This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/13/2022 at 10:31:02 (UTC).

Lisa Corson v. Folded Hills 2006, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 Lisa Corson filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Folded Hills 2006, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are R. Gary Klausner and Pedro V. Castillo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-01696

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Pedro V. Castillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LISA CORSON

Defendants

FOLDED HILLS 2006, LLC d/b/a FOLDED HILLS WINERY

DOES 1 through 10 inclusive

Folded Hills 2006, LLC doing business as Folded Hills Winery

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mathew K Higbee

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

Ryan E Carreon

Attorney at Higbee and Associates

1504 Brookhollow Drive Suite 112

Santa Ana, CA 92705

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit A-B

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LISA CORSON. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff LISA CORSON. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#4

(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by LISA CORSON. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (rolm) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rolm) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#7

(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (rolm) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Folded Hills 2006, LLC. (rolm) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#9

(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-01696 RGK(PVCx). (rn) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#10

(#10) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson, (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#12

(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mathew K Higbee counsel for Plaintiff Lisa Corson. Adding Ryan E. Carreon as counsel of record for Lisa Corson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#13

(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson, upon Defendant Folded Hills 2006, LLC served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Edward J. Peterson - Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/27/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

15 #15

Main Document

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. Mailed closing report to the current address of the Copyright Office: U.S. Copyright Office 101 Independence Ave. S.E., Washington, D.C. 20559-6000. (Closing). (Attachments: #1 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal) (jp) (Entered: 04/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson, upon Defendant Folded Hills 2006, LLC served on 3/23/2022, answer due 4/13/2022. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Edward J. Peterson - Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mathew K Higbee counsel for Plaintiff Lisa Corson. Adding Ryan E. Carreon as counsel of record for Lisa Corson for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lisa Corson, (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (jre) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Christina A. Snyder. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 21-01. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge R. Gary Klausner for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:22-cv-01696 RGK(PVCx). (rn) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendant Folded Hills 2006, LLC. (rolm) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (rolm) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (rolm) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (rolm) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by LISA CORSON. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff LISA CORSON. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff LISA CORSON. (Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32945312 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff LISA CORSON. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B) (Attorney Mathew K Higbee added to party LISA CORSON(pty:pla))(Higbee, Mathew) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mathew K Higbee