This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/02/2021 at 07:50:03 (UTC).

Little Rock Sun Times, LLC v. Mediaspace Solutions, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/03/2021 Little Rock Sun Times, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Mediaspace Solutions, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elizabeth Cowan Wright and Donovan W. Frank. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:21-CV-01138

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Elizabeth Cowan Wright

Presiding Judge

Donovan W. Frank

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Little Rock Sun Times, LLC

Defendant

Mediaspace Solutions, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Craig D Greenberg

Attorney at Huffman Usem Crawford & Greenberg

5101 Hwy 55 Ste 1000

Mpls, MN 55422

James T. Smith

Attorney at Huffman, Usem, Crawford & Greenberg, PA

5101 Olson Memorial Hwy., Ste 1000

Golden Valley, MN 55422

Defendant Attorneys

Andrew R Shedlock

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP

60 South 6Th Street, Suite 3400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Leland Patrick Abide

Attorney at Kutak Rock LLP

60 South Sixth Street, Suite 3400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Little Rock Sun Times, LLC. Jointly Signed by Little Rock Sun Times, LLC and Mediaspace Solutions, Inc..(Greenberg, Craig) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#11

(#11) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Mediaspace Solutions, Inc.. (Abide, Leland) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#10

(#10) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Abide, Leland) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#9

(#9) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #4 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Mediaspace Solutions, Inc..(Abide, Leland) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

8 #3

Exhibit(s) C

8 #2

Exhibit(s) B

8 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#8

(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Richard Benson in SUPPORT OF #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Mediaspace Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Abide, Leland) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

7 #4

Exhibit(s) D

7 #3

Exhibit(s) C

7 #2

Exhibit(s) B

7 #1

Exhibit(s) A

#7

(#7) Declaration of Leland P. Abide in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Mediaspace Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Abide, Leland) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

6 #1

LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Mediaspace Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Abide, Leland) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2021 at 10:30 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Abide, Leland) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Mediaspace Solutions, Inc.. (Abide, Leland) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Mediaspace Solutions, Inc. (MMP) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Little Rock Sun Times, LLC. Jointly Signed by Little Rock Sun Times, LLC and Mediaspace Solutions, Inc..(Greenberg, Craig) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Mediaspace Solutions, Inc.. (Abide, Leland) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. (Abide, Leland) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re #4 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by Mediaspace Solutions, Inc..(Abide, Leland) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Richard Benson in SUPPORT OF #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Mediaspace Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C)(Abide, Leland) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Declaration of Leland P. Abide in Support of #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Mediaspace Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Exhibit(s) C, #4 Exhibit(s) D)(Abide, Leland) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MEMORANDUM in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Mediaspace Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Abide, Leland) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION #4 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 7/23/2021 at 10:30 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Judge Donovan W. Frank. (Abide, Leland) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Mediaspace Solutions, Inc.. (Abide, Leland) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Mediaspace Solutions, Inc. (MMP) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 21-cv-1138 (DWF/ECW). (MMP) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mediaspace Solutions, Inc. (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8719450) filed by Little Rock Sun Times, LLC. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A, #2 Exhibit(s) B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Smith, James) (Entered: 05/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer James T. Smith