This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/26/2021 at 09:01:32 (UTC).

Lippert v. Kohn et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 Lippert filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Kohn. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is David W. Dugan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00423

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David W. Dugan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Don Lippert

Sumner, IL 62466

Defendants

Deanna Brookhart

Lacie Livingston

Travis Bayler

Ms. Walker

John Does 1-4

Rob Jeffreys

Jeremy Kohn

Jane Does 1-4

 

Court Documents

#4

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

(#3) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 21-423-DWD. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $402.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 4/28/2021. (jaj) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#2

(#2) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 4/28/2021. Consent due by 5/19/2021 (jaj) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Don Lippert.(jaj) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE - sealed pending receipt from all parties. (jaj) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 402.00, receipt number 34625108021 (clt) (Entered: 05/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE AND ORDER: The Court has received your Complaint. Your case number is 21-423-DWD. Within 30 days of the entry of this Order, you are ORDERED to submit the $402.00 filing fee or a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee. If you file a motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee, the Court must review your trust fund account statement for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Thus, you must have the Trust Fund Officer at your facility complete the attached certification and provide a copy of your trust fund account statement (or institutional equivalent). If you fail to pay the filing fee or submit the motion to proceed without prepayment of the filing fee by the deadline, the case will be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. FED. R. CIV. P. 41(b); Sperow v. Melvin, 153 F.3d 780, 781 (7th Cir. 1998). All mail should be sent to: Clerk's Office, U.S. District Court, 750 Missouri Avenue, East St. Louis, IL 62201. Finally, you are advised that if your address changes, you must notify the Court within seven days of the change by filing a Notice of Change of Address. Failure to do so could result in the dismissal of your case. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 4/28/2021. (jaj) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE FROM CLERK Instructing Plaintiff to file Notice and Consent to Proceed Before A Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form: Pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257, within 21 days of this Notice, you must file the attached form indicating your consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent. Consent/Non-Consent to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form sent to Plaintiff on 4/28/2021. Consent due by 5/19/2021 (jaj) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Don Lippert.(jaj) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Ms. Walker is a litigant