This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/24/2019 at 08:23:52 (UTC).

Liserio v. Colt Oilfield Services, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/25/2019 Liserio filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Colt Oilfield Services, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Xavier Rodriguez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01159

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Xavier Rodriguez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Liserio

Defendants

Terry Booker

Roy E. (Eddie) Aguilar

Total Tank Systems, LLC

Colt Oilfield Services, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Shelby A. Jordan

Antonio Ortiz

Defendant Attorneys

Jenna C. Castleman

Kyle Cledys Watson

 

Court Documents

#10

#9

8 #2

Exhibit

8 #1

Exhibit

#8

7 #9

Exhibit I

7 #8

Exhibit H

7 #7

Exhibit G

7 #6

Exhibit F

5 #4

Proposed Order

5 #3

Exhibit

5 #2

Exhibit

5 #1

Exhibit

#5

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE Second Amended Notice of Removal by Roy E. (Eddie) Aguilar, Terry Booker, Colt Oilfield Services, LLC, Total Tank Systems, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal, #9 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court, (Castleman, Jenna) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER DENYING #5 Motion to Remand to State Court. Defendant is ORDERED to amend its Notice of Removal by Tuesday, November 26 to properly allege the citizenship of the parties at both the time of filing in state court as well as the time of removal. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (rf) (Entered: 11/20/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) REPLY to Response to Motion, filed by Robert Liserio, re #5 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Diversity Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Facts and Law in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Liserio (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Jordan, Shelby) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Roy E. (Eddie) Aguilar, Terry Booker, Colt Oilfield Services, LLC, Total Tank Systems, LLC, re #5 Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Diversity Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Facts and Law in Support filed by Plaintiff Robert Liserio (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Castleman, Jenna) (Entered: 11/05/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Vacation for Shelby Jordan by Robert Liserio (Jordan, Shelby) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Opposed MOTION to Remand to State Court for Lack of Diversity Jurisdiction and Memorandum of Facts and Law in Support by Robert Liserio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order)(Jordan, Shelby) (Entered: 10/24/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Amended NOTICE of Removal by Colt Oilfield Services, LLC, Roy E. (Eddie) Aguilar, Total Tank Systems, LLC, Terry Booker re #1 Notice of Removal, , filed by Colt Oilfield Services, LLC, Roy E. (Eddie) Aguilar, Total Tank Systems, LLC, Terry Booker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Castleman, Jenna) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Defendants are ordered to file an amended Notice of Removal that adequately alleges the citizenship ofthe parties so that the Court may determine whether there is complete diversity, no later thanThursday, October 10, 2019.. Signed by Judge Xavier Rodriguez. (mgr) (Entered: 09/27/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUPPLEMENT to #1 Notice of Removal, (Supplement to JS44 Cover Sheet) by Roy E. (Eddie) Aguilar, Terry Booker, Colt Oilfield Services, LLC, Total Tank Systems, LLC. (Castleman, Jenna) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketIf ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Chestney (bc) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Xavier Rodriguez. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (bc) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Total Tank Systems, LLC, Colt Oilfield Services, LLC, Terry Booker, Roy E. (Eddie) Aguilar (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-12651143), filed by Total Tank Systems, LLC, Colt Oilfield Services, LLC, Terry Booker, Roy E. (Eddie) Aguilar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Castleman, Jenna) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less