Linquet Technologies, Inc. v. Tile, Inc.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Tile, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14740701.). Filed byLinquet Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Pat 10,163,318, #2 Exhibit B - Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Claim Chart, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Chacon, Helen) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • Docket(#2) Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/10/2020. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding US Patent No. 10,163,318 (cc: form mailed to register). (Chacon, Helen) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certificate of Interested Entities by Linquet Technologies, Inc. identifying Other Affiliate Xatash Corp., Other Affiliate Yabert Capital Inc., Other Affiliate Initio Capital II Limited, Other Affiliate Zachary Levow, Other Affiliate CBinoor Inc., Other Affiliate Curiam Investments 2, LLC, Other Affiliate Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP for Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Chacon, Helen) (Filed on 7/27/2020) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/21/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2020 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 310, receipt number 0971-14746512.) filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Carter, R.) (Filed on 7/28/2020) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING #6 APPLICATION for Admission of Attorney R. Trevor Carter Pro Hac Vice representing Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins. (lmhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2020) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. Service waived by Tile, Inc. waiver sent on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Carter, R.) (Filed on 8/5/2020) (Entered: 08/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Linquet Technologies, Inc... (Carter, R.) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • Docket(#10) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case, Reassignment Order signed by Clerk on 8/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2020) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/29/2020 10:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 10/22/2020.. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/10/2020. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2020) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14793616) filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 8/10/2020) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-14793665) filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Dodge, Reid) (Filed on 8/10/2020) (Entered: 08/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #13 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to JD Schneider. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #14 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Reid E. Dodge. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2020) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah JoAnn Guske for Tile, Inc. (Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 9/16/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) FED. R. CIV. P. 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND LOCAL RULE 3-15 CERTIFICATION OF INTERESTED ENTITIES OR PERSONS filed by Tile, Inc. (Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 9/16/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) STIPULATION Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint filed by Tile, Inc.. (Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 9/16/2020) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Carter, R.) (Filed on 10/8/2020) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5 b) of discussion of ADR options (Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 10/8/2020) (Entered: 10/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Tile, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 10/29/2020. Replies due by 11/5/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Declaration of Sarah Guske, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 [Proposed] Order)(Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 10/15/2020) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Carter, R.) (Filed on 10/22/2020) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • Docket(#24) ORDER. The initial case management conference set for October 29, 2020, is continued to November 19, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. The joint case management statement is due by November 12, 2020. Signed by Judge James Donato on 10/22/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc4S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2020) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) AMENDED COMPLAINT For Patent Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against Tile, Inc.. Filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US 10,163,318, #2 Exhibit B - Demand Letter, #3 Exhibit C - Claim Chart)(Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 10/29/2020) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) Response to Defendant Tile Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 10/29/2020) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) REPLY (re #22 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint ) filed byTile, Inc.. (Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 11/5/2020) (Entered: 11/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT & [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Carter, R.) (Filed on 11/12/2020) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS AMENDED COMPLAINT; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES filed by Tile, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/17/2020 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 11/27/2020. Replies due by 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Appendix 2, #3 Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1, #5 Proposed Order)(Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 11/12/2020) (Entered: 11/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) ORDER. In light of the filing of an amended complaint, Dkt. No. #25 , the motion to dismiss the original complaint, Dkt. No. #22 , is terminated without prejudice. The motion hearing set for November 19, 2020, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/16/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2020) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2020
