Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/26/2020 at 13:27:27 (UTC).

Litt v. Wagner et al

Case Summary

On 05/27/2020 Litt filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Wagner. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are CJ Williams and Mark A Roberts. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01021

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

CJ Williams

Referral Judge

Mark A Roberts

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Timothy Litt

Waukon, IA 52172

Defendants

Officer Elwood

Anthony Gericke

Scott Jennings

Paul Wagner

Andrew F Van Der Maaten

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Correspondence by Timothy Litt w/response (ksy)(copy w/NEF to Pet with copy of docket)(PSLC) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#3

(#3) Correspondence by Timothy Litt (ksy)(NEF to Pet)(PSLC) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

#2

(#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Litt (ksy)(NEF to Pet)(PSLC) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

1 #1

1983 Complaint

#1

(#1) PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Timothy Litt (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint) (ksy)(NEF to Plf)(PSLC) Modified on 5/28/2020 (ksy). (Entered: 05/27/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Correspondence by Timothy Litt w/response (ksy)(copy w/NEF to Pet with copy of docket)(PSLC) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Correspondence by Timothy Litt (ksy)(NEF to Pet)(PSLC) (Entered: 07/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Timothy Litt (ksy)(NEF to Pet)(PSLC) (Entered: 06/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PRO SE MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Timothy Litt (Attachments: #1 1983 Complaint) (ksy)(NEF to Plf)(PSLC) Modified on 5/28/2020 (ksy). (Entered: 05/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less