This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/29/2021 at 09:52:05 (UTC).

Lingle v. M-Company Transport Inc et al

Case Summary

On 06/30/2021 Lingle filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against M-Company Transport Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Bernard M. Jones and David L. Russell. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:21-CV-00665

  • Filing Date:

    06/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Bernard M. Jones

David L. Russell

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Shannon Lingle

Defendants

M-Company Transport Inc

Michael Alvarez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Woodrow K Glass

Attorney at Ward & Glass LLP

1601 36Th Avenue Nw, Suite 100

Norman, OK 73072

Geoffrey A Tabor

Attorney at Ward & Glass LLP

1601 36Th Avenue Nw, Suite 100

Norman, OK 73072

Defendant Attorneys

Daniel K Jones

Attorney at Miller Johnson Jones Antonisse & White

500 Nw 6Th St, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102

Paulina Thompson

Attorney at Miller Johnson Jones Antonisse & White, PLLC

500 Nw 6Th Street, Suite 300

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-1219

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ORDER granting #8 Defendant's Partial Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims for negligent hiring, training, and supervision are dismissed without prejudice.. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 08/27/2021. (cr) (Entered: 08/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER granting #16 Motion for Writ, as more fully set out. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 08/25/2021. (cr) (Entered: 08/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Writ of Assistance by Shannon Lingle. (Tabor, Geoffrey) (Entered: 08/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Partial) filed by Shannon Lingle. (Tabor, Geoffrey) (Entered: 08/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) TELEPHONIC STATUS/SCHEDULING CONFERENCE DOCKET: Scheduling Conference set for 10/5/2021 09:15 AM before Honorable David L. Russell. Status Report due by 9/27/2021. (md) (Entered: 08/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER consolidating this case with Case No. CIV-21-664-R for discovery purposes only. Signed by Honorable David L. Russell on 08/13/2021. (cr) (Entered: 08/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable David L. Russell for all further proceedings. Honorable Bernard M. Jones no longer assigned to case. Signed by Honorable Bernard M. Jones on 8/12/2021. (dwl) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Michael Alvarez.(Thompson, Paulina) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF RELATED OR COMPANION CASE by All Defendants (Thompson, Paulina) (Entered: 08/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by M-Company Transport Inc.(Thompson, Paulina) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint (Partial) by M-Company Transport Inc. (Thompson, Paulina) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ENTRY of Appearance by Paulina Thompson on behalf of Michael Alvarez, M-Company Transport Inc (Thompson, Paulina) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ENTRY of Appearance by Daniel K Jones on behalf of Michael Alvarez, M-Company Transport Inc (Jones, Daniel) (Entered: 07/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shannon Lingle. Michael Alvarez served on 7/22/2021. (Glass, Woodrow) (Entered: 07/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael Alvarez. (knt) (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3714176. (Glass, Woodrow) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ENTRY of Appearance by Geoffrey A Tabor on behalf of Shannon Lingle (Tabor, Geoffrey) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Woodrow K Glass on behalf of Shannon Lingle (Glass, Woodrow) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Michael Alvarez, M-Company Transport Inc filed by Shannon Lingle. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(knt) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TRANSPORT CORPORATION OF AMERICA , INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Geoffrey A Tabor

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Woodrow K Glass