Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 04/15/2021 at 14:44:39 (UTC).

Lisa Douglass v. United States of America et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2020 Lisa Douglass filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. McDermott, Dale S. Fischer and George H. Wu. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-06448

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

Presiding Judges

Dale S. Fischer

George H. Wu

 

Party Details

Defendants

Sue Peters

Dina Douglass

Sue Douglass

Kenneth Lombino

John Douglas

Mark Burnette

David Geffen

Wolfe Air

Ethos Laboratories and UC Regents

Exxon

Los Angeles Times

G.P.P., Inc. doing business as Guardian Innovative Solutions

Andrew Frankel

U.S. Air Force

New York Board of Finance and Retirement

Rick Burkle

Agent Colin McGuiness

Bonei Olam

Trina Saunders

L Brands

170 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

Darren V Pang

Attorney at Peterson Bradford Burkwitz LLP

100 North First Street Suite 300

Burbank, CA 91502

Allison Lenore Jones

Attorney at Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

633 West Fifth Street 52Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Avi Burkwitz

Attorney at Peterson Bradford Burkwitz LLP

100 North First Street Suite 300

Burbank, CA 91502

Patrick J Cain

Attorney at Smith Gambrell and Russell LLP

444 South Flower Street Suite 1700

Los Angeles, CA 90071-2901

Jeffrey L Goss

Attorney at Office of the Los Angeles City Attorney

200 N Main St, Rm 675

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Louis H De Haas

Attorney at La Follette Johnson De Haas Fesler Silberberg & Ames

865 S Figueroa St, Ste 3100

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5443

Nasar M Khan

Attorney at Locke Lord LLP

300 South Grand Avenue Suite 2600

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Adam L Robinson

Attorney at LaFollette Johnson DeHaas Fesler and Ames

865 South Figueroa Street 32Nd Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017-5431

Kevin W Alexander

Attorney at Gordon Rees Sccully Mansukhani LLP

101 W Broadway Suite 2000

San Diego, CA 92101

Anjani Mandavia

Attorney at Mandavia and Ephraim LLP

10250 Constellation Boulevard Suite 2900

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Sarah L Overton

Attorney at Cummings McClorey Davis and Acho

3801 University Avenue Suite 560

Riverside, CA 92501

Janine K Jeffery

Attorney at Reily and Jeffery Inc

5900 Canoga Avenue Suite 350

Woodland Hills, CA 91367

David H Kramer

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati PC

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304-1050

Salwa Syeda Kamal

Attorney at McGuireWoods LLP

Two Embarcadero Center Suite 1300

San Francisco, CA 94111

Dylan Byrd

Attorney at Wilson Sonsini Goodrich and Rosati

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

 

Court Documents

#64

(#64) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #63 REQUEST to Seal Case. Having shown good cause to redact the exhibit, the Court GRANTS the order to seal the entire pleading #1 from public view as it contains identifying information. (mrgo) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#62

(#62) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) #13 ; and DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #18 by Judge George H. Wu: Based on the foregoing discussion, the Court GRANTS the motion. The complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to all defendants (See minutes for further details) ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (yl) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

40 #1

Proposed Order

18 #1

Proposed Order [Proposed] Order re: Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff

#18

(#62) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) #13 ; and DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #18 by Judge George H. Wu: Based on the foregoing discussion, the Court GRANTS the motion. The complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to all defendants (See minutes for further details) ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (yl) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

13 #2

Proposed Order

13 #1

Memorandum of Points and Authorities

#13

(#62) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) #13 ; and DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #18 by Judge George H. Wu: Based on the foregoing discussion, the Court GRANTS the motion. The complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to all defendants (See minutes for further details) ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (yl) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

#7

(#7) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details). (et) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer to the calendar of Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-06448 GW(JEMx). (rn) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Lisa Douglass. (esa) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#2

