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Movement Mortgage LLC, M & T Bank, Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc from Circuit Court Shelby County, Alabama, case number 58-cv-2019-900717.00., filed by Movement Mortgage LLC, M & T Bank, Lakeview Loan Servicing LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(AFS) (Entered: 08/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MOVEMENT MORTGAGE LLC A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where M&T BANK is a litigant

Latest cases where Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC is a litigant