This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/19/2020 at 07:55:12 (UTC).

Linder v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 11/20/2019 Linder filed a Government Benefit - Social Security lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is Candy W. Dale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00451

  • Filing Date:

    11/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Candy W. Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Suzan Kay Linder

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael David Bybee

Attorney at Milodragovich, Dale & Steinbrenner, P.C.

Po Box 4947, 620 High Park Way

Missoula, MT 59806-4947

Kevin S Kerr

Attorney at Schneider, Kerr & Robichaux

Po Box 14490

Portland, OR 97293

 

Court Documents

#12

RESTRICTED

#11

RESTRICTED

#10

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)

#6

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) PROCEDURAL ORDER SOCIAL SECURITY. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security (Print attached Summons for service.) (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Statement of Social Security Number by Suzan Kay Linder This is a sealed document.. (Kerr, Kevin)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • CORRECTIVE ENTRY - Plaintiff has failed to file a Statement of Social Security. Please submit the form using the event "Statement of Social Security" located under Civil Events/Other Filings/Other Documents. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER approving #2 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Kevin S Kerr for Suzan Kay Linder. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER terminating #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Application filed at Dkt. #3 was missing page 4. The complete Application was refiled at Dkt. #6 . Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (klw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Michael David Bybee appearing for Plaintiff Suzan Kay Linder. Responses due by 12/13/2019 (Bybee, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) PETITION FOR REVIEW - , filed by Suzan Kay Linder. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bybee, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2019
  • (#4) Notice of Reassignment and Case Number Change: Case was opened with incorrect division. Corrected to Central Division and case reassigned to Judge Candy W. Dale. Please use case number 3:19-cv-00451-CWD for all future filings. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Michael David Bybee appearing for Plaintiff Suzan Kay Linder. Responses due by 12/12/2019 (Bybee, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The In Forma Pauperis Application attached as an exhibit to #1 Complaint filed by Suzan Kay Linder was filed incorrectly in this case. It should be filed as a separate docket entry using the "Proceed In Forma Pauperis" event under Civil/Motions and Related Filings/Motions. Please resubmit the filing. (ckh)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Kevin Kerr. ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0976-1972525.)Michael David Bybee appearing for Plaintiff Suzan Kay Linder. Responses due by 12/11/2019 (Bybee, Michael)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Suzan Kay Linder. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Exhibit In Forma Pauperis Application)(Bybee, Michael) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/21/2019 with a version that cannot be edited) (ckh).

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kevin S Kerr

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael David Bybee