This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/23/2022 at 08:23:20 (UTC).

Littman Krooks LLP, et. al. v. New York City Department of Education

Case Summary

On 06/24/2022 Littman Krooks LLP, filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against New York City Department of Education. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Paul G. Gardephe. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05339

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Gardephe

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

T.C. individually and on behalf of T.C.

J.C. individually and on behalf of K.C.

E.C. individually and on behalf of K.C.

O.D. individually and on behalf of J.M.

E.G. individually and on behalf of M.G.

R.G. individually and on behalf of A.G.

J.H. individually and on behalf of L.S.3

N.H. individually and on behalf of N.H.

M.K. individually and on behalf of J.K.

M.M. individually and on behalf of I.R.

M.M. individually and on behalf of C.P.

T.N. individually and on behalf of H.N.

C.P. individually and on behalf of G.P.S.

J.P individually and on behalf of U.P.

G.P. individually and on behalf of A.P.

R.R. individually and on behalf of J.R.

J.R. individually and on behalf of D.P.

Y.R. individually and on behalf of S.M.R.

S.S. individually and on behalf of A.S.

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Arshi Pal

Attorney at Littman Krooks LLP

399 Knollwood Road

White Plains, NY 10603

Other Attorneys

Martin John Bowe, Jr

Attorney at NYC Law Department

100 Church Street Room 3-212

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pal, Arshi) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

#3

(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Littman Krooks LLP..(Pal, Arshi) Modified on 6/29/2022 (lal). (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#4

(#4) FILING ERROR - AS TO - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Littman Krooks LLP, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Littman Krooks LLP..(Pal, Arshi) Modified on 6/30/2022 (lal). (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Littman Krooks LLP..(Pal, Arshi) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department Of Education,..(lal) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#7

(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. New York City Department Of Education, served on 7/19/2022, answer due 8/9/2022. Service was accepted by INES CONTRES, DOCKET CLERK. Document filed by Littman Krooks LLP., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, EXHIBITS AND CIVIL COVER SHEET served on NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION on JULY 19, 2022. Service was accepted by INES CONTRES, DOCKET CLERK. Document filed by Littman Krooks LLP..(Pal, Arshi) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin John Bowe, Jr on behalf of New York City Department Of Education,..(Bowe, Martin) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#9

(#9) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , on consent, addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Mart Bowe dated 08/03/2022. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education,..(Bowe, Martin) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

#10

(#10) ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , on consent, addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Mart Bowe dated 08/03/2022.. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/8/2022) New York City Department Of Education, answer due 11/10/2022 (ks) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , on consent, addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Mart Bowe dated 08/03/2022.. The Application is granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 8/8/2022) New York City Department Of Education, answer due 11/10/2022 (ks) (Entered: 08/08/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , on consent, addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Mart Bowe dated 08/03/2022. Document filed by New York City Department Of Education,..(Bowe, Martin) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Martin John Bowe, Jr on behalf of New York City Department Of Education,..(Bowe, Martin) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,,,,,,. New York City Department Of Education, served on 7/19/2022, answer due 8/9/2022. Service was accepted by INES CONTRES, DOCKET CLERK. Document filed by Littman Krooks LLP., AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of SUMMONS, COMPLAINT, EXHIBITS AND CIVIL COVER SHEET served on NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION on JULY 19, 2022. Service was accepted by INES CONTRES, DOCKET CLERK. Document filed by Littman Krooks LLP..(Pal, Arshi) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department Of Education,..(lal) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Littman Krooks LLP..(Pal, Arshi) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Arshi Pal to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s):party name listed on Summons PDF 'TO' field does not correspond to ECF Docket Entry, enter the party name as to whom summons is to be issued for; the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct;party name listed on Summons PDF 'TO' field does not correspond to pleading, enter the party name as to whom summons is to be issued for. Use "c/o" on summons PDF 'To' field where applicable.. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (lal) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - AS TO - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Littman Krooks LLP, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Littman Krooks LLP..(Pal, Arshi) Modified on 6/30/2022 (lal). (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Arshi Pal to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct;party name listed on Summons PDF 'TO' field does not correspond to pleading, enter the party name as to whom summons is to be issued for. Use "c/o" on summons PDF 'To' field where applicable. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (lal) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #1 Complaint,,,,,,. Document filed by Littman Krooks LLP..(Pal, Arshi) Modified on 6/29/2022 (lal). (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pal, Arshi) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Arshi Pal. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: all parties. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (gp) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (gp) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(gp) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Arshi Pal. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (gp) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against NEW YORK CITY DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATION. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-26326798)Document filed by Littman Krooks LLP, et. al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A 207614 TC obo TC_Redacted Decision, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B 207451 JC obo KC_Redacted Decision, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C 191924 KC obo EC_Redacted Decision, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D 207828 OD obo JM_Redacted Decision, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E 206766 EG obo MG_Redacted Decision, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F 208037 RG obo AG_Redacted Decision, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G 192515 JH obo LS3_Redacted Decision, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H 211350 NH obo NH_Redacted Decision, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I 218395 MK obo JK_Redacted Decision, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J 206521 MM obo IR_Redacted Decision, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K 203817 MM obo CP_Redacted Decision, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L 206762 TN obo HN_Redacted Decision, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M 222964 CP obo GPS_Redacted Decision, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N 194727 JP obo UP_Redacted Decision, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O 192736 GP obo AP_Redacted Decision, #16 Exhibit Exhibit P 196714 RR obo JR_Redacted Decision, #17 Exhibit Exhibit Q 191505 JR obo DP_Redacted Decision, #18 Exhibit Exhibit R 220453 YR obo SMR_Redacted Decision, #19 Exhibit Exhibit S 191976 SS obo AS_Redacted Decision, #20 Exhibit Exhibit T 188972 CT obo MT_Redacted Decision, #21 Exhibit Exhibit U 208638 IV obo EG_Redacted Decision, #22 Exhibit Exhibit V 211293 IY obo RY_Redacted Decision).(Pal, Arshi) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OD is a litigant

Latest cases where N.H. is a litigant

Latest cases where M.K.(1) is a litigant

Latest cases where E.G. is a litigant