This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2019 at 09:29:45 (UTC).

Lindsey v. Gatlin et al

Case Summary

On 04/08/2019 Lindsey filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Gatlin. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian C. Wimes. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-04070

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian C. Wimes

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Faith Lindsey

Reidsville, NC 27320

Defendants

Central Bank Lake of the Ozarks

Vonda Duncan

Luke Gatlin

Genise Buechter

James Judas

Hon. Jon A. Kaltenbronn

Kathy M. Herx

Richard Caine

Linda Lawson

Administrative County Court of Miller County

James W. Mead

County Court of Miller County

Robert Steele

Rober Holtmeyer

Brian Kidwell

Ben Winfrey

Jenna Lawson

Jack Funderburk

John R. Porth

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew A. Clement

Attorney at Cook, Vetter, Doerhoff & Landwehr, P.C.

231 Madison Street

Jefferson City, MO 65101

John Terry Brooks

Attorney at Newman, Comley & Ruth, P.C. - JC

601 Monroe St., Ste. 301, P.O. Box 537

Jefferson City, MO 65102--537

Michael G Berry

Attorney at Newman, Comley & Ruth, P.C. - JC

601 Monroe St., Ste. 301, P.O. Box 537

Jefferson City, MO 65102--537

Peter A. Houser

Attorney at Missouri Attorney General's Office-JC

P.O. Box 899

Jefferson City, MO 65102

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

17 #3

Exhibit Docket Entry for Case 18ML-CR00182-01

17 #2

Exhibit Served Warrant

17 #1

Exhibit Issued Warrant

#17

#16

#15

#12

4 #1

Envelope

5 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#5

#3

2 #1

Envelope

#2

1 #2

Envelope

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) SUGGESTIONS in support re #12 MOTION to dismiss party Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement and Motion to Transfer Venue of Certain Defendants Associated with Central Bank of Lake of the Ozarks filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Defendants Richard Caine, Central Bank Lake of the Ozarks, Vonda Duncan, Jack Funderburk, Kathy M. Herx, James Judas, James W. Mead, John R. Porth. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Clement, Matthew) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) RULE 16 NOTICE. Proposed scheduling order due by 8/9/2019. Rule 26 conference due by 7/26/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/28/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom 7D, Kansas City (BCW) before District Judge Brian C. Wimes. Copy of order mailed to pro se plaintiff this date. Signed on 7/10/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION. A modification has been made to the document filed on 07/09/2019 as Document No. 13, Suggestions in Support. The document has been deleted as the incorrect document was filed. Counsel will refile the correct document. This is a text entry only - no document is attached. (Lock, Tania) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) SUGGESTIONS in support re #16 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Peter A. Houser on behalf of Defendants Genise Buechter, Jon A. Kaltenbronn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Issued Warrant, #2 Exhibit Served Warrant, #3 Exhibit Docket Entry for Case 18ML-CR00182-01)(Related document(s) #16 ) (Houser, Peter) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Peter A. Houser on behalf of Genise Buechter, Jon A. Kaltenbronn. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Houser, Peter) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of appearance by Peter A. Houser on behalf of Genise Buechter, Jon A. Kaltenbronn (Attorney Peter A. Houser added to party Genise Buechter(pty:dft), Attorney Peter A. Houser added to party Jon A. Kaltenbronn(pty:dft))(Houser, Peter) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard Caine, Central Bank Lake of the Ozarks, Vonda Duncan, Jack Funderburk, Kathy M. Herx, James Judas, James W. Mead, John R. Porth re 13 Suggestions in Support of Motion, #12 MOTION to dismiss party Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement and Motion to Transfer Venue of Certain Defendants Associated with Central Bank of Lake of the Ozarks Certificate of Service of Doc# 12 and Doc#13 mailed to Plaintiff's correct mailing address filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Defendants Richard Caine, Central Bank Lake of the Ozarks, Vonda Duncan, Jack Funderburk, Kathy M. Herx, James Judas, James W. Mead, John R. Porth. Related document: 13 Suggestions in Support of Motion, filed by Jack Funderburk, James Judas, Central Bank Lake of the Ozarks, James W. Mead, Richard Caine, Kathy M. Herx, John R. Porth, Vonda Duncan, #12 MOTION to dismiss party Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement and Motion to Transfer Venue of Certain Defendants Associated with Central Bank of Lake of the Ozarks filed by Jack Funderburk, James Judas, Central Bank Lake of the Ozarks, James W. Mead, Richard Caine, Kathy M. Herx, John R. Porth, Vonda Duncan.(Clement, Matthew) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) This document has been deleted as it was filed incorrectly. SUGGESTIONS in support re #12 MOTION to dismiss party Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement and Motion to Transfer Venue of Certain Defendants Associated with Central Bank of Lake of the Ozarks filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Defendants Richard Caine, Central Bank Lake of the Ozarks, Vonda Duncan, Jack Funderburk, Kathy M. Herx, James Judas, James W. Mead, John R. Porth. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Clement, Matthew) Modified on 7/10/2019 (Lock, Tania). (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to dismiss party Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement and Motion to Transfer Venue of Certain Defendants Associated with Central Bank of Lake of the Ozarks filed by Matthew A. Clement on behalf of Richard Caine, Central Bank Lake of the Ozarks, Vonda Duncan, Jack Funderburk, Kathy M. Herx, James Judas, James W. Mead, John R. Porth. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/23/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Matthew A. Clement added to party Richard Caine(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew A. Clement added to party Central Bank Lake of the Ozarks(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew A. Clement added to party Vonda Duncan(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew A. Clement added to party Jack Funderburk(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew A. Clement added to party Kathy M. Herx(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew A. Clement added to party James Judas(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew A. Clement added to party James W. Mead(pty:dft), Attorney Matthew A. Clement added to party John R. Porth(pty:dft))(Clement, Matthew) (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • (#11) ORDERED Defendants' Motions for Extension of Time (Docs. #9 & 10) are GRANTED. Defendants are granted leave to respond to Plaintiff's answer on or before August 1, 2019. In the future, the parties shall file motions for extension of time at least 3 days before the deadlines established by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rules and the Court orders. Signed on 7/8/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Baldwin, Joella) Modified on 7/8/2019 to reflect copy of this text entry mailed to pro se plaintiff this date. (Baldwin, Joella). (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for extension of time to file answer and Entry of Appearance filed by Michael G Berry on behalf of Administrative County Court of Miller County, Mark Beauchamp, County Court of Miller County, Luke Gatlin, Robert Holtmeyer, Brian Kidwell, Jenna Lawson, Robert Steele, Ben Winfrey. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 7/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attorney Michael G Berry added to party Administrative County Court of Miller County(pty:dft), Attorney Michael G Berry added to party Mark Beauchamp(pty:dft), Attorney Michael G Berry added to party County Court of Miller County(pty:dft), Attorney Michael G Berry added to party Luke Gatlin(pty:dft), Attorney Michael G Berry added to party Robert Holtmeyer(pty:dft), Attorney Michael G Berry added to party Brian Kidwell(pty:dft), Attorney Michael G Berry added to party Jenna Lawson(pty:dft), Attorney Michael G Berry added to party Robert Steele(pty:dft), Attorney Michael G Berry added to party Ben Winfrey(pty:dft))(Berry, Michael) (Entered: 07/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Faith Lindsey. Mark Beauchamp served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; Richard Caine served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; Central Bank Lake of the Ozarks served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; County Court of Miller County served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; Vonda Duncan served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; Jack Funderburk served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; Kathy M. Herx served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; Robert Holtmeyer served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; James Judas served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; Jon A. Kaltenbronn served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; Brian Kidwell served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; Jenna Lawson served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; James W. Mead served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; John R. Porth served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; Robert Steele served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019; Ben Winfrey served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Kidwell, #2 Beauchamp, #3 Lawson, #4 County Court of Miller County, #5 Kaltenbrown, #6 Winfrey, #7 Holtmeyer, #8 Porth, #9 Caine, #10 Funderburk, #11 Mead, #12 Central Bank Lake of the Ozarks, #13 Judas, #14 Herx, #15 Duncan). Docket entry mailed to Faith Lindsey.(Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) RETURN OF SERVICE of complaint executed by Faith Lindsey. Luke Gatlin served on 6/18/2019, answer due 7/9/2019. Docket entry mailed to Faith LindseyC/O 310 Wentworth Street Reidsville, NC 27320. (Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Return of Service unexecuted by Faith Lindsey as to Genise Buechter. Defendant no longer works for Miller County. (Geiser, Angel) Docket entry mailed to Faith Lindsey C/O 310 Wentworth Street Reidsville, NC 27320. (Entered: 06/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED as to Administrative County Court of Miller County, Mark Beauchamp, Genise Buechter, Richard Caine, Central Bank Lake of the Ozarks, County Court of Miller County, Vonda Duncan, Jack Funderburk, Luke Gatlin, Kathy M. Herx, Robert Holtmeyer, James Judas, Jon A. Kaltenbronn, Brian Kidwell, Jenna Lawson, James W. Mead, John R. Porth, Robert Steele & Ben Winfrey and hand delivered with USM 285 forms and copy of complaint to US Marshal's Office for service. (Lock, Tania) Modified on 6/11/2019 to reflect NEF mailed to plaintiff: Faith Lindsey, C/O 310 Wentworth Street, Reidsville, NC 27320(Lock, Tania). (Entered: 06/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of change of address by Faith Lindsey (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 05/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) COMPLAINT against Administrative County Court of Miller County, Mark Beauchamp, Genise Buechter, Richard Caine, Central Bank Lake of the Ozarks, County Court of Miller County, Vonda Duncan, Jack Funderburk, Luke Gatlin, Kathy M. Herx, Rober Holtmeyer, James Judas, Jon A. Kaltenbronn, Brian Kidwell, Jenna Lawson, Linda Lawson, James W. Mead, John R. Porth, Robert Steele, Ben Winfrey Faith Lindsey. Filing fee $0, receipt number IFP. Service due by 8/19/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 06/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER granting #1 motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff shall have twenty (20) days from this date to electronically file the Complaint; The Clerk of Court shall forward appropriate process forms to Plaintiff; Within twenty days, Plaintiff shall return the completed summons and service forms tothe Clerks office showing the address where defendant(s) may be served; andThe Clerk of the Court is directed to issue summons and process and deliver same to the United States Marshal for service upon the defendant(s), pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. Signed on 5/20/19 by District Judge Brian C. Wimes. (Baldwin, Joella) (Entered: 05/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT by Faith Lindsey. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for leave to proceed in forma pauperis filed by Faith Lindsey. Suggestions in opposition/response due by 4/22/2019 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope)(Geiser, Angel) (Entered: 04/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter A. Houser

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Garner Berry

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthew A. Clement

Latest cases represented by Lawyer John T Brooks