(#2) 21/60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Daniel Ahn, Wolfe Air, Alcoholics Anonymous World Conference, Amerixcan Academy of Dramatic Arts, Annheuser Busch, Babak Azzisadeh, Narbeh Bagdasarian, Bank of America, Xavier Becerra, Priyanka Bhanot, Mohammed Bin Salman, Boeing, British Museum of Art, Edgar Bronfman, Rick Burkle, Mark Burnette, CLV Holdings, CUREUS, Patrick Cain, Cal-Quake, Andre Calantzopoulos, California Commission On Peace Officerr Standards and Traning-POST-torture of children, California Department of Insurance, Nestor Cambell, Campus Living Villages, Inc., Nick Cave, Cedars Sinai Health Care Foundation, Central Casting Entertainment Partners, Church of Scientology, Citibank, N.A., City of London Corporation, Cordence Worldwide, Mike Coulter, Creative Artists Agency, Andrew Cuomo, Aldy Damian, De Beers Consolidated Mines, Louis Dehaas, Del Weston AOF Film, International, Johnny Depp, John Douglas, Dina Douglass, Lisa Douglass, Sue Douglass, Dupont Corporation, Elsevier, Inc., Carol Ann Emquies, Ethos Laboratories and UC Regents, Exxon, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Facebook, Will Farrell, Fox Sports, Francis, Andrew Frankel, G.P.P., Inc., Alice Gambrell, Eric Garcetti, David Geffen, Gordon Getty, Frank Gibson, Yosef Goldberger, Golden Bridge Yoga, Mark Goldstein, Emily Green, Terry Green, Guardian Protection Products, Inc., Vinh Ha, Harvard Corporation, Hilton Hotel International, Ronnie Holman, Maria Hovsepian, Indian Health, International Busniess Machines, Lucian Ion, Jimmy Iovine, Kareem Abdul Jabaar, Jewish Telegraph Agnecy, La Follette Johnson, Kainser Family Foundation, Frank Kamer, Neva Kaya, Nicole Kelly, Gurmukh Kaur Khalsa, Gurushabd Singh Khalsa, Martin G. King, Mark Knowles, L Brands, LA Peer Pediatrics, Michele Latiolais, Greg Lauren, Arthur Levinson, Lockheed Martin, Kenneth Lombino, Los Angeles Community College Board of Trustees, Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, Los Angeles Museum of Art, Los Angeles Times, Los Angeles Unified School District, Rob Lowe, MGM Resorts, MGM Resorts, Steven Mandel, Marvel, Sharon McCutcheon, Colin McGuiness, Medtronic, Merrill Lynch, Michigan Animal Humane Society, Microsoft, Shelby Miner, David Miscavage, Michel Moore, Rupert Murdoch, Music Cares, Elon Musk, NBC Universal Media, National Amusements, National Football League, Navient, Netflix, New York Board of Finance and Retirement, New York Psychiatric Institute, New York State, New York Times, Gavin Newsom, Nike, Bonei Olam, Jacek Olczak, Nathan Olsen, On Demand, Inc., PEW Research, Larry Page, Paris Review, Amy Pascal, Nancy Pelosi, Shelly Perluss, Sue Peters, Philip Morris International Inc., Playboy, RPM International, Inc., RPM Wood Finishes Group, Inc., Damone Roberts, Rockefeller Foundation, Gidon Rosman, Leigh Rothschild, Rothschild Patent Imaging, Rothschild and Co., Mark Rubin, San Antonio Military, Trina Saunders, Schlomo, Schnur, Shaw Jonathan, Sony Music Entertainment, Chia Soo, Brad Spellberg, Gwen Stefani, Lane Thaut, The Getty Trust, The University Board of Trustees Maharishi University Management, The Vatican, The Walt Disney Corporation, Kyle Todd, U.S. Air Force, US Department of Justice, USAA Financial Services, United States of America, Universal Music, University of California Board of Regents, Mark Urata, Paz Vega, Warner Brothers, Kanye West, Les Wexner, Wells Weymouth, Gretchen Whitmer, Gil Burk Witz, Susan Wojicki, Alfre Woodard, World Bank Group, Writer's Guild, Esma Younis, Mark Zuckerberg. (esa) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