  • Docket(#31) ORDER. The initial case management conference set for November 19, 2020, at 10:00 a.m., will be held by Zoom Webinar. Each party should designate a lead counsel to speak at the hearing by emailing the name of their lead counsel to Judge Donato's Courtroom Deputy, Ms. Lisa Clark, at jdcrd@cand.uscourts.gov by November 18, 2020, at 12:00 p.m. California time. The names for lead counsel are needed so that Ms. Clark can identify them during the Zoom hearing when the case is called. All lead counsel must call in fifteen minutes before the hearing to test internet, video, and audio capabilities. All counsel, parties, members of the public, and press may join the webinar using the link or information below: https://cand-uscourts.zoomgov.com/j/1617171523?pwd=VWJqM2ZYT1UvNFZ0ZHNZUUhGWTBCZz09 Webinar ID: 161 717 1523 Password: 213597 Or iPhone one-tap : US: +16692545252,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# or +16468287666,,1617171523#,,1#,213597# Or Telephone: Dial (for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): US: +1 669 254 5252 or +1 646 828 7666PLEASE NOTE: Persons granted remote access to court proceedings are reminded of the general prohibition against photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings (including those held by telephone or videoconference). See General Order 58 at Paragraph III. Any recording of a court proceeding held by video or teleconference, including "screen-shots" or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Violation of these prohibitions may result in sanctions, including removal of court-issued media credentials, restricted entry to future hearings, or any other sanctions deemed necessary by the court. Please see #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom for information on preparing for and participating in a Zoom Webinar. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/17/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2020) (Entered: 11/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge James Donato: Initial Case Management Conference held on 11/19/2020. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/19/2020) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, (Filing Fee: $310.00, receipt number 0971-15221885) filed by Tile, Inc.. (Kohli, Puneet) (Filed on 11/20/2020) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE to (re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint) filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 11/27/2020) (Entered: 11/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Roy Ryoichi Oda (Oda, Mark) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) REPLY (re #29 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint ) filed byTile, Inc.. (Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 12/4/2020) (Entered: 12/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ORDER. The motion to dismiss, Dkt. No. #29 , is suitable for decision without oral argument. Civil L.R. 7-1(b). The hearing on this motion is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 12/10/2020. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2020) Modified on 12/10/2020 (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order selecting Mediation by Linquet Technologies, Inc. filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Carter, R.) (Filed on 12/14/2020) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT REGARDING CASE SCHEDULE & [PROPOSED] ORDER filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 12/14/2020) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE by Linquet Technologies, Inc. of Service of Infringement Contentions (Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 12/29/2020) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER by Judge James Donato granting #32 Motion for Pro Hac Vice as to Puneet Kohli. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2021) (Entered: 01/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/5/2021. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearing Claims Construction Hearing set for 7/1/2021 10:00 AM. Jury Selection set for 4/11/2022 09:00 AM in San Francisco, - To be determined before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 4/11/2022 09:00 AM in San Francisco, - To be determined before Judge James Donato. Pretrial Conference set for 3/24/2022 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - To be determined before Judge James Donato. Tutorial Hearing set for 6/24/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/5/2021) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/19/2020 before Judge James Donato by Tile, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 2/12/2021) (Entered: 02/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order re #42 Order filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 2/15/2021) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND/CORRECT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 2/17/2021. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/19/20, before Judge James Donato. Court Reporter Katherine Powell Sullivan, Katherine_Sullivan@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerk's Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. (Re #43 Transcript Order ) Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/18/2021. (Related documents(s) #43 ) (kapS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2021) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) JOINT STIPULATION AND MOTION TO AMEND/CORRECT SCHEDULING ORDER & [PROPOSED] ORDER re #42 Order filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 3/18/2021) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 11/19/2020 before Judge James Donato by Linquet Technologies, Inc., for Court Reporter Katherine Sullivan. (Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 3/19/2021) (Entered: 03/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO AMEND/CORRECT SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 3/23/2021. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2021) (Entered: 03/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Joint Claim Construction and Prehearing Statement filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 4/5/2021) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER Re: Discovery of Electronically Stored Information for Patent Litigation filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 4/6/2021) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ORDER. The parties' stipulated ESI order, Dkt. No. #51 , is approved, except that in those cases where the stipulated protective order conflicts with the Court's standing orders (e.g., with respect to the filing of discovery motions), the Court's standing orders will control. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/7/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2021) Modified on 6/9/2021 (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Joint MOTION for Protective Order filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. Responses due by 5/19/2021. Replies due by 5/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah Guske with Exs. 1-2, #2 Proposed Order by Linquet, #3 Proposed Order by Tile, Inc.)(Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 5/5/2021) (Entered: 05/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Tile's Notice of Motion and Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Tile, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 6/24/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 6/1/2021. Replies due by 6/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarah Guske in Support of Tile's Motion to Stay Pending Inter Partes Review, #2 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration of Sarah Guske, #3 Proposed Order)(Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 5/17/2021) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Opening Claim Construction Brief filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of JD Schneider, #2 Exhibit 1)(Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 5/18/2021) (Entered: 05/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Extend Motion to Stay Briefing Schedule filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 5/27/2021) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND MOTION TO STAY BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge James Donato on 5/27/2021. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2021) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#58) Responsive Claim Construction Brief filed by Tile, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Sarah Guske, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5)(Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 6/1/2021) (Entered: 06/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER to Extend Claim Construction and Motion to Stay Briefing Schedules filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 6/4/2021) (Entered: 06/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) ORDER. On the request to extend briefing deadlines, Dkt. No. #59 , the motion to stay, Dkt. No. #54 , is denied without prejudice as premature, and may be renewed if the PTAB institutes inter partes review. The tutorial is continued to October 7, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. California time, and the claim construction hearing is continued to October 21, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. California time. Linquet may file a reply claim construction brief by September 16, 2021. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/9/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketSet/Reset Hearing -- tutorial continued to 10/7/2021, claim construction hearing continued to 10/21/2021. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2021) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) Joint Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order & [Proposed Order] re 60 Order, #42 Order filed by Tile, Inc.. (Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 6/18/2021) (Entered: 06/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) ORDER. The request to enter a protective order, Dkt. No. #53 , is denied without prejudice. The Court will consider a fully stipulated protective order, but if the parties cannot agree on all of the order's provisions, the interim model protective order for patent cases will be entered instead. Signed by Judge James Donato on 6/30/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2021) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#63) STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER re Joint Stipulated [Proposed] Protective Order filed by Tile, Inc.. (Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 8/2/2021) (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#64) ORDER. The parties' stipulated protective order, Dkt. No. #63 , is approved, except that in those cases where the stipulated protective order conflicts with the Court's standing orders (e.g., with respect to the filing of discovery motions), the Court's standing orders will control. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/3/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2021) (Entered: 08/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#65) AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/9/2021. (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketSet Deadlines/Hearings: Close of Expert Discovery due by 4/1/2022. Close of Fact Discovery due by 2/7/2022. Designation of Experts due by 2/18/2022. Dispositive Motion due by 4/14/2022. Rebuttal Reports due by 3/18/2022. Jury Selection set for 8/8/2022 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Jury Trial set for 8/8/2022 09:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2022 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. (lrcS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2021) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#66) STIPULATION of Invalidity Contentions for U.S. Patent No. 10,163,318 filed by Tile, Inc.. (Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 8/12/2021) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#67) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER re #65 Order, Terminate Scheduling Order Deadlines Joint Stipulation to Amend Scheduling Order filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Dodge, Reid) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#68) ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS, Dkt. No. 29. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/15/2021. (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2021) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#69) RESPONSE - Reply Claim Construction Brief by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Dodge, Reid) (Filed on 9/16/2021) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • Docket(#70) ORDER. The tutorial scheduled for October 7, 2021, and the claim construction hearing scheduled for October 21, 2021, are vacated pending further developments of an amended complaint, if any. Signed by Judge James Donato on 9/17/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2021) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#71) AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) For Patent Infringement against Tile, Inc.. Filed byLinquet Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 10/8/2021) (Entered: 10/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#72) MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Tile, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 12/2/2021 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 11/5/2021. Replies due by 11/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Appendix 1, #2 Proposed Order)(Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 10/22/2021) (Entered: 10/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#73) OPPOSITION/RESPONSE (re #72 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) filed byLinquet Technologies, Inc.. (Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 11/5/2021) (Entered: 11/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#74) REPLY (re #72 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint ) filed byTile, Inc.. (Guske, Sarah) (Filed on 11/12/2021) (Entered: 11/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#75) Statement of Recent Decision by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Mentone v Digi Intl)(Dodge, Reid) (Filed on 11/16/2021) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • Docket(#76) ORDER. The motion to dismiss, Dkt. No. 72, is suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7-1(b). The hearing that was set for December 2, 2021, is vacated. Signed by Judge James Donato on 11/24/2021. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2021) (Entered: 11/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#77) NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Anne Burgess (Burgess, Katherine) (Filed on 1/26/2022) (Entered: 01/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#78) ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION to Withdraw JD Schneider as Counsel filed by Linquet Technologies, Inc.. Responses due by 4/4/2022. (Schneider, Justin) (Filed on 3/31/2022) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#79) ORDER RE STIPULATED MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF. Signed by Judge James Donato on 4/6/2022. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2022) (Entered: 04/06/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2022
  • Docket(#80) ORDER. The Court vacates all pretrial and trial dates pending further order. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/5/2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/5/2022) (Entered: 07/05/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#81) ORDER RE MOTION TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/18/2022. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#82) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Donato on 7/18/2022. (jdlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2022) (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less