This case was last updated from PACER on 02/12/2021 at 11:16:41 (UTC).

Lindman v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., et al

Case Summary

On 12/14/2020 Lindman filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Wells Fargo Bank, N A . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul A. Magnuson and Katherine M. Menendez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:20-CV-02531

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Minnesota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul A. Magnuson

Referral Judge

Katherine M. Menendez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

John Gary Lindman

Defendants

Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.

Equifax Information Services LLC

Macy's Inc.

TD Bank USA, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark L Vavreck

Attorney at Gonko & Vavreck, PLLC

401 N. Third Street, Suite 600

Minneapolis, MN 55401

Thomas J Lyons, Jr

Attorney at Consumer Justice Center P.A.

367 Commerce Court

Vadnais Heights, MN 55127

Defendant Attorneys

Charles F Webber

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

90 S. 7Th St., Ste. 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Jessica Z Savran

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

90 S. 7Th St., Ste. 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Lauren Hoglund

Attorney at Messerli & Kramer P.A.

100 South Fifth Street, Suite 1400

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Terrance J Wagener

Attorney at Messerli & Kramer P.A.

1400 South Fifth Street, 100 South Fifth Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Karla M Vehrs

Attorney at Ballard Spahr LLP

80 S 8Th St,, 2000 Ids Center

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Brian Melendez

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

225 South Sixth Street, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) Amended ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Savran, Jessica) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

23 #1

Consent Form

#23

(#23) ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2021 at 01:00 PM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(KAT) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

#22

(#22) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Savran, Jessica) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#21

(#21) Wells Fargo's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Savran, Jessica) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#20

(#20) ANSWER to Complaint filed by TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Melendez, Brian) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#19

(#19) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Hoglund, Lauren) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#18

(#18) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Macy's Inc.. (Vehrs, Karla) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#17

(#17) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Macy's Inc. (Vehrs, Karla) Modified text on 1/29/2021 (lmb). (Entered: 01/29/2021)

#9

(#10) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Vehrs, Karla) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#8

(#8) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Savran, Jessica) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#7

(#8) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Savran, Jessica) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Karla M Vehrs on behalf of Macy's Inc.. (Vehrs, Karla) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Melendez on behalf of TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Melendez, Brian) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER in re Dispositive Motion Practice. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 12/16/2020.(LLM) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Macy's Inc., TD Bank USA, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (MMP) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#9) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, re extension of time by Macy's Inc.. Jointly Signed by John Gary Lindman and Macy's Inc.. (Vehrs, Karla) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Amended ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Savran, Jessica) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER/NOTICE: Pretrial Conference set for 3/2/2021 at 01:00 PM via Telephone Conference (no courtroom) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Call-in instructions have been emailed to counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(KAT) (Entered: 02/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Savran, Jessica) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Wells Fargo's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Savran, Jessica) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ANSWER to Complaint filed by TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Melendez, Brian) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Equifax Information Services LLC. (Hoglund, Lauren) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant Macy's Inc.. (Vehrs, Karla) (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ANSWER to Complaint filed by Macy's Inc. (Vehrs, Karla) Modified text on 1/29/2021 (lmb). (Entered: 01/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary reported for Defendant TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Melendez, Brian) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR-REFILED AT #16 . RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Melendez, Brian) Modified text on 1/28/2021 (MMG). (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #9 Stipulation. (Vehrs, Karla) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, re extension of time by Macy's Inc.. Jointly Signed by John Gary Lindman and Macy's Inc.. (Vehrs, Karla) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re #7 Stipulation. (Savran, Jessica) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, (Extension of Time) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Jointly Signed by John Gary Lindman. (Savran, Jessica) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Karla M Vehrs on behalf of Macy's Inc.. (Vehrs, Karla) (Entered: 01/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Melendez on behalf of TD Bank USA, N.A.. (Melendez, Brian) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER in re Dispositive Motion Practice. Signed by The Hon. Paul A. Magnuson on 12/16/2020.(LLM) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Equifax Information Services LLC, Macy's Inc., TD Bank USA, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (MMP) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • Docket(#2) TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd 4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 20-cv-2531 (PAM/KMM). (MMP) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Trial Demanded against Equifax Information Services LLC, Macy's Inc., TD Bank USA NA, Wells Fargo Bank NA (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8306703) filed by John Gary Lindman. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lyons, Thomas) (Entered: 12/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MACY'S is a litigant

Latest cases where TD Bank, NA is a litigant

Latest cases where Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Equifax Information Services LLC is a litigant