This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/12/2021 at 07:41:45 (UTC).

Janette Lisner et al v. SPARC Group LLC et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 Janette Lisner filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against SPARC Group LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Andre Birotte Jr and Gail J. Standish. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-05713

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Andre Birotte Jr

Referral Judge

Gail J. Standish

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JANETTE LISNER

JENNIFER QUIROZ NUNEZ

JAMES ANDREWS

Defendants

AERO OPCO LLC

SPARC GROUP LLC

Does 1-5, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel Morley Kekoa Hattis

Attorney at Hattis and Lukacs

400 108Th Avenue Ne Suite 500

Bellevue, WA 98004

Paul Karl Lukacs

Attorney at Hattis and Lukacs

936 Woodlawn Drive

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360

Shane T. Prince

Attorney at Denittis Osefchen Prince PC

5 Greentree Centre, Suite 410

Marlton, NJ 08057

Stephen P. Denittis

Attorney at Denittis Osefchen Prince PC

5 Greentree Center Suite 410

Marlton, NJ 08057

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie A Sheridan

Attorney at Steptoe and Johnson LLP

One Market Plaza Suite 3900

San Francisco, CA 94105

Anthony J Anscombe

Attorney at Steptoe and Johnson LLP

1 Market Plaza Suite 3900

San Francisco, CA 94105

Meegan Bay Brooks

Attorney at Steptoe and Johnson LLP

One Market Street Suite 3900

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#29

#28

#27

26 #1

Proposed Order

26 #26

Main Document

24 #3

Proof of Service

24 #2

Proposed Order

24 #1

Memorandum OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS

24 #24

Main Document

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Plaintiffs James Andrews, Janette Lisner, Jennifer Quiroz Nunez. (Lukacs, Paul) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #24 filed by Plaintiffs James Andrews, Janette Lisner, Jennifer Quiroz Nunez. (Lukacs, Paul) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE OF DEFENDANT SPARC GROUP LLC'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #26 , the Court hereby ORDERS that the hearing of Defendant SPARC Group LLC's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #24 is CONTINUED to 10/8/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file and serve their Opposition to the Motion on or before 9/8/2021. Defendant is ORDERED to file and serve its Reply, if any, in support of the Motion on or before 9/24/2021. (gk) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response and Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT #24 filed by Plaintiffs James Andrews, Janette Lisner, Jennifer Quiroz Nunez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lukacs, Paul) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 11/19/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb) (Entered: 08/23/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by DEFENDANTS SPARC Group LLC. Motion set for hearing on 9/17/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Sheridan, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendant SPARC Group LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proof of Service)(Sheridan, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Janette Lisner, James Andrews, Jennifer Quiroz Nunez pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) Without Prejudice as to Aero Operations LLC. (Lukacs, Paul) (Entered: 08/19/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting #18 Non-Resident Attorney Shane T. Prince APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Andrews, Janette Lisner and Jennifer Quiroz Nunez, designating Paul K Lukacs as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr: granting #17 Non-Resident Attorney Stephen P. Denittis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of James Andrews, Janette Lisner and Jennifer Quiroz Nunez, designating Paul K Lukacs as local counsel. (lom) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Shane T Prince on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Stephen P DeNittis on behalf on Plaintiffs. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (ghap) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Aero Operations LLC, Does 1-5, inclusive, SPARC Group LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Janette Lisner, James Andrews, Jennifer Quiroz Nunez. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 6/3/2021 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants AERO OPCO LLC, AERO OPERATIONS LLC, SPARC GROUP LLC, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties, #3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 served on 07/14/2021. (Sheridan, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants AERO OPCO LLC, AERO OPERATIONS LLC, SPARC GROUP LLC, identifying SPARC Group LLC (formerly Aero OpCo LLC); Aero Operations LLC; ABG-AERO LLC; Simon Blackjack Holdings, LLC; Janette Lisner; Jennifer Quiroz Nunez; James Andrews. (Sheridan, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants AERO OPCO LLC, AERO OPERATIONS LLC, SPARC GROUP LLC. (Sheridan, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 21STCV20847 Receipt No: ACACDC-31632928 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants AERO OPERATIONS LLC, AERO OPCO LLC, SPARC GROUP LLC. (Attorney Stephanie A Sheridan added to party AERO OPCO LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A Sheridan added to party AERO OPERATIONS LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Stephanie A Sheridan added to party SPARC GROUP LLC(pty:dft))(Sheridan, Stephanie) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AERO OPCO LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meegan Brooks

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie Sheridan

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Anthony Anscombe