This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/18/2021 at 09:52:23 (UTC).

Lingle v. Walmart, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 Lingle filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Walmart, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger and Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-00087

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger

Stephen B. Jackson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amanda Lingle

Defendant

Walmart, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michelle Schneiderheinze

Attorney at VANDERGINST LAW, P.C.

4950 38Th Avenue

Moline, IL 61265

Defendant Attorney

Benjamin Michael Weston

Attorney at LEDERER WESTON CRAIG PLC

4401 Westown Parkway, Suite 212

West Des Moines, IA 50266

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

State Court Pleadings

1 #3

Local Rule 81.A Statement

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

(#3) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Walmart, Inc..(Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Walmart, Inc.. (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

#5

(#5) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER Referring Case. See order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 11/30/2021. (h) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Initial Disclosures due by 12/17/2021. Motions to Add Parties due by 3/4/2022. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/4/2022. Plaintiff Expert Witness Disclosures due by 7/1/2022. Defendant Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/6/2022. Plaintiff Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 10/7/2022. Discovery Deadline 11/10/2022. Dispositive Motion Deadline 12/29/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2023 1:30 PM in Davenport Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Jury Trial set to begin 6/20/2023 9:00 AM for estimated 4 days in Davenport Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/30/2021. (jeb) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

#10

(#10) ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/30/2021. (jeb) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr added. Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger and Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr as referral judge no longer assigned to case. (kjw) (Entered: 12/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See order for deadlines and form. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/30/2021. (jeb) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING AND TRIAL SETTING ORDER. Initial Disclosures due by 12/17/2021. Motions to Add Parties due by 3/4/2022. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 3/4/2022. Plaintiff Expert Witness Disclosures due by 7/1/2022. Defendant Expert Witness Disclosures due by 9/6/2022. Plaintiff Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 10/7/2022. Discovery Deadline 11/10/2022. Dispositive Motion Deadline 12/29/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/17/2023 1:30 PM in Davenport Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Jury Trial set to begin 6/20/2023 9:00 AM for estimated 4 days in Davenport Courthouse before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/30/2021. (jeb) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • Docket(#8) TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr.: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/30/2021. Attorney Michelle Schneiderheinze appeared for plaintiff. Attorney Benjamin Weston appeared for defendant. Scheduling order to be entered. Court Time: 10 minutes. (jeb) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Referring Case. See order for particulars. Signed by Judge Rebecca Goodgame Ebinger on 11/30/2021. (h) (Entered: 11/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ORDER SETTNG SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference will be held November 30, 2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. To join the conference, counsel shall call 866-590-5055 and utilize access code 8811585. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen B. Jackson, Jr. on 11/18/2021. (jeb) (Entered: 11/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN AND CONSENT TO PROCEED BEFORE A MAGISTRATE . (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Corporate Disclosure/Statement of Interest by Walmart, Inc.. (Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ANSWER to Complaint Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Walmart, Inc..(Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 11/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Packet Note: Counsel should download the attached corporate disclosure packet in compliance with Local Rule 7.1 for the disclosure statements. Corporate Disclosure Statement deadline set for defendant 11/9/2021. (kjw) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart, Inc. from Scott County District Court, case number LACE134247. Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0863-4630772., filed by Walmart, Inc.. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 1/18/2022. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Local Rule 81.A Statement)(Weston, Benjamin) (Entered: 10/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Benjamin Michael Weston