1 #2

CV71

1 #1

part 2

#1

(#55) [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 58] ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Defendant Bank of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Salwa Syeda Kamal added to party Bank of America(pty:dft))(Kamal, Salwa) Modified on 9/2/2020 (mrgo). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

90 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting #63 REQUEST to Seal Case. Having shown good cause to redact the exhibit, the Court GRANTS the order to seal the entire pleading #1 from public view as it contains identifying information. (mrgo) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) REQUEST to Seal Case filed by plaintiff Lisa M Douglass. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Douglass, Lisa) (Entered: 10/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS)RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT PURSUANT TO RULE 12(b)(6) #13 ; and DEFENDANT UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT #18 by Judge George H. Wu: Based on the foregoing discussion, the Court GRANTS the motion. The complaint is dismissed with prejudice as to all defendants (See minutes for further details) ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated ) (yl) (Entered: 09/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #40 filed by Defendants Google, Inc., Larry Page, Susan Wojicki. (Kramer, David) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Larry Page, Susan Wojicki, Google, Inc., (Attorney David H Kramer added to party Larry Page (pty:dft), Attorney David H Kramer added to party Susan Wojicki(pty:dft), Attorney David H Kramer added to party Google, Inc.(pty:dft))(Kramer, David) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Bank of America. Motion set for hearing on 10/1/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kamal, Salwa) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) RESPONSE BY THE COURT TO NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES IN ELECTRONICALLY FILED DOCUMENTS RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #55 by Clerk of Court. Docket No. 55 is stricken for the reason(s) stated in the Notice #57 filed on September 2, 2020. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #55 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Motions and Related Filings > Applications/Ex Parte Applications/Motions/Petitions/Requests > Motions > Dismiss. Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): Document attached to this entry is a motion and not an answer.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Bank of America identifying Bank of America Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Kamal, Salwa) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) [DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER DOC. NO. 58] ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Defendant Bank of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Salwa Syeda Kamal added to party Bank of America(pty:dft))(Kamal, Salwa) Modified on 9/2/2020 (mrgo). (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: mailed to Hi Holiness Pope Francis, Apostolic Palace, Vatican City, 000120 on 7/30/2020. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: mailed to Debeers Group, UK, 20 Carlton House Terrace, London, SW1Y 5AN, UK on 7/30/2020. