This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/22/2022 at 06:01:48 (UTC).

Lloyd v. Facebook, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On December 29, 2021, Susan Lloyd (“Plaintiff”), filed a civil right disability discrimination lawsuit against Facebook, Inc. and Meta Platforms, Inc. and Mark Zuckerberg (“Defendants”), seeking declaratory reliefs and damages along with actual and punitive damages, among other reliefs, for the Defendants’ alleged fraud and negligence. This case was filed in U.S. District Court in the Northern District of California with Judge Edward M. Chen presiding.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiff alleged that, “Defendants maintain a website called "Facebook" which they use to make money through third party ads. They illegally track users even when the user is logged off of Facebook. They also are not accessible under the ADA, Rehab Act and the Unruh Act. They also have a long history of not abiding by their own Rules which have allowed many people including Lloyd to be abused and threatened by other users on Facebook including threats to rape and murder Lloyd. Any attempt to resolve this conflict by other means including reporting these other users have failed.”

 

The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Defendants have allowed this to occur for 5 plus years now on a continued repeated basis. Defendants refuse to abide by their own Rules or any other federal or state law causing Lloyd to fear for her safety and suffer over 100,000.00 in injuries.” The Plaintiff then alleged that, “Furthermore, Defendants use ads and allow other third parties to advertise on their sites which discriminate against disabled people such as housing which is not ADA accessible and does not allow service dogs.” The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Defendants also allow other users to harass disabled people and make fun of disabilities on their website. Defendants refuse to remove these posts even after they are reported stating they do not violate their community standards so Defendants are stating it is okay to harass and make fun of disabled people.”

 

The Plaintiff then alleged that, “Lloyd never gave Facebook any permission to track her while she is on her computer or any other electronic device and not logged into Facebook.” The Plaintiff also alleged that, “Facebook has no authority to track Lloyd on her computer or electronic devices when she is not logged into Facebook.” The Plaintiff further alleged that, “Defendants are also liable for third parties invasion of privacy by allowing Thornsbery and over 500 of his Facebook friends to post Lloyds address, post pictures of Lloyd, post pictures of Lloyds property, post about Lloyds disabilities, post about Lloyds medical conditions including Lloyds scooter and oxygen, post Lloyds location, so others would threaten and harass Lloyd.”

 

There are seven claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiff. The first claim alleged is for the violation of the Americans with Disabilities Act. The second claim alleged is for violations of Section 508 of the Rehabilitation Act of 1973. The third claim alleged is for violation of the California Unruh Act. The fourth claim alleged is for fraud and intentional misrepresentations. The fifth claim alleged is for violations of the California Constitution Article 1, Section 1 and Data Protection Act Violations. The sixth claim alleged is for invasion of privacy. The seventh claim alleged is for breach of contract. The eighth claim alleged is for negligence and negligent infliction of emotional distress. 

 

In her prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the Court for declaratory reliefs and damages, including compensatory damages well in excess of 100,000.00, including lawyers fees, actual damages and punitive damages.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-10075

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Disability Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edward M. Chen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Susan Lloyd

Mount Joy, PA 17552-9347

Defendants

Facebook, Inc.

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Mark Zuckerberg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Jacob Marcus Heath

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP

1000 Marsh Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Receipt

1 #3

Envelope

#2

(#2) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Susan Lloyd. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#3

(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Susan Lloyd. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Standing Order

4 #2

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Susan Lloyd. Service waived by Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 2/11/2022, answer due 4/12/2022. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Susan Lloyd. Service waived by Meta Platforms, Inc. waiver sent on 2/11/2022, answer due 4/12/2022. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Envelope

#9

(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Facebook, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 4/8/2022) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

4 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint. ORDER re #9 , filed by Meta Platforms, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg, Facebook, Inc. Signed by Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/11/2022. (bxs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2022)Any non-CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Modified on 4/11/2022 (kmg, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/11/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT filed by Facebook, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (Heath, Jacob) (Filed on 4/8/2022) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Susan Lloyd. Service waived by Mark Zuckerberg waiver sent on 2/11/2022, answer due 4/12/2022. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Susan Lloyd. Service waived by Meta Platforms, Inc. waiver sent on 2/11/2022, answer due 4/12/2022. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Susan Lloyd. Service waived by Facebook, Inc. waiver sent on 2/11/2022, answer due 4/12/2022. (mjj2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2022) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Facebook, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order for Cases Asserting Denial of Right of Access under Americans with Disabilities Act. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certificate of Interested Entities by Susan Lloyd. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Susan Lloyd. (wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Facebook, Inc., Meta Platforms, Inc., Mark Zuckerberg (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt 34611157629). Filed by Susan Lloyd. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt, #3 Envelope)(wsn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2021) (Entered: 12/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Facebook is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jacob Marcus Heath