This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/01/2020 at 08:46:27 (UTC).

Lixenberg v. Verizon Media Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 Lixenberg filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Verizon Media Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George B. Daniels. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-07176

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George B. Daniels

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dana Ruth Lixenberg

Defendants

Does 1-10

Verizon Media Inc. a Delaware corporation, individually and doing business as Yahoo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Alan Burroughs

Attorney at Doniger / Burroughs

603 Rose Ave

Venice, CA 90291

Laura Maria Zaharia

Attorney at Doniger/Burroughs

231 Norman Avenue, Suite 413

Brooklyn, NY 11222

Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan D. Reichman

Attorney at Andrews Kurth Kenyon LLP

200 Park Avenue, 9Th Floor

New York, NY 10166

Jennifer Lynn Bloom

Attorney at Hunton Andrews Kurth LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Verizon Media Inc...(Reichman, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Laura Maria Zaharia on behalf of Dana Ruth Lixenberg..(Zaharia, Laura) (Entered: 10/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 10/1/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint Oath Inc. respectfully requests an extension of time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to October 28, 2020 addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jennifer L. Bloom dated October 1, 2020. Document filed by Verizon Media Inc...(Bloom, Jennifer) (Entered: 10/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Verizon Media Inc. served on 9/16/2020, answer due 10/7/2020. Service was accepted by The Corporation Trust Company c/o Amy McLaren, Registered Agent for Service. Document filed by Dana Ruth Lixenberg..(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 2/2/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/9/2020) (jwh) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Does, Verizon Media Inc...(dnh) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights..(dnh) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (dnh) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (dnh) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(dnh) (Entered: 09/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VERIZON MEDIA INC., a Delaware corporation, individually and doing business as Yahoo; and DOES 1-10, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Dana Ruth Lixenberg..(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review..(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Does, Verizon Media Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-21460757)Document filed by Dana Ruth Lixenberg..(Burroughs, Scott) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VERIZON MEDIA A DELAWARE LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan D. Reichman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer Lynn Bloom