This case was last updated from PACER on 10/17/2020 at 10:56:35 (UTC).

Robert Linnar v. CR Bard Inc et al

Case Summary

On 08/18/2020 Robert Linnar filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against CR Bard Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. McDermott, Stephen V. Wilson and Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-07486

  • Filing Date:

    08/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

Presiding Judges

Stephen V. Wilson

Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robert Linnar

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Does 1 through 100 Inclusive

CR Bard Inc

Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven Scott Schulte

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Eric Martin Przybysz

Attorney at Fears Nachawati Law Firm

5473 Bair Rd

Dallas, TX 75231

Darren McDowell

Attorney at Fears Nachawati, PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Eric M Przybysz

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75231

Arati Chauhan Furness

Attorney at Fears Nachawati PLLC

5473 Blair Road

Dallas, TX 75070

Defendant Attorneys

Jessica Junek

Attorney at Hartline Barger LLP

8750 N Central Expwy, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

Melissa Dorman Matthews

Attorney at Hartline Barger LLP

8750 N Central Expressway, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

Jordan E Jarreau

Attorney at Hartline Barger LLP

8750 N Central Expressway, Suite 1600

Dallas, TX 75231

William Jeffrey Goines

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1900 University Avenue 5Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

 

Court Documents

#56

(#56) Mail Returned addressed to Darren McDowell re Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form #31 . (et) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#55

(#55) Mail Returned addressed to Darren McDowell re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #36 . (et) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#54

(#54) Mail Returned addressed to Darren McDowell re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) #29 . (et) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#53

(#53) Mail Returned addressed to Darren McDowell re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) #28 . (et) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#36

(#55) Mail Returned addressed to Darren McDowell re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #36 . (et) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#31

(#56) Mail Returned addressed to Darren McDowell re Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form #31 . (et) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#29

(#54) Mail Returned addressed to Darren McDowell re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) #29 . (et) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#28

(#53) Mail Returned addressed to Darren McDowell re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) #28 . (et) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

#27

(#52) Mail Returned addressed to Darren McDowell re Notice of Receipt of Case Transferred in #27 . (et) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

1 #17

Exhibit(s) D-11 - Notice of Initial Dismissal Hearing

1 #8

Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition

1 #7

Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents

1 #5

Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition

1 #4

Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation

1 #3

Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement

1 #2

Cover Sheet Supplement

1 #1

Cover Sheet

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Mail Returned addressed to Darren McDowell re Pro Hac Vice Application Due (G-109) - optional html form #31 . (et) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) Mail Returned addressed to Darren McDowell re Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #36 . (et) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) Mail Returned addressed to Darren McDowell re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) #29 . (et) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) Mail Returned addressed to Darren McDowell re Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) #28 . (et) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) Mail Returned addressed to Darren McDowell re Notice of Receipt of Case Transferred in #27 . (et) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND ALL PRETRIAL DEADLINES by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #48 Motion for Discovery. IT IS ORDERED: 1. The Joint Motion to Stay Discovery and All Pretrial Deadlines is GRANTED. 2. All deadlines in this matter are STAYED until January 19, 2021. 3. The case is moved to inactive calendar. The parties are ordered to inform the Court, in writing, if settlement is not finalized. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ORDER OF THE CHIEF JUDGE (#20-110) approved by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Pursuant to the recommended procedure adopted by the Court for the CREATION OF CALENDAR of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr., this case is transferred from Judge Stephen V. Wilson to the calendar of Judge Stanley Blumenfeld, Jr for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-07486-SB-JEMx. (mrgo) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • Docket(#49) SCHEDULING NOTICE - The initial status conference previously scheduled for 09/28/2020 at 1:30 p.m. has been rescheduled to 10/5/2020 at 3:00 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 09/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION for Discovery regarding JOINT MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY AND ALL PRETRIAL DEADLINES filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order Granting Joint Motion to Stay Discovery and all Pretrial Deadlines)(Goines, William) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF MCKESSON CORPORATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc, McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF MCKESSON CORPORATION WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii))(Goines, William) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by McKesson Corporation. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 10 replaced with the flattened document on 6/17/2020) (pnp). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.] (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by McKesson Corporation re #8 MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.] (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss the Out-of-State Plaintiffs Claims for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by McKesson Corporation Attorney Jessica Junek added to party McKesson Corporation(pty:dft) (Junek, Jessica) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.] (Entered: 06/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 7 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.] (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by CR Bard Inc. (Junek, Jessica) (Main Document 6 replaced with flattened document on 6/11/2020) (awc). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.] (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. The above-referenced matter is transferred to the docket of the Honorable Judge Karen Gren Scholer, who has a related case. All future pleadings shall be filed under case number 3:20-CV-1480-S. Judge David C Godbey no longer assigned to case. (Ordered by Judge David C Godbey on 6/9/2020) (twd) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.] (Entered: 06/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Toliver). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (oyh) [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.] (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc, re #2 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Matthews, Melissa) Modified Docket Text on 6/9/2020 (oyh). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.] (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc, CR Bard Inc (Matthews, Melissa) Modified Docket Text on 6/9/2020 (oyh). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.] (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by CR Bard Inc, Bard Peripheral Vascular Inc. (Filing fee $400; receipt number 0539-10897473) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements and # Judge Specific Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Cover Sheet Supplement, #3 Exhibit(s) A - Portion of REACH Agreement, #4 Exhibit(s) B - McKesson Corporation, #5 Exhibit(s) C - 8-30-16 Romney, Kim Deposition, #6 Exhibit(s) D - Index of State Court Documents, #7 Exhibit(s) D-1 - State Court Docket Sheet, #8 Exhibit(s) D-2 - Plaintiffs' Original Petition, #9 Exhibit(s) D-3 - Civil Case Info Sheet, #10 Exhibit(s) D-4 - Citation Issued to Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc., #11 Exhibit(s) D-5 - Citation Issued to C.R. Bard, Inc., #12 Exhibit(s) D-6 - Citation Issued to McKesson Corporation, #13 Exhibit(s) D-7 - Notice of Initial Dismissal Hearing, #14 Exhibit(s) D-8 - Affidavit of Service - McKesson, #15 Exhibit(s) D-9 - Return of Service - C.R. Bard, #16 Exhibit(s) D-10 - Return of Service - Bard Peripheral, #17 Exhibit(s) D-11 - Notice of Initial Dismissal Hearing) (Matthews, Melissa) Modified Docket Text on 6/9/2020 (oyh). [Transferred from Texas Northern on 8/20/2020.] (Entered: 06/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less