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RECEIPT FOR FOREIGN SERVICE from U. S. Post Office for documents Re: mailed to General Counsel, 150 London Wall, Guildhall, PO Box 270, London EC2P 2EJ on 7/30/2020. (mrgo) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS BEFORE JUDGE GEORGE H. WU by Judge George H. Wu. (See document for details). (et) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case transferred from Judge Dale S. Fischer to the calendar of Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-06448 GW(JEMx). (rn) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Lisa Douglass. (esa) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) 21/60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Daniel Ahn, Wolfe Air, Alcoholics Anonymous World Conference, Amerixcan Academy of Dramatic Arts, Annheuser Busch, Babak Azzisadeh, Narbeh Bagdasarian, Bank of America, Xavier Becerra, Priyanka Bhanot, Mohammed Bin Salman, Boeing, British Museum of Art, Edgar Bronfman, Rick Burkle, Mark Burnette, CLV Holdings, CUREUS, Patrick Cain, Cal-Quake, Andre Calantzopoulos, California Commission On Peace Officerr Standards and Traning-POST-torture of children, California Department of Insurance, Nestor Cambell, Campus Living Villages, Inc., Nick Cave, Cedars Sinai Health Care Foundation, Central Casting Entertainment Partners, Church of Scientology, Citibank, N.A., City of London Corporation, Cordence Worldwide, Mike Coulter, Creative Artists Agency, Andrew Cuomo, Aldy Damian, De Beers Consolidated Mines, Louis Dehaas, Del Weston AOF Film, International, Johnny Depp, John Douglas, Dina Douglass, Lisa Douglass, Sue Douglass, Dupont Corporation, Elsevier, Inc., Carol Ann Emquies, Ethos Laboratories and UC Regents, Exxon, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Facebook, Will Farrell, Fox Sports, Francis, Andrew Frankel, G.P.P., Inc., Alice Gambrell, Eric Garcetti, David Geffen, Gordon Getty, Frank Gibson, Yosef Goldberger, Golden Bridge Yoga, Mark Goldstein, Emily Green, Terry Green, Guardian Protection Products, Inc., Vinh Ha, Harvard Corporation, Hilton Hotel International, Ronnie Holman, Maria Hovsepian, Indian Health, International Busniess Machines, Lucian Ion, Jimmy Iovine, Kareem Abdul Jabaar, Jewish Telegraph Agnecy, La Follette Johnson, Kainser Family Foundation, Frank Kamer, Neva Kaya, Nicole Kelly, Gurmukh Kaur Khalsa, Gurushabd Singh Khalsa, Martin G. King, Mark Knowles, L Brands, LA Peer Pediatrics, Michele Latiolais, Greg Lauren, Arthur Levinson, Lockheed Martin, Kenneth Lombino, Los Angeles Community College Board of Trustees, Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, Los Angeles Museum of Art, Los Angeles Times, Los Angeles Unified School District, Rob Lowe, MGM Resorts, MGM Resorts, Steven Mandel, Marvel, Sharon McCutcheon, Colin McGuiness, Medtronic, Merrill Lynch, Michigan Animal Humane Society, Microsoft, Shelby Miner, David Miscavage, Michel Moore, Rupert Murdoch, Music Cares, Elon Musk, NBC Universal Media, National Amusements, National Football League, Navient, Netflix, New York Board of Finance and Retirement, New York Psychiatric Institute, New York State, New York Times, Gavin Newsom, Nike, Bonei Olam, Jacek Olczak, Nathan Olsen, On Demand, Inc., PEW Research, Larry Page, Paris Review, Amy Pascal, Nancy Pelosi, Shelly Perluss, Sue Peters, Philip Morris International Inc., Playboy, RPM International, Inc., RPM Wood Finishes Group, Inc., Damone Roberts, Rockefeller Foundation, Gidon Rosman, Leigh Rothschild, Rothschild Patent Imaging, Rothschild and Co., Mark Rubin, San Antonio Military, Trina Saunders, Schlomo, Schnur, Shaw Jonathan, Sony Music Entertainment, Chia Soo, Brad Spellberg, Gwen Stefani, Lane Thaut, The Getty Trust, The University Board of Trustees Maharishi University Management, The Vatican, The Walt Disney Corporation, Kyle Todd, U.S. Air Force, US Department of Justice, USAA Financial Services, United States of America, Universal Music, University of California Board of Regents, Mark Urata, Paz Vega, Warner Brothers, Kanye West, Les Wexner, Wells Weymouth, Gretchen Whitmer, Gil Burk Witz, Susan Wojicki, Alfre Woodard, World Bank Group, Writer's Guild, Esma Younis, Mark Zuckerberg. (esa) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against defendants 1-1000 Does, Daniel Ahn, Wolfe Air, Alcoholics Anonymous World