This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/09/2019 at 07:43:51 (UTC).

Little et al v. Mannas et al

Case Summary

On 09/10/2019 Little filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Mannas. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kimberly E. West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00306

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly E. West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Williamson Penn Little

Defendants

Barbara Craddock

Chad Craddock

David Mannas

Cathy Etchen

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Daniel J. Card

Attorney at Daniel Card Law, LLC

512 Nw 12Th St

Oklahoma City, OK 73103

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel G. Webber, Jr.

Attorney at Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber, PLLC

119 N Robinson Ave, Ste 900

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Chance L. Pearson

Attorney at Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber, PLLC

119 N Robinson Ave, Ste 900

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Phillip G. Whaley

Attorney at Ryan Whaley Coldiron Jantzen Peters & Webber, PLLC

119 N Robinson Ave, Ste 900

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

12 #1

Consent/Reassignment Form

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting hearing(s): Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 11/26/2019 09:30 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Chance L. Pearson on behalf of All Defendants (Pearson, Chance) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Daniel G. Webber, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (Webber, Daniel) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint (Re: #2 Complaint) by Barbara Craddock, Chad Craddock(Trustee), Chad Craddock(Individual), Cathy Etchen(Individual), Cathy Etchen(Trustee), David Mannas(Individual), David Mannas(Trustee) (Whaley, Phillip) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Phillip G. Whaley on behalf of All Defendants (Whaley, Phillip) (Entered: 10/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Barbara Craddock (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Cathy Etchen (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Chad Craddock (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to David Mannas (jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/17/2019 in the amount of $400, receipt number BOKEDC-1300690 (Re: #2 Complaint, ) by Williamson Penn Little(Sole beneficiary of the Williamson Penn Little Trust Dated December 1, 1984) (Card, Daniel) (Entered: 09/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 9/18/2019)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Barbara Craddock, Chad Craddock (Individual and as Trustee), Cathy Etchen(Individual and as Trustee), David Mannas(Individual and as Trustee) by Williamson Penn Little(Individual and as Sole beneficiary of the Williamson Penn Little Trust Dated December 1, 1984)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Williamson Penn Little (individually and as sole beneficiary of the Williamson Penn Little Trust dated December 1, 1984)(jcb, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel J. Card