This case was last updated from PACER on 05/30/2021 at 07:51:06 (UTC).

IN RE PLUG POWER INC. DERIVATIVE LITIGATION

Case Summary

On 03/31/2021 IN RE PLUG POWER INC DERIVATIVE LITIGATION was filed as a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Edgardo Ramos. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02753

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Edgardo Ramos

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Junwei Liu

Consolidated Plaintiffs

Camerohn Withers

Elias Levy

Defendants

Paul B. Middleton

Gary K Willis

George C McNamee

Maureen O. Helmer

Andrew Marsh

Johannes Minho Roth

Lucas P Schneider

Jonathan Silver

Gregory L Kenausis

Nominal Defendant

Plug Power Inc.

Cross Defendant

Luke Schneider

Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider

Gregory M. Egleston

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Consolidated Plaintiff Attorneys

Timothy William Brown

Attorney at The Brown Law Firm

240 Townsend Square

Oyster Bay Cove, NY 11771

Saadia Hashmi

Attorney at The Brown Law Firm, P.C.

240 Townsend Square

Oyster Bay, NY 11771

Thomas James McKenna

Attorney at Gainey & McKenna

501 Fifth Avenue, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Gregory M. Egleston

Attorney at Gainey McKenna & Egleston

501 Fifth Avenue, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Defendant and Nominal Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer Burns-Luz

Attorney at Goodwin Procter, LLP (Boston)

100 Northern Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Deborah Sager Birnbach

Attorney at Goodwin Procter, LLP (Boston)

100 Northern Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE ACTIONS AND ESTABLISHING A LEADERSHIP STRUCTURE: The following actions are hereby consolidated for all purposes, including pre-trial proceedings and any trial, under Case No. 1:21-cv-02753-ER (the "Consolidated Action"), pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a): 1:21-cv-2753-ER and 1:21-cv-2891-UA. All papers filed in connection with the Consolidated Action will be maintained in one file under Lead Case No. 1:21-cv-02753-ER. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/27/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-02753-ER, 1:21-cv-02891-ER (cf) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

#11

(#11) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Plug Power Inc...(Burns-Luz, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Burns-Luz on behalf of Maureen O. Helmer, Gregory L Kenausis, Andrew Marsh, George C McNamee, Paul B. Middleton, Plug Power Inc., Johannes Minho Roth, Lucas P Schneider, Jonathan Silver, Gary K Willis..(Burns-Luz, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Deborah Sager Birnbach on behalf of Maureen O. Helmer, Gregory L Kenausis, Andrew Marsh, George C McNamee, Paul B. Middleton, Plug Power Inc., Johannes Minho Roth, Lucas P Schneider, Jonathan Silver, Gary K Willis..(Birnbach, Deborah) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Plug Power Inc. served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. Service was accepted by NADIA BELLAMY. Document filed by Junwei Liu..(Brown, Timothy) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Plug Power Inc...(pc) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PLUG POWER INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Junwei Liu..(Brown, Timothy) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maureen O. Helmer, Gregory L Kenausis, Andrew Marsh, George C McNamee, Paul B. Middleton, Plug Power Inc., Johannes Minho Roth, Lucas P Schneider, Jonathan Silver, Gary K Willis..(pc) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

#4

(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-02004-ER. Document filed by Junwei Liu..(Brown, Timothy) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ANDREW MARSH, PAUL B. MIDDLETON, MAUREEN O. HELMER, GREGORY L. KENAUSIS, GEORGE C. MCNAMEE, JOHANNES MINHO ROTH, LUCAS P. SCHNEIDER, JONATHAN SILVER, and GARY K. WILLIS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Junwei Liu..(Brown, Timothy) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, Timothy) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Maureen O. Helmer, Gregory L Kenausis, Andrew Marsh, George C McNamee, Paul B. Middleton, Plug Power Inc., Johannes Minho Roth, Lucas P Schneider, Jonathan Silver, Gary K Willis. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-24333276)Document filed by Junwei Liu..(Brown, Timothy) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING RELATED SHAREHOLDER DERIVATIVE ACTIONS AND ESTABLISHING A LEADERSHIP STRUCTURE: The following actions are hereby consolidated for all purposes, including pre-trial proceedings and any trial, under Case No. 1:21-cv-02753-ER (the "Consolidated Action"), pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42(a): 1:21-cv-2753-ER and 1:21-cv-2891-UA. All papers filed in connection with the Consolidated Action will be maintained in one file under Lead Case No. 1:21-cv-02753-ER. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 4/27/2021) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-02753-ER, 1:21-cv-02891-ER (cf) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Maureen O. Helmer, Gregory L Kenausis, Andrew Marsh, George C McNamee, Paul B. Middleton, Plug Power Inc., Johannes Minho Roth, Lucas P Schneider, Jonathan Silver, Gary K Willis. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B).(Birnbach, Deborah) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Plug Power Inc...(Burns-Luz, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jennifer Burns-Luz on behalf of Maureen O. Helmer, Gregory L Kenausis, Andrew Marsh, George C McNamee, Paul B. Middleton, Plug Power Inc., Johannes Minho Roth, Lucas P Schneider, Jonathan Silver, Gary K Willis..(Burns-Luz, Jennifer) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Deborah Sager Birnbach on behalf of Maureen O. Helmer, Gregory L Kenausis, Andrew Marsh, George C McNamee, Paul B. Middleton, Plug Power Inc., Johannes Minho Roth, Lucas P Schneider, Jonathan Silver, Gary K Willis..(Birnbach, Deborah) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (wb) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Edgardo Ramos. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case..(wb) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-02004-ER. Notice of Assignment to follow. (wb) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Plug Power Inc. served on 4/5/2021, answer due 4/26/2021. Service was accepted by NADIA BELLAMY. Document filed by Junwei Liu..(Brown, Timothy) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Plug Power Inc...(pc) (Entered: 04/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to PLUG POWER INC., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Junwei Liu..(Brown, Timothy) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Maureen O. Helmer, Gregory L Kenausis, Andrew Marsh, George C McNamee, Paul B. Middleton, Plug Power Inc., Johannes Minho Roth, Lucas P Schneider, Jonathan Silver, Gary K Willis..(pc) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Edgardo Ramos as possibly related to 21cv2004. (pc) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-02004-ER. Document filed by Junwei Liu..(Brown, Timothy) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ANDREW MARSH, PAUL B. MIDDLETON, MAUREEN O. HELMER, GREGORY L. KENAUSIS, GEORGE C. MCNAMEE, JOHANNES MINHO ROTH, LUCAS P. SCHNEIDER, JONATHAN SILVER, and GARY K. WILLIS, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Junwei Liu..(Brown, Timothy) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Brown, Timothy) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Maureen O. Helmer, Gregory L Kenausis, Andrew Marsh, George C McNamee, Paul B. Middleton, Plug Power Inc., Johannes Minho Roth, Lucas P Schneider, Jonathan Silver, Gary K Willis. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number BNYSDC-24333276)Document filed by Junwei Liu..(Brown, Timothy) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PLUG POWER, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Timothy William Brown

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gregory M. Egleston

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas J. McKenna