This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2021 at 07:58:37 (UTC).

Little Omega v. Bayer CropScience LP et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2021 Little Omega filed an Other - Antitrust lawsuit against Bayer CropScience LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Pitlyk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00742

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Antitrust

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Pitlyk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Little Omega

Defendants

Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc.

Growmark, Inc. doing business as Farm Supply

Corteva Inc.

BASF Corporation

Univar Solutions, Inc.

CHS Inc.

Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Inc.

Tenkoz Inc.

Nutrien AG Solutions, Inc.

Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd.

Bayer CropScience L.P.

Bayer CropScience Inc

Syngenta Corporation

Cargill, Inc.

Winfield Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John (Don) W. Barrett

404 Court Square North

Lexington, MS 39095

Sterling Starns

404 Court Square North, P.O. Box 927

Lexington, MS 39095

Jonathan W. Cuneo

Attorney at CUNEO AND GILBERT LLP - DC

4725 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20016

Victoria R. Sims

Attorney at CUNEO GILBERT LLP - DC

4725 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Suite 200

Washington, DC 20016

Defendant Attorneys

Donald M. Flack, Jr.

115 N. Second Street

Edwardsville, IL 62025

Lara Bach

Attorney at WEIL GOTSHAL LLP - Miami

1395 Brickell Ave., Suite 1200

Miami, FL 33131

Troy A. Bozarth

Attorney at HEPLER BROOM LLC - Edwardsville

130 N. Main Street, P.O. Box 510

Edwardsville, IL 62025-0510

Matt D. Basil

Attorney at WILLKIE AND FARR LLP - Chicago

300 N. Lasalle Dr., Ste 50Th Floor

Chicago, IL 60654-3456

Colby A. Kingsbury

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER LLP - Chicago

311 S. Wacker Drive, Suite 4300

Chicago, IL 60606

Kathy L. Osborn

Attorney at FAEGRE DRINKER LLP - Indianapolis

300 N. Meridian St., Suite 2500

Indianapolis, IN 46204-1750

Lee A. Peifer

Attorney at EVERSHEDS SUTHERLAND US LLP - Atlanta

999 Peachtree St Ne, Suite 2300

Atlanta, GA 30309

Timothy J. McCaffrey

Attorney at EVERSHEDS SUTHERLAND US LLP - Chicago

900 North Michigan Avenue, Suite 1000

Chicago, IL 60611

James Robert McGibbon

Attorney at EVERSHEDS SUTHERLAND US LLP - Atlanta

999 Peachtree St Ne, Suite 2300

Atlanta, GA 30309

Christopher M. Hohn

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - St Louis

One Us Bank Plaza, 505 N. 7Th Street

St. Louis, MO 63101

Erick E. VanDorn

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - Belleville

525 W. Main Street, Suite 300

Belleville, IL 62220

Sharon B. Rosenberg

Attorney at THOMPSON COBURN LLP - St Louis

One Us Bank Plaza, 505 N. 7Th Street

St. Louis, MO 63101

Eric J. Mahr

Attorney at FRESHFIELDS AND BRUCKHAUS LLP - DC

700 13Th Street Nw, 10Th Floor

Washington, DC 20005-3960

Brian Chang

224 South Michigan Avenue, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60604

Sarah H. Catalano

224 South Michigan Avenue, Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60604

Nathan P. Eimer

Attorney at EIMER STAHL LLP

224 S. Michigan Ave., Suite 1100

Chicago, IL 60604

10 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

77 #1

*Restricted*

#77

#76

#75

#74

RESTRICTED

#73

#72

#71

#70

1 #15

Summons Winfield Solutions, LLC

1 #14

Summons Univar Solution

1 #13

Summons Tenkoz Inc

1 #12

Summons Syngenta Corporation

1 #4

Summons Bayer CropScience LP

1 #3

Summons Bayer CropScience Incorporated

1 #2

Summons BASF Corporation

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

77 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. Per Local Rule 12.01, attorneys who are not admitted to the Eastern District of Missouri do not need to apply for admission pro hac vice in order to practice on a case if they had already filed an entry of appearance before the case was transferred from another United States District Court. For more information, visit #attorney applications. (DJO) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Southern; Case Number 3:21-cv-00297. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. Case transferred in electronically. (DJO) (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#76) CONDITION TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-MDL No. 2993) TRANSFERRING CASE TO OTHER DISTRICT: Case transferred to Eastern District of Missouri in regard to MDL No. 2993. (amv) (Entered: 06/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Little Omega. Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd. waiver sent on 5/3/2021, answer due 7/2/2021. (Barrett, John (Don)) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) Transcript of Telephonic Status Conference held on 05/06/2021, before Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel. Court Reporter Stephanie Rennegarbe, Telephone number 618-482-9226. NOTICE: Attorneys and unrepresented parties have 7 calendar days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript and 21 calendar days to file a Redaction Request. If redactions are not requested, the transcript will be made remotely available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. See the full Transcript Policy on the website at #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/forms/TransPolicy.pdf Transcript may be viewed at the public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 6/8/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/18/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/16/2021. (skr) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) ORDER STAYING CASE: All proceedings and deadlines in the above-captioned cases are STAYED until 14 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer these actions to an MDL proceeding and completes any transfer of the action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407. Signed by Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel on 5/17/2021. (mlp) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) Corporate Disclosure Statement by BASF Corporation. (Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) NOTICE of Appearance by Troy A. Bozarth on behalf of BASF Corporation (Bozarth, Troy) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#70) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd.. (McCluggage, Michael) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel: Motion Hearing held via video teleconference on 5/13/2021 re #13 Motion to Transfer Case Under 28 U.S.C. 1404(a). Counsel speaking on behalf of plaintiff were Jamie Boyer, Victoria Sims, and Connor Lemire. Counsel speaking on behalf of defendants were Sharon Rosenberg and Erick VanDorn. Motion taken under advisement. (Court Reporter Stephanie Rennegarbe.) (drb)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 03/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Erick E. VanDorn on behalf of Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc. (VanDorn, Erick) (Entered: 03/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TERMINATING JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, and a request for reassignment having been received, this case, in its entirety, is hereby reassigned to Chief Judge Nancy J. Rosenstengel for further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison no longer assigned to the case. All future documents must bear case number 21-cv-297-NJR. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER Granting #5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sarah Sterling Starns and #6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Katherine Barrett Riley. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to CHS Inc., Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., Bayer CropScience, Inc., Corteva Inc., Growmark, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC, Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Bayer CropScience LP, Tenkoz Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd., BASF Corporation, Univar Solutions, Inc., Cargill, Inc.. Originals mailed to Attorney John (Don) W. Barrett for service. (ack) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Katherine Barrett Riley $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4431275 by on behalf of Little Omega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Riley, Katherine) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Sarah Sterling Starns $200 fee paid,receipt number 0754-4430529 by on behalf of Little Omega. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing)(Starns, Sarah) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (Barrett, John (Don)) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by John (Don) W. Barrett on behalf of Little Omega (Barrett, John (Don)) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Gilbert C. Sison pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Little Omega. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 21-297-GCS. Consent due by 4/7/2021 (ack) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against BASF Corporation, Bayer CropScience LP, Bayer CropScience, Inc., CHS Inc., Cargill, Inc., Corteva Inc., Federated Co-Operatives, Ltd., Growmark, Inc., Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc., Simplot AB Retail Sub, Inc., Syngenta Corporation, Tenkoz Inc., Univar Solutions, Inc., Winfield Solutions, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0754-4429814.), filed by Little Omega. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons BASF Corporation, #3 Summons Bayer CropScience Incorporated, #4 Summons Bayer CropScience LP, #5 Summons Cargill, Inc, #6 Summons CHS Incorporated, #7 Summons Corteva Inc, #8 Summons Federated Co-Operatives Ltd, #9 Summons GROWMARK, Incorporated, #10 Summons Nutrien Ag Solutions, Inc, #11 Summons Simplot AB Retail, #12 Summons Syngenta Corporation, #13 Summons Tenkoz Inc, #14 Summons Univar Solution, #15 Summons Winfield Solutions, LLC)(Barrett, John (Don)) (Entered: 03/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pinnacle Agriculture Distribution, Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Federated Co-operatives Ltd. is a litigant