This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/11/2021 at 10:20:05 (UTC).

LISOWSKI v. WALMART STORES, INC.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2020 LISOWSKI filed a Property - Other Personal Property lawsuit against WALMART STORES, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Nicholas Ranjan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01729

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Personal Property

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Nicholas Ranjan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHRISTOPHER LISOWSKI

Defendant

WALMART STORES, INC. trading and doing business as WALMART

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank G. Salpietro

Attorney at Rothman Gordon, P.C.

310 Grant Street, Third Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Emily E. Town

Attorney at Rothman Gordon

310 Grant Street, Third Floor, Grant Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorneys

Michael P. Pest

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC

600 Grant Street, 44Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Thomas E. Sanchez

Attorney at Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott, LLC

600 Grant Street, 44Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Paul Berks

Attorney at Massey & Gail LLP

50 East Washington, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60602

Kathryn A. Robinette

Attorney at Massey & Gail LLP

1000 Maine Ave. Sw, Suite 450

Washington, DC 20024

Suyash Agrawal

Attorney at Massey & Gail LLP

50 East Washington Street, Suite 400

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

#24

15 #1

Proposed Order

#15

11 #3

Proposed Order

11 #2

Certificate of Service

11 #1

Exhibit 1

#11

#4

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

#3

1 #4

Exhibit C

1 #3

Exhibit B

1 #2

Exhibit A

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

43 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER Response/Briefing Schedule re #15 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Response to Motion due by 2/4/2021. Brief shall not exceed 20 pages. Reply due by 2/18/2021. Brief shall not exceed 10 pages. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 1/7/2021. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER denying #11 Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 1/7/2021. (av) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MEMORANDUM OPINION re #11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by CHRISTOPHER LISOWSKI. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 1/7/2021. (av) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan: Oral Argument held on 12/30/2020. (Court Reporter: K. Earley) (av) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Berks on behalf of WALMART STORES, INC.. (Berks, Paul) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) REPLY to #17 Brief in Opposition to Motion,, filed by CHRISTOPHER LISOWSKI. (Salpietro, Frank) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #20 Motion to Continue. The Oral Argument set for 12/18/2020 at 10:00 a.m. is hereby RESCHEDULED for 12/30/2020 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/30/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Continue Reschedule Oral Argument on Plaintiff's Motion to Remand by WALMART STORES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sanchez, Thomas) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • Docket(#19) ORDER, scheduling oral argument. An oral argument on Plaintiffs' motion to remand is scheduled for December 18, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. to be held by videoconference. A separate e-mail with the videoconference/zoom link will be sent to all counsel. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/25/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER re #15 motion to dismiss and #2 motion to strike pre-removal discovery. In light of Plaintiffs' motion to remand, all discovery in this case is stayed, including any discovery served prior to remand. Additionally, no briefing schedule will be set as to Defendant's motion to dismiss until resolution of Plaintiffs' motion to remand. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/25/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av) (Entered: 11/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 11/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for attorney Suyash Agrawal to Appear Pro Hac Vice, (Filing fee $70, Receipt # APAWDC-6090229) by WALMART STORES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit A - Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Agrawal, Suyash) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by WALMART STORES, INC. Answer due from All Parties. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Sanchez, Thomas) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. Town on behalf of CHRISTOPHER LISOWSKI. (Town, Emily) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER. A response, not to exceed 10 pages, to the #2 Motion to Strike is due 7 days after the filing of Defendant's anticipated Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 11/16/2020. Text-only entry; no PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (av) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketJudge J. Nicholas Ranjan added. Judge Nora Barry Fischer no longer assigned to case. (mao) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Sanchez on behalf of WALMART STORES, INC.. (Sanchez, Thomas) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement identifying NONE as corporate parent or other affiliate, by WALMART STORES, INC.. (jd) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEF in Support re #2 Motion to Strike filed by WALMART STORES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (jd) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION TO STRIKE PRE-REMOVAL STATE DISCOVERY REQUESTS AND STAY DISCOVERY by WALMART STORES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (jd) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from ALLEGHENY COUNTY, case number GD-20-10605 with BOTH Copies attached: LOWER COURT COMPLAINT, EXHIBITS (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-6073186), filed by WALMART STORES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (jd) (Entered: 11/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Frank G. Salpietro Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Emily E. Town Esq.