This case was last updated from PACER on 10/11/2021 at 07:01:58 (UTC).

Lisa Mosqueda v. Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/14/2021 Lisa Mosqueda filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alka Sagar and Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-04811

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Alka Sagar

Presiding Judge

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lisa Mosqueda

Defendants

Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.

AT&T Services, Inc.

DOES 1 through 10, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Nicholas Adam West

Attorney at McKennon Law Group APC

20321 Sw Birch Street Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Robert J McKennon

Attorney at McKennon Law Group PC

20321 Sw Birch Street Suite 200

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Defendant Attorneys

Laurie E Sherwood

Attorney at WFBM LLP

19900 Macarthur Boulevard Suite 1150

Irvine, CA 92612

Laurie E. Sherwood

Attorney at WFBM LLP

One Sansome Street Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Katherine Paige Gardiner

Attorney at WFBM LLP

1 Sansome Street, Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94104

Stacey A. Campbell

Attorney at Campbell Litigation P.C.

1410 North High Street

Denver, CO 80218

 

Court Documents

#36

(#36) ORDER RE: JOINT BRIEFING SCHEDULING by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: On 9/14/2021, the parties submitted the joint briefing schedule below #35 . The Court hereby sets the briefing schedule as follows: Opening Briefs shall be submitted by no later than 12/17/2021; Responsive Briefs shall be submitted by no later than 1/7/2022. (gk) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

35 #1

Proposed Order

35 #35

Main Document

#33

(#33) ORDER re Motions for Summary Judgment by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr, (vcr) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

#32

(#32) PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

31 #1

Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation to Vacate September 10, 2021 Scheduling Con

31 #31

Main Document

#34

(#34) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO VACATE 9/10/2021 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND SETTING COURT TRIAL ON 1/28/2022. by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Upon Stipulation #30 , the Court vacates the 9/10/2021 Mandatory Scheduling Conference and sets the Bench Trial for 1/28/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. By 9/17/2021, the parties are ordered to submit a joint briefing schedule for all filings in advance of trial--with the last filing to be no later than 1/7/2022. (gk) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#22

(#30) Joint STIPULATION to Vacate Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #22 filed by Defendants AT&T Services, Inc., Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc..(Campbell, Stacey) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

#10

(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa Mosqueda, upon Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. served on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lindsey Barrientez, Person Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

#5

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Mosqueda. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#4

(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Mosqueda. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#3

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Mosqueda. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#2

(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Mosqueda. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

#1

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants AT&T Services, Inc., Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Sedgwick) (jtil) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) ORDER RE: JOINT BRIEFING SCHEDULING by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: On 9/14/2021, the parties submitted the joint briefing schedule below #35 . The Court hereby sets the briefing schedule as follows: Opening Briefs shall be submitted by no later than 12/17/2021; Responsive Briefs shall be submitted by no later than 1/7/2022. (gk) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE Joint Briefing Scheduling filed by Plaintiff Lisa Mosqueda. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ORDER re Motions for Summary Judgment by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr, (vcr) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) PRETRIAL AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. (vcr) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Joint STIPULATION to Vacate Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #22 filed by Defendants AT&T Services, Inc., Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Regarding Stipulation to Vacate September 10, 2021 Scheduling Conference)(Campbell, Stacey) (Entered: 09/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO VACATE 9/10/2021 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND SETTING COURT TRIAL ON 1/28/2022. by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr.: Upon Stipulation #30 , the Court vacates the 9/10/2021 Mandatory Scheduling Conference and sets the Bench Trial for 1/28/2022 08:30 AM before Judge Stanley Blumenfeld Jr. By 9/17/2021, the parties are ordered to submit a joint briefing schedule for all filings in advance of trial--with the last filing to be no later than 1/7/2022. (gk) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) Joint STIPULATION to Vacate Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only, #22 filed by Defendants AT&T Services, Inc., Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc..(Campbell, Stacey) (Entered: 09/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan filed by Plaintiff Lisa Mosqueda.. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 08/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER by Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Stacey A. Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants AT&T Services, Inc. and Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., designating Katherine P. Gardiner and Laurie E. Sherwood as local counsel #26 . (gk) (Entered: 08/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) DECLARATION of Stacey A. Campbell in support of APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Stacey A. Campbell to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-31816108) #26 filed by Defendant AT&T Services, Inc.. (Gardiner, Katherine) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa Mosqueda, upon Defendant AT&T Services, Inc. served on 6/25/2021, answer due 7/16/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lindsey Barrientez, Person Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • Docket(#9) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: The parties are advised that the Court has updated its standing orders effective June 15, 2021 (i.e., Standing Order for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., Mandatory Scheduling Conference (MSC) Order, Order Re: Motions for Summary Judgment, Pretrial and Trial Order). These orders apply to all pending cases, except as follows: (1) the updated Order Re: Motions for Summary Judgment (MSJ) does not apply to any MSJ filed on or before July 27, 2021; and (2) the updated Pretrial and Trial Order does not apply to any case with a pretrial conference set on or before July 22, 2021. The parties are directed to read and comply with all these standing orders except as noted in the prior sentence. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rrey) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants AT&T Services, Inc., Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Sedgwick) (jtil) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil) (Entered: 06/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Mosqueda. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #3 filed by Plaintiff Lisa Mosqueda. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lisa Mosqueda, (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lisa Mosqueda. (McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-31459192 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Lisa Mosqueda. (Attorney Robert J McKennon added to party Lisa Mosqueda(pty:pla))(McKennon, Robert) (Entered: 06/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SEDGWICK CLAIMS MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC. THIRD-PARTY ADMINISTRATOR INSURED BY is a litigant

Latest cases where AT&T Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicholas Adam West

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert John McKennon