This case was last updated from PACER on 11/15/2019 at 07:42:15 (UTC).

Lippert v. McFarland

Case Summary

On 09/16/2019 Lippert filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against McFarland. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is David C. Nye. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00354

  • Filing Date:

    09/16/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David C. Nye

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert S. Lippert

Boise, ID 83707

Defendant

Joanna McFarland

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents by Plaintiff Robert S. Lippert. Responses due by 11/6/2019. (jd) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

#8

(#8) September 24, 2019 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Robert S. Lippert. (jd)

#7

(#7) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis entitled "Notice to proceed without Cost to Plaintiff in this federal criminal action" by Plaintiff Robert S. Lippert. Responses due by 10/17/2019 (jd)

#6

(#6) NOTICE to correct Plaintiff's Mailing Address by Robert S. Lippert (Address updated) (jd)

#5

(#5) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)

4 #1

Exhibit

#4

(#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Robert S. Lippert. Responses due by 10/4/2019 (kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2019: #1 Exhibit) (kt). (Entered: 09/16/2019)

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Joanna McFarland, filed by Robert S. Lippert.(kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2019: #1 Exhibit) (kt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2019: #2 Exhibit) (kt). (Entered: 09/16/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents by Plaintiff Robert S. Lippert. Responses due by 11/6/2019. (jd) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2019
  • CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Please disregard docket number 2 as it was entered in error. (kt)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) September 24, 2019 SUPPLEMENT by Plaintiff Robert S. Lippert. (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis entitled "Notice to proceed without Cost to Plaintiff in this federal criminal action" by Plaintiff Robert S. Lippert. Responses due by 10/17/2019 (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE to correct Plaintiff's Mailing Address by Robert S. Lippert (Address updated) (jd)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER of Conditional Filing - (jp)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • (#3) **Error generated, please disregard.** ORDER of Conditional Filing -(kt) Modified on 9/16/2019 (kt).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION by Plaintiff Robert S. Lippert. Responses due by 10/4/2019 (kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2019: #1 Exhibit) (kt). (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • (#2) Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (kt) (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Joanna McFarland, filed by Robert S. Lippert.(kt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2019: #1 Exhibit) (kt). (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/16/2019: #2 Exhibit) (kt). (Entered: 09/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.