This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/05/2021 at 07:59:49 (UTC).

Delroy Lino v. Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 08/06/2021 Delroy Lino filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Dolly M. Gee and Margo A. Rocconi. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-06360

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dolly M. Gee

Referral Judge

Margo A. Rocconi

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Delroy Lino

Defendants

Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., a Massachusetts limited liability company

Lonestar West Services, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company

Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc.

Lonestar West Services LLC

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gary R Carlin

Attorney at Law Offices of Gary Carlin APC

301 East Ocean Boulevard Suite 1550

Long Beach, CA 90802

Matthew C Chen

Attorney at Law Offices of Gary Carlin APC

301 East Ocean Boulevard Suite 1550

Long Beach, CA 90802

Defendant Attorneys

Nicole Andrea Naleway

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

695 Town Center Drive 15Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Angela Pak

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak and Stewart PC

695 Town Center Drive 15Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

 

Court Documents

#15

14 #3

Exhibit C- Proof of Service of Defendant's' Notice of Removal

14 #2

Exhibit B- Proof of Service of Defendants' Notice to State Court and to Pla

14 #14

Main Document

#13

#7

#6

#5

4 #2

Exhibit B- Excerpt from 2021 Judicial Caseload Profile

4 #1

Exhibit A - Answer to Complaint

4 #4

Main Document

#3

#2

1 #4

Exhibit D- Answer to Complaint

1 #3

Exhibit C- Service of Process on Lonestar West

1 #2

Exhibit B-Service of Process on Clean Harbors Environmental Services

1 #1

Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint

1 #1

Main Document

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2021
  • Docket(#16) (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court sua sponte VACATES the Scheduling Conference set on September 24, 2021. A Scheduling and Case Management Order to issue. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5 to 7 days, filed by Plaintiff Delroy Lino.. (Carlin, Gary) (Entered: 09/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) DECLARATION of Nicole A. Naleway re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., Lonestar West Services LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Defendants' Notice to Adverse Party and Clerk of the CA Superior Court of Removal of Action to US District Court, #2 Exhibit B- Proof of Service of Defendants' Notice to State Court and to Plaintiff of Filing of Notice of REmoval, #3 Exhibit C- Proof of Service of Defendant's' Notice of Removal)(Naleway, Nicole) (Entered: 08/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, 26(f)] by Judge Dolly M. Gee. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 9/10/2021. Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2021 at 9:30 a.m. (See order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (esa) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Margo A. Rocconi. (esa) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by defendants Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., Lonestar West Services LLC. (filed in state court 8/5/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 4)(esa) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Delroy Lino, upon Defendant Lonestar West Services LLC served on 7/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Montijo, Authorized accept service, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 7/9/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 3) (esa) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Delroy Lino, upon Defendant Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc. served on 7/7/2021. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon John Montijo, Authorized accept service, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (filed in state court 7/9/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 2) (esa) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., Does, Lonestar West Services LLC, Jury Demanded, filed by plaintiff Delroy Lino. (filed in state court 6/29/2021, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) (Entered: 08/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF LODGING filed Complaint re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 (Naleway, Nicole) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendants Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., a Massachusetts limited liability company, Lonestar West Services, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company. (Naleway, Nicole) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Certificate of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., a Massachusetts limited liability company, Lonestar West Services, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company re: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 (Naleway, Nicole) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., a Massachusetts limited liability company, Lonestar West Services, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company identifying Clean Harbors, Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Naleway, Nicole) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) DECLARATION of Nicole A. Naleway re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., a Massachusetts limited liability company, Lonestar West Services, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Answer to Complaint, #2 Exhibit B- Excerpt from 2021 Judicial Caseload Profile)(Naleway, Nicole) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DECLARATION of Bradley A. Carl re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,, #1 filed by Defendants Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., a Massachusetts limited liability company, Lonestar West Services, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company. (Naleway, Nicole) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., a Massachusetts limited liability company, Lonestar West Services, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company. (Naleway, Nicole) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 21STCV24050 Receipt No: ACACDC-31761130 - Fee: $402, filed by Defendants Lonestar West Services, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company, Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., a Massachusetts limited liability company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Service of Process on Clean Harbors Environmental Services, #3 Exhibit C- Service of Process on Lonestar West, #4 Exhibit D- Answer to Complaint) (Attorney Nicole Andrea Naleway added to party Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., a Massachusetts limited liability company(pty:dft), Attorney Nicole Andrea Naleway added to party Lonestar West Services, LLC, a Nevada limited liability company(pty:dft))(Naleway, Nicole) (Entered: 08/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Clean Harbors Environmental Services, Inc., a Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Nicole A. Naleway

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Angela Pak