This case was last updated from PACER on 04/20/2019 at 07:12:54 (UTC).

Liviz Sr. v. Baker et al

Case Summary

On 02/19/2019 Liviz Sr filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Baker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is William G. Young. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-10304

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William G. Young

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Chief Jurist Ilya Liviz Sr.

Lowell, MA 01852

Defendants

Governor Charlie Baker

Governor Phil Bryant

Governor Henry McMaster

Governor Janet Mills

Governor Chris Sununu

Governor Kevin Stitt

Governor Mike Parson

Governor Kelly Kelly

Governor John Carney

Governor Jared Polis

Governor Larry Hogan

Governor Bill Lee

Governor Ned Lamont

Governor Andrew Cuomo

Governor Brian Kemp

Governor Gary Herbert

Governor John Bel Edwards

Governor Eric Holcomb

Governor Jay Robert pritzker

28 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ilya Liviz

Attorney at Liviz Law Office

200 Central Street

Lowell, MA 01852

 

Court Documents

#18

#15

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

5 #3

Ex. A, Mass. Driving License

5 #2

Addendum

5 #1

Proposed Order

#5

#4

#2

1 #3

Appendix ADDENDUM

#1

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) USCA Case Number 19-1224 for #15 Notice of Appeal filed by Ilya Liviz Sr.. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 03/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Certified and Transmitted Abbreviated Electronic Record on Appeal to US Court of Appeals re #15 Notice of Appeal. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered re #13 Emergency MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis filed by Ilya Liviz Sr.Pro se plaintiff's filing described by him as "Emergency Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis" but captioned "Notice of Appeal" (ECF No. #13 ) containing a one-sentence request to proceed in forma pauerpis on appeal is hereby DENIED. A plaintiff proceeding in forma pauperis in the district court is not required to seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal unless the Court certifies that plaintiff is not proceeding on appeal in good faith. Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3)(A). Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(3)(A), this Court certifies to the First Circuit Court of Appeals that plaintiff's appeal is not taken in good faith because plaintiff's complaint was dismissed on February 25, 2019 (ECF No. #9 ) for: (1) failure to comply with the Court's February 21, 2019 Memorandum and Order (ECF No. #6 ); and (2) the substantive reasons in the February 21, 2019 Memorandum and Order. Despite the Courts notice to plaintiff that his original complaint was subject to dismissal, he failed to address the pleading deficiencies noted in the Courts February 21, 2019 Memorandum and Order. Instead, he filed an amended complaint containing the same defects as the original complaint and added a non-cognizable claim against a new defendant. Finally, plaintiff presents Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(5), plaintiff may file a motion to proceed on appeal in forma pauperis with the First Circuit Court of Appeals. Pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 24(a)(4)(B), the Clerk shall notify the First Circuit Court of Appeals and plaintiff (by ECF notice) of this certification. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • (#16) Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Correction: Docket Entry 13 Notice of Appeal Corrected Because: The Notice of Appeal Was Filed Under the Wrong Event in CM/ECF By Counsel Liviz. The Notice of Appeal Was Re-Docketed Under the Correct Appellate Event in CM/ECF as ECF No. 15 on the Docket. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered denying #11 Motion for Reconsideration (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 14 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, #9 Order, #6 Memorandum and Order #10 Order Dismissing Case by Ilya Liviz Sr. NOTICE TO COUNSEL: A Transcript Report/Order Form, which can be downloaded from the First Circuit Court of Appeals web site at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov MUST be completed and submitted to the Court of Appeals. Counsel shall register for a First Circuit CM/ECF Appellate Filer Account at #http://pacer.psc.uscourts.gov/cmecf. Counsel shall also review the First Circuit requirements for electronic filing by visiting the CM/ECF Information section at #http://www.ca1.uscourts.gov/cmecf. US District Court Clerk to deliver official record to Court of Appeals by 3/18/2019. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Emergency MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by Ilya Liviz Sr..(Liviz, Ilya) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE by Ilya Liviz Sr. re #7 Amended Complaint Revocation for Refiling Within Thirty-Five (35) Days Per Court's [Doc. 6] Order (Liviz, Ilya) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Reconsideration re #9 Order, #7 Amended Complaint, #10 Order Dismissing Case Pursuant to Jumped The Gun Doctrine by Ilya Liviz Sr..(Liviz, Ilya) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. ORDER DISMISSING CASE(PSSA, 3) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. For the failure to comply with this courts directive, and for the substantive reasons set forth in the prior Memorandum and Order (Docket No. 6), this action is hereby DISMISSED in its entirety.(PSSA, 3) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order for Fearless & Honorable Judge do the right thing and enjoin defendant from preventing Liviz to drive so that he can go see his son and clients, by Ilya Liviz Sr..(Liviz, Ilya) (Entered: 02/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) AMENDED COMPLAINT with support from SCOTUS (PROGRESSIVE JACKPOT) against All Defendants, filed by Ilya Liviz Sr..(Liviz, Ilya) (Entered: 02/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Judge William G. Young: MEMORANDUM AND ORDER entered granting #4 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #5 Motion for TRO; granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff wishes to pursue this action, he must, within thirty-five (35) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order, file an amended complaint that cures the pleading deficiencies noted above. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to dismissal. (PSSA, 4) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order with Proposed Order by Ilya Liviz Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Addendum, #3 Ex. A, Mass. Driving License)(Liviz, Ilya) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Second MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with corrections and additions of valuables, exampli gratia; Preparation H and Athlete's Foot Cream; by Ilya Liviz Sr..(Liviz, Ilya) (Entered: 02/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • (#3) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Judith G. Dein. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ilya Liviz Sr..(Liviz, Ilya) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT FOR NATIONAL INJUNCTION AGAINST ALL STATE GOVERNORS AND against Charlie Baker (Fee Status: IFP requested), filed by Ilya Liviz Sr.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Form, #3 Appendix ADDENDUM)(Liviz, Ilya) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Governor Henry McMaster is a litigant

Latest cases where Governor Larry Hogan is a litigant

Latest cases where Governor Charlie Baker is a litigant