This case was last updated from PACER on 10/03/2020 at 09:54:16 (UTC).

Lipuma v. Switzer

Case Summary

On 08/04/2020 Lipuma filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Switzer. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judge overseeing this case is Michael M. Mihm. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-04170

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Michael M. Mihm

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Lipuma

Tinley Park, IL 60477

Defendant

Justin Switzer

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Joseph Lipuma. Responses due by 10/2/2020 (KM, ilcd) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

5 #1

17-4041 Merit Review Order

#5

(#5) MOTION to Admit Merit Review Order in Case 17-4041 by Plaintiff Joseph Lipuma. Responses due by 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 17-4041 Merit Review Order)(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 20-4170 with 17-4041 by Plaintiff Joseph Lipuma. Responses due by 8/18/2020. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

3 #1

Tax Form

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Joseph Lipuma. (Attachments: #1 Tax Form)(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Michael Mihm. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

1 #1

Email to Attorney

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Justin Switzer, filed by Joseph Lipuma. (Attachments: #1 Email to Attorney)(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Joseph Lipuma. Responses due by 10/2/2020 (KM, ilcd) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Admit Merit Review Order in Case 17-4041 by Plaintiff Joseph Lipuma. Responses due by 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 17-4041 Merit Review Order)(DS, ilcd) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION to Consolidate Cases 20-4170 with 17-4041 by Plaintiff Joseph Lipuma. Responses due by 8/18/2020. (DS, ilcd) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Joseph Lipuma. (Attachments: #1 Tax Form)(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Michael Mihm. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Urbana Division, 201 S Vine Street, Urbana, IL 61802.Merit Review Deadline set for 8/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Justin Switzer, filed by Joseph Lipuma. (Attachments: #1 Email to Attorney)(KE, ilcd) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less