This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/12/2023 at 08:21:05 (UTC).

Little v. Pacific Seafood Procurement, LLC et al

Case Summary

On March 13, 2023, Brand Little (“Plaintiff”), individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated, represented by Stuart George Gross, Travis H.A. Smith, and Ross A. Middlemiss of Gross Klein PC; and Steven N. Williams, Ronnie S. Spiegel, and Elissa A. Buchanan of Joseph Saveri Law Firm, LLP, filed an antitrust lawsuit against Pacific Seafood Procurement, LLC; Pacific Seafood Processing, LLC; Pacific Seafood Fleet, LLC; Pacific Seafood Distribution, LLC; Pacific Seafood USA, LLC; and Does 1-30 (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking injunctive relief and damages for alleged monopolization, restraint of trade, and violations of the Sherman Act. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court for the Northern District of California, with Judge Alex G. Tse presiding.

In the complaint, the plaintiff stated, “Plaintiff and the Class are the approximately 1,400 independent commercial crabbers who land Dungeness crab in California, coastal Washington.”

Plaintiff alleged, “Before that crab makes it to consumers’ plates it passes through two markets. The first market, and the one at issue in this action, is the Pacific NW Area’s wholesale-input market in which Class members sell the live crab they have caught to what are known in the industry as ‘buyers,’ both directly, which is referred to as ‘ex vessel,’ and indirectly, which involves a secondary transaction wherein the ex vessel buyer sells the crab to a further buyer.”

The plaintiff then alleged, “Pacific Seafood has achieved this control over Dungeness crab ex vessel prices in the Pacific NW Area through a multi-pronged illegal strategy of (a) monoposinzation of the Pacific NW Area’s Dungeness crab wholesale-input market, (b) coercive combinations with other Dungeness crab wholesale buyers, (c) and coercive combinations with certain Dungeness crabbers.”

Plaintiff further alleged that “Pacific Seafood has monopsonized the Pacific NW Area’s Dungeness crab wholesale-input market through a concerted and willful acquisition and maintenance of that power via the aforementioned coercive combinations—which involve illegal refusals to deal, group boycotts, dumping, tying, and falsification of official ex vessel price records—as well as its own illegal unilateral conduct, rather than through the development of a superior product, business acumen, or historic accident.”

Plaintiff also alleged, “Over approximately the last 40 years, Pacific Seafood (directly or through its owner Frank Dulcich) has purchased and, in several cases, shut down, all of the other significant Dungeness crab processors in the Pacific NW Area.”

Additionally, the plaintiff alleged, “Pacific Seafood will dump cheap live Dungeness crab into the geographic areas of other buyers who have not complied with its pricing dictates, offering them for sale to retail, restaurant, and similar buyers for a price at or below what non-compliant buyers have paid ex vessel.”

Plaintiff presented seven claims for relief, including for alleged monopolization in violation of Section 2 of the Sherman Act, attempted monopolization in violation of Section 2 of the Sherman Act, unlawful agreements in restraint of trade, restraint of trade, and declaratory relief. 

In the prayer for relief, the plaintiff requested a judgment for injunctive and declaratory relief as well as an award of treble damages and costs of suit, including reasonable attorneys’ fees. 

This is a summary of a legal complaint. All statements, claims, and allegations listed herein reflect the position of the plaintiff only and do not represent the position of UniCourt. Additionally, this case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the current status of this case. To view the latest case updates and court documents, please sign up for a UniCourt account.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:23-CV-01098

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alex G. Tse

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brand Little

Defendants

Pacific Seafood Procurement, LLC

Pacific Seafood Processing, LLC

Pacific Seafood Fleet, LLC

Pacific Seafood Distribution, LLC

Pacific Seafood USA, LLC

Dulcich, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elissa Amlin Buchanan

Ronnie Seidel Spiegel

Ross Andrew Middlemiss

Steven Noel Williams

Travis Smith

Stuart George Gross

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18066469.). Filed byBrand Little. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/13/2023) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/13/2023) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

#4

(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2023) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2023) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

#6

(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brand Little.. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/17/2023) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brand Little. Pacific Seafood USA, LLC served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/24/2023) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brand Little. Pacific Seafood Procurement, LLC served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/24/2023) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brand Little. Pacific Seafood Distribution, LLC served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/24/2023) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#10

(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brand Little. Pacific Seafood Processing, LLC served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/24/2023) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#11

(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brand Little. Pacific Seafood Fleet, LLC served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/24/2023) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brand Little. Dulcich, Inc. served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/24/2023) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND TIMING OF THIRD PARTY DISCOVERY filed by Brand Little. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/31/2023) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

#14

(#14) STIPULATION AND ORDER Re: Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Timing of Third Party Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #13 Stipulation. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2023) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

2 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) STIPULATION AND ORDER Re: Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint and Timing of Third Party Discovery signed by Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse: granting #13 Stipulation. (shy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2023) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER DEFENDANTS RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT AND TIMING OF THIRD PARTY DISCOVERY filed by Brand Little. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/31/2023) (Entered: 03/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brand Little. Dulcich, Inc. served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/24/2023) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brand Little. Pacific Seafood Fleet, LLC served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/24/2023) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brand Little. Pacific Seafood Processing, LLC served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/24/2023) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brand Little. Pacific Seafood Distribution, LLC served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/24/2023) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brand Little. Pacific Seafood Procurement, LLC served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/24/2023) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brand Little. Pacific Seafood USA, LLC served on 3/16/2023, answer due 4/6/2023. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/24/2023) (Entered: 03/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Brand Little.. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/17/2023) (Entered: 03/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2023) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 6/9/2023. Initial Case Management Conference set for 6/16/2023 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom A, 15th Floor. (hdj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2023) (Entered: 03/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Alex G. Tse. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 3/27/2023. (ark, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2023) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/13/2023) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-18066469.). Filed byBrand Little. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gross, Stuart) (Filed on 3/13/2023) (Entered: 03/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less