This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/21/2022 at 07:07:43 (UTC).

Llamas v. T-Mobile USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/20/2022 Llamas filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against T-Mobile USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas J. Whelan and William V. Gallo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00073

  • Filing Date:

    01/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas J. Whelan

Referral Judge

William V. Gallo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gabriel Llamas

Defendants

T-Mobile USA, Inc.

Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC

Trans Union LLC

Experian Information Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nicholas Ryan Barthel

Attorney at Military Law Center, Inc.

2173 Salk Avenue, Suite 250

Carlsbad, CA 92008

Defendant Attorneys

Gregg Aaron Rapoport

Attorney at Smith, Gambrell & Russell LLP

444 South Flower Street, Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Matthew R. Fox

Attorney at Jones Day

4655 Executive Drive

San Diego, CA 92121

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Settlement with T-Mobile USA, Inc. and Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC by Gabriel Llamas (Barthel, Nicholas) (dlg). (Entered: 03/17/2022)

#16

(#16) Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference. Joint Motion for Dismissal due: 4/29/22. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal are not submitted by 4/29/22, then a Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held. Settlement Disposition Conference set for 5/10/2022 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/10/22.(dlg) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Settlement with Trans Union, LLC by Gabriel Llamas (Barthel, Nicholas) (dlg). (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#14

(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Rapoport, Gregg)(jrm). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent ERC Holdings, LLC for Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Rapoport, Gregg)(jrm). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#12

(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC.(Rapoport, Gregg)(jrm). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER Granting Unopposed Motions for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Docs. #8 , #9 ). The Court grants the motions and orders Defendants to respond to the complaint on or before 3/18/2022. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 2/16/2022. (jrm) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

9 #1

Proposed Order

9 #9

Main Document

8 #2

Proposed Order

8 #1

Declaration of Juliette Morrow Campbell

8 #8

Main Document

7 #1

Proposed Order

7 #7

Main Document

6 #1

Proposed Order

6 #6

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Settlement with T-Mobile USA, Inc. and Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC by Gabriel Llamas (Barthel, Nicholas) (dlg). (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Order Scheduling Settlement Disposition Conference. Joint Motion for Dismissal due: 4/29/22. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal and Proposed Order for Dismissal are not submitted by 4/29/22, then a Settlement Disposition Conference shall be held. Settlement Disposition Conference set for 5/10/2022 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 3/10/22.(dlg) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Settlement with Trans Union, LLC by Gabriel Llamas (Barthel, Nicholas) (dlg). (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Rapoport, Gregg)(jrm). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC . Identifying Corporate Parent ERC Holdings, LLC for Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Rapoport, Gregg)(jrm). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC.(Rapoport, Gregg)(jrm). (Entered: 03/01/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER Granting Unopposed Motions for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Docs. #8 , #9 ). The Court grants the motions and orders Defendants to respond to the complaint on or before 3/18/2022. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 2/16/2022. (jrm) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER Granting Joint Motions for an Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint (Docs. #6 , #7 ). The Court grants the joint motions and orders Defendant to respond to the complaint on or before 3/1/2022. Signed by Judge Thomas J. Whelan on 2/16/2022. (jrm) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer from Trans Union LLC (Unopposed) by Gabriel Llamas. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barthel, Nicholas)(jrm). (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer from T-Mobile USA, Inc (Unopposed) by Gabriel Llamas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Juliette Morrow Campbell, #2 Proposed Order)(Barthel, Nicholas)(jrm). (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint (Corrected), by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rapoport, Gregg)(jrm). (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint, by Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rapoport, Gregg)Attorney Gregg Aaron Rapoport added to party Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC(pty:dft)(jrm). (Entered: 02/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc., Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate OPT-OUT SERVICES LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Fox, Matthew) (jrm). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Experian Information Solutions, Inc..(Fox, Matthew)Attorney Matthew R. Fox added to party Experian Information Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft) (jrm). (Entered: 02/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gabriel Llamas. Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Trans Union LLC served. (Barthel, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (ave) (rmc). (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Enhanced Recovery Company, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., T-Mobile USA, Inc., Trans Union LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ACASDC-16493385.), filed by Gabriel Llamas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:22-cv-73-W-WVG. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Nicholas Barthel)(ave) (rmc). (Entered: 01/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Enhanced Recovery Company LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Experian Information Solutions, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Trans Union Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where T-Mobile USA, INC is a litigant