This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 08:35:29 (UTC).

Lionel Cannon v. United States of America

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Lionel Cannon filed an Other lawsuit against United States of America. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Sheri Pym and Jesus G. Bernal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-02337

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Sheri Pym

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lionel Cannon

Jesup, GA 31599

Cannon

2680 Highway 301 South

Jesup, GA 31599

Defendant

United States of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR

Attorney at AUSA - Office of US Attorney

312 North Spring Street

Los Angeles, CA 90012-4700

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Change of address Changing address to 2680 Hwy 301 South, Jesup GA 31599. Filed by Plaintiff Lionel Cannon. (twdb) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Change of address Changing address to Jesup Satilite Low, 2680 Hwy 301 South, Jesup, GA 31599. Filed by Plaintiff Lionel Cannon. (twdb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#1

(#1) MOTION for Return of Property filed by Plaintiff Lionel Cannon. (lh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Change of address Changing address to 2680 Hwy 301 South, Jesup GA 31599. Filed by Plaintiff Lionel Cannon. (twdb) (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Change of address Changing address to Jesup Satilite Low, 2680 Hwy 301 South, Jesup, GA 31599. Filed by Plaintiff Lionel Cannon. (twdb) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (lh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) MOTION for Return of Property filed by Plaintiff Lionel Cannon. (lh) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.