Conference, Amerixcan Academy of Dramatic Arts, Annheuser Busch, Babak Azzisadeh, Narbeh Bagdasarian, Bank of America, Xavier Becerra, Priyanka Bhanot, Mohammed Bin Salman, Boeing, British Museum of Art, Edgar Bronfman, Rick Burkle, Mark Burnette, CLV Holdings, CUREUS, Patrick Cain, Cal-Quake, Andre Calantzopoulos, California Commission On Peace Officerr Standards and Traning-POST-torture of children, California Department of Insurance, Nestor Cambell, Campus Living Villages, Inc., Nick Cave, Cedars Sinai Health Care Foundation, Central Casting Entertainment Partners, Church of Scientology, Citibank, N.A., City of London Corporation, Cordence Worldwide, Mike Coulter, Creative Artists Agency, Andrew Cuomo, Aldy Damian, De Beers Consolidated Mines, Louis Dehaas, Del Weston AOF Film, International, Johnny Depp, John Douglas, Dina Douglass, Sue Douglass, Dupont Corporation, Elsevier, Inc., Carol Ann Emquies, Ethos Laboratories and UC Regents, Exxon, Exxon Mobil Corporation, Facebook, Will Farrell, Fox Sports, Francis, Andrew Frankel, G.P.P., Inc., Alice Gambrell, Eric Garcetti, David Geffen, Gordon Getty, Frank Gibson, Yosef Goldberger, Golden Bridge Yoga, Mark Goldstein, Emily Green, Terry Green, Guardian Protection Products, Inc., Vinh Ha, Harvard Corporation, Hilton Hotel International, Ronnie Holman, Maria Hovsepian, Indian Health, International Busniess Machines, Lucian Ion, Jimmy Iovine, Kareem Abdul Jabaar, Jewish Telegraph Agnecy, La Follette Johnson, Kainser Family Foundation, Frank Kamer, Neva Kaya, Nicole Kelly, Gurmukh Kaur Khalsa, Gurushabd Singh Khalsa, Martin G. King, Mark Knowles, L Brands, LA Peer Pediatrics, Michele Latiolais, Greg Lauren, Arthur Levinson, Lockheed Martin, Kenneth Lombino, Los Angeles Community College Board of Trustees, Los Angeles County Board of Supervisors, Los Angeles Museum of Art, Los Angeles Times, Los Angeles Unified School District, Rob Lowe, MGM Resorts, MGM Resorts, Steven Mandel, Marvel, Sharon McCutcheon, Colin McGuiness, Medtronic, Merrill Lynch, Michigan Animal Humane Society, Microsoft, Shelby Miner, David Miscavage, Michel Moore, Rupert Murdoch, Music Cares, Elon Musk, NBC Universal Media, National Amusements, National Football League, Navient, Netflix, New York Board of Finance and Retirement, New York Psychiatric Institute, New York State, New York Times, Gavin Newsom, Nike, Bonei Olam, Jacek Olczak, Nathan Olsen, On Demand, Inc., PEW Research, Larry Page, Paris Review, Amy Pascal, Nancy Pelosi, Shelly Perluss, Sue Peters, Philip Morris International Inc., Playboy, RPM International, Inc., RPM Wood Finishes Group, Inc., Damone Roberts, Rockefeller Foundation, Gidon Rosman, Leigh Rothschild, Rothschild Patent Imaging, Rothschild and Co., Mark Rubin, San Antonio Military, Trina Saunders, Schlomo, Schnur, Shaw Jonathan, Sony Music Entertainment, Chia Soo, Brad Spellberg, Gwen Stefani, Lane Thaut, The Getty Trust, The University Board of Trustees Maharishi University Management, The Vatican, The Walt Disney Corporation, Kyle Todd, U.S. Air Force, US Department of Justice, USAA Financial Services, United States of America, Universal Music, University of California Board of Regents, Mark Urata, Paz Vega, Warner Brothers, Kanye West, Les Wexner, Wells Weymouth, Gretchen Whitmer, Gil Burk Witz, Susan Wojicki, Alfre Woodard, World Bank Group, Writer's Guild, Esma Younis, Mark Zuckerberg.Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott, (Filing fee $ 400 paid), Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Lisa Douglass. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 CV71) (esa) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where G.P.P., Inc. doing business as Guardian Innovative Solutions is a litigant

Latest cases where Exxon is a litigant

Latest cases where L BRANDS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where US Air Force is a litigant