This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/23/2022 at 06:50:45 (UTC).

Little Ceasar Enterprises, Inc. et al v. Gurmoh, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/21/2022 Little Ceasar Enterprises, Inc filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Gurmoh, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sean F. Cox and Anthony P. Patti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-10128

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sean F. Cox

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Little Ceasar Enterprises, Inc.

LC Trademarks, Inc.

Defendants

Gurmoh, Inc.

ABW Foods LLC

Atma Singh Jassal

Mohan Jassal

Gurjeet Jassal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Larry J. Saylor

Attorney at Miller, Canfield,

150 W. Jefferson Avenue, Suite 2500

Detroit, MI 48226-4415

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8763552 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#2

(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Little Ceasar Enterprises, Inc. (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LC Trademarks, Inc. (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#4

(#4) Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued for *ABW Foods LLC, Gurmoh, Inc., Atma Singh Jassal, Gurjeet Jassal, Mohan Jassal* (SSch) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

#6

(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Atma Singh Jassal served on 2/21/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Mohan Jassal served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#8

(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Gurmoh, Inc. served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#9

(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. ABW Foods LLC served on 1/26/2022, answer due 2/16/2022. (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Gurjeet Jassal served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

#11

(#11) ORDER for Plaintiffs to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 3/31/2022. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER for Plaintiffs to Show Cause Why This Case Should Not be Dismissed for Failure to Prosecute. Show Cause Response due by 3/31/2022. Signed by District Judge Sean F. Cox. (JMcC) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Gurjeet Jassal served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. ABW Foods LLC served on 1/26/2022, answer due 2/16/2022. (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Gurmoh, Inc. served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Mohan Jassal served on 1/27/2022, answer due 2/17/2022. (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Atma Singh Jassal served on 2/21/2022, answer due 3/14/2022. (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 03/09/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued for *ABW Foods LLC, Gurmoh, Inc., Atma Singh Jassal, Gurjeet Jassal, Mohan Jassal* (SSch) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Trademark Report Sent To Washington (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by LC Trademarks, Inc. (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) STATEMENT of DISCLOSURE of CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS and FINANCIAL INTEREST by Little Ceasar Enterprises, Inc. (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8763552 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Saylor, Larry) (Entered: 01/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LC Trademarks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Little Caesar Enterprises, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Larry J. Saylor