Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/28/2021 at 08:02:21 (UTC).

Lipetz et al v. Unilever United States, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 Lipetz filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Unilever United States, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are John Z. Lee and Gary Feinerman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01696

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

John Z. Lee

Gary Feinerman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ROBYN LIPETZ

SHANNON KEENER

Defendants

Unilever United States Inc.

Conopco, Inc. d/b/a Unilever Home & Personal Care USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Andrew J Sciolla

Attorney at Pogust Braslow & Millrood, LLC

Eight Tower Bridge, Suite 940, 161 Washington Street

Conshohocken, PA 19428

Gary S. Graifman

Attorney at Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, P.c.

210 Summit Avenue

Montvale, NJ 07645

Jonathan Shub

Attorney at Shub Law Firm LLC

134 Kings Highway East, Second Floor

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

Melissa R. Emert

Attorney at Kantrowitz, Goldhamer & Graifman, P.C.

747 Chestnut Ridge Road, Suite 200

Chestnut Ridge, NY 10977

Kevin Laukaitis

Attorney at Shub Law Firm LLC

134 Kings Highway East, Second Floor

Haddonfield, NJ 08033

Defendant Attorneys

RISA DREXLER

Attorney at KELLEY DRYE & WARREN

101 Park Ave

New York, NY 10178

Michael A Kaplan

Attorney at Lowenstein Sandler LLP

One Lowenstein Drive

Roseland, NJ 07068

Claire Cooper Kossmann

Attorney at Foley & Mansfield, PLLP

70 West Madison Street, Suite 3000

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The parties' attention is directed to the 4/13/2021 order in Castillo v. Unilever United States, Inc., No. 20 C 6786, ECF No. 32. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#19

(#19) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Gary Feinerman for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable John Z. Lee no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 04/13/2021. (rc, ) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

#17

(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:This case has been forwarded to the Executive Committee for reassignment to Judge Feinerman's calendar as related to Castillo, 20 C 6786. Status hearing set for 7/13/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

15 #1

*Restricted*

#15

(#15) RECEIVED from Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-06350 (rp) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#14

(#14) CONSENT AND ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. &1404 AND THE STAY PROVIDED UNDER LOCAL CIVIL RULE 3.2 SHALL NOT APPLY TO THIS ACTION; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/5/21. 3/5/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#13

(#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT BE EXTENDED AN ADDITIONAL THIRTY (30) DAYS UP TO AND INCLUDING MARCH 22, 2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/19/21. 1/19/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 01/19/2021)

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

No Description Available

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN LAUKAITIS on behalf of SHANNON KEENER, ROBYN LIPETZ (LAUKAITIS, KEVIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/28/2020)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHANNON KEENER, ROBYN LIPETZ. UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC. waiver sent on 12/22/2020, answer due 2/20/2021. (SHUB, JONATHAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/22/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHANNON KEENER, ROBYN LIPETZ. CONOPCO, INC. d/b/a UNILEVER HOME & PERSONAL CARE USA waiver sent on 12/22/2020, answer due 2/20/2021. (SHUB, JONATHAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/22/2020)

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:The parties' attention is directed to the 4/13/2021 order in Castillo v. Unilever United States, Inc., No. 20 C 6786, ECF No. 32. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Gary Feinerman for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable John Z. Lee no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 04/13/2021. (rc, ) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Gary Feinerman:This case has been forwarded to the Executive Committee for reassignment to Judge Feinerman's calendar as related to Castillo, 20 C 6786. Status hearing set for 7/13/2021 at 9:00 a.m. Attorneys/Parties should appear for the hearing by calling the Toll-Free Number: (877) 336-1828, Access Code: 4082461. Members of the public and media will be able to call in to listen to this hearing (use toll free number). Please, please be sure to keep your phone on mute when you are not speaking. Persons granted remote access to proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, denial of entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the Court. Mailed notice. (jlj, ) (Entered: 04/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Gary Feinerman for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable John Z. Lee no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 04/02/2021. (rc, ) (Entered: 04/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendants Conopco, Inc. d/b/a Unilever Home & Personal Care USA, Unilever United States Inc. by Claire Cooper Kossmann (Kossmann, Claire) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RECEIVED from Pennsylvania Eastern; Case Number 2:20-cv-06350 (rp) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER NO. 14 HAS BEEN MAILED TO COUNSEL, DREXLER. (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) CONSENT AND ORDER THAT THIS ACTION IS TRANSFERRED TO THE NORTHERN DISTRICT OF ILLINOIS PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. &1404 AND THE STAY PROVIDED UNDER LOCAL CIVIL RULE 3.2 SHALL NOT APPLY TO THIS ACTION; ETC.. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 3/5/21. 3/5/21 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketDOC 13 MAILED TO COUNSEL ON 1/26/2021. (kp, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT BE EXTENDED AN ADDITIONAL THIRTY (30) DAYS UP TO AND INCLUDING MARCH 22, 2021. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 1/19/21. 1/19/21 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO COUNSEL.(fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 01/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by KEVIN LAUKAITIS on behalf of SHANNON KEENER, ROBYN LIPETZ (LAUKAITIS, KEVIN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STATUS REPORT by SHANNON KEENER, ROBYN LIPETZ. (SHUB, JONATHAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHANNON KEENER, ROBYN LIPETZ. UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC. waiver sent on 12/22/2020, answer due 2/20/2021. (SHUB, JONATHAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SHANNON KEENER, ROBYN LIPETZ. CONOPCO, INC. d/b/a UNILEVER HOME & PERSONAL CARE USA waiver sent on 12/22/2020, answer due 2/20/2021. (SHUB, JONATHAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER THAT THE UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE ASSIGNED TO THE ABOVE-CAPTIONED CASE IS THE HONORABLE LYNNE A. SITARSKI. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 12/22/20. 12/22/20 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • DocketDOC 2 MAILED TO UNREPS ON 12/22/2020. (kp, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL SHALL FILE A STATUS REPORT BY WEDNESDAY, 12/23/20. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 12/18/20. 12/18/20 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREPS. (fdc) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to CONOPCO, INC. d/b/a UNILEVER HOME & PERSONAL CARE USA, UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC.. E-MAILED To: COUNSEL on 12/18/2020 (bw, ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by SHANNON KEENER, ROBYN LIPETZ. (JL ) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CONOPCO, INC. d/b/a UNILEVER HOME & PERSONAL CARE USA, UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0313-14790156.), filed by SHANNON KEENER, ROBYN LIPETZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form)(SHUB, JONATHAN) [Transferred from Pennsylvania Eastern on 3/29/2021.] (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONOPCO, INC. d/b/a UNILEVER HOME & PERSONAL CARE USA is a litigant

Latest cases where UNILEVER UNITED STATES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A. Kaplan