This case was last updated from PACER on 02/28/2021 at 10:59:49 (UTC).

Crossland et al v. Huntington Ingalls Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2020 Crossland filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Huntington Ingalls Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Donna Phillips Currault, Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Sarah S. Vance. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03470

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Donna Phillips Currault

Presiding Judges

Mary Ann Vial Lemmon

Sarah S. Vance

 

Party Details

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Cross Claimants

Burmaster Land and Development, LLC

Foster Wheeler, LLC

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Employers Insurance Company of Wausau

Albert L Bossier, Jr

Anco Insulations, Inc.

Zurich American Insurance Company

Pharmacia LLC

Liberty Mutual Insurance Company, as Insurer of Wayne Manufacturing

Underwriters At Lloyds London

Taylor-Seidenbach, Inc.

Century Indemnity Company

The Cajun Company

General Electric Company

Pacific Employers Insurance Company

Chevron U.S.A. Inc.

McCarty Corporation

Eagle Inc.

Bayer CropScience, Inc.

Uniroyal, Inc.

Cross Claimants and Defendants

Huntington Ingalls Incorporated

Albert L Bossier, Jr

Cross Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff, Defendant and Cross Claimant

Albert L Bossier, Jr

3Rd Party Defendants and Cross Defendants

Bayer CropScience, Inc.

Uniroyal, Inc.

63 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Cross Defendant, Cross Claimant and 3Rd Party Plaintiff Attorneys

Roth Martin Hainkel

Attorney at Frilot LLC

1100 Poydras, Suite 3800

New Orleans, LA 70163

John Joseph Hainkel, III

Attorney at Frilot L.L.C.

1100 Poydras St., Suite 3700

New Orleans, LA 70163-3700

David Michael Melancon

Attorney at Irwin Fritchie Urquhart & Moore, LLC (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St., Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70130

Edward T. Hayes

Attorney at Leake & Andersson, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

Lee M. LeBouef

Attorney at Leake & Andersson, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., Suite 1700

New Orleans, LA 70163-1701

James R Logan, IV

Attorney at Logan Law Offices, LLC

650 Poydras Street, Suite 2760

New Orleans, LA 70130

Christopher Kelly Lightfoot

Attorney at Hailey, McNamara, Hall, Larmann & Papale, LLP (Metairie)

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1400, P. O. Box 8288

Metairie, LA 70001-8288

Michael H. Abraham

Attorney at Forman, Watkins & Krutz LLP (New Orleans)

201 St. Charles Ave., Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Louis Oliver Oubre

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

James R. Guidry

Attorney at Simon, Peragine, Smith & Redfearn, LLP (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras St., 30Th Floor

New Orleans, LA 70163-3000

McGready Lewis Richeson

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Francis Xavier deBlanc, III

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Amber L. Stewart

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201

Cross Defendant and 3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

McGready Lewis Richeson

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Francis Xavier deBlanc, III

Attorney at Pugh, Accardo, Haas, Radecker & Carey (New Orleans)

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3300

New Orleans, LA 70163

Amber L. Stewart

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201

Other Attorneys

Samuel Milton Rosamond, III

Attorney at Taylor, Wellons, Politz & Duhe APLC

1515 Poydras St., Ste 1900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Walter G. Watkins, III

Attorney at Forman, Watkins, & Krutz , LLP (Jackson)

City Centre Bldg., 210 East Capitol Street, Suite 2200

Jackson, MS 39201-2375

Kristopher T. Wilson

Attorney at Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard (New Orleans)

60L Poydras St., Suite 2775

New Orleans, LA 70130

Elizabeth Riddell Penn

Attorney at Forman Watkins & Krutz LLP

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 2100

New Orleans, LA 70170

Jeffrey Matthew Burg

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Troy Nathan Bell

Attorney at Courington, Kiefer, Sommers, Marullo & Matherne

616 Girod Street, P.O. Box 2350 (70176)

New Orleans, LA 70130

Quincy L. Mouton

Attorney at NeunerPate (Lafayette)

One Petroleum Center, P. O. Drawer 52828, 1001 W. Pinhook Rd., Suite 200

Lafayette, LA 70503

75 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#46

(#46) ORDER AND REASONS: The Court has received and considered the parties' joint filing under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). The parties are to attend the telephone conference scheduled for 03/04/2021, to select dates for the trial and pretrial conference as stated herein. The dates set forth in the document should be followed. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/26/2021.(mm) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

#44

(#44) Proposed Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by Albert L Bossier, Jr, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Lancaster, Daphne) (Filed per order at rec. doc. 17) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

#41

(#41) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#40

(#40) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(as Insurer of Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.) identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Pipes, H.) Modified text/added Corporate Parents on 2/18/2021 (mm). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

#39

(#39) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Cross Claim of Huntington Ingalls by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (as Insurer of Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.) (Pipes, H.) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

7 #6

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

7 #5

Exhibit Ex 4

7 #4

Exhibit Ex 3

7 #3

Exhibit Ex 2

#7

(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite re #7 Emergency Motion to Remand by Linda Crossland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clark, Matthew) Modified text/link on 1/12/2021 (mp). (Entered: 01/12/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Martin L.C. Feldman recused. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah S. Vance. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 1/4/2021.(cwa) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Wendy B Vitter recused. Case reassigned to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/3/2021.(jeg) (NEF: Sections D and F) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

#4

(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon recused. Case reassigned to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 12/31/2020.(ko) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

#3

(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b)re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Albert L Bossier, Jr, Lamorak Insurance Company. By the Clerk. (bm) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

1 #4

Exhibit

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Exhibit

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER AND REASONS: The Court has received and considered the parties' joint filing under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). The parties are to attend the telephone conference scheduled for 03/04/2021, to select dates for the trial and pretrial conference as stated herein. The dates set forth in the document should be followed. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 2/26/2021.(mm) (Entered: 02/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #44 Proposed Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan. **Document lists counsel of record, Christopher T. Whelen, for a party in this action who has not been enrolled in this matter. Future filings which list attorneys not enrolled will not be accepted. Please file a motion and order to enroll additional counsel.** (mm) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Proposed Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan by Albert L Bossier, Jr, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated (Lancaster, Daphne) (Filed per order at rec. doc. 17) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #40 Statement of Corporate Disclosure. **1. Filing attorney did not enter Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., and Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. as corporate parents at the prompt 'Search for a corporate parent or other affiliate'. Clerk took corrective action. 2. Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault (2).** (mm) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #39 Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal. **Document contains incorrect Magistrate Judge. All future pleadings must reflect Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault (2).** (mm) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by International Paper Company (Penn, Elizabeth) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company(as Insurer of Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.) identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Pipes, H.) Modified text/added Corporate Parents on 2/18/2021 (mm). (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Cross Claim of Huntington Ingalls by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (as Insurer of Reilly-Benton Company, Inc.) (Pipes, H.) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by ViacomCBS Inc identifying Corporate Parent National Amusements, Inc. for ViacomCBS Inc (McCoy, Lacey) (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal Bossier Cross-Claims and 3rd Party Demand With Jury Demand(Paragraph 19) by ViacomCBS Inc.(McCoy, Lacey) Modified text on 2/18/2021. (Entered: 02/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER denying #9 Motion to Expedite. Signed by Judge Sarah S. Vance on 1/13/2021. (mm) (Entered: 01/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION to Expedite re #7 Emergency Motion to Remand by Linda Crossland. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Clark, Matthew) Modified text/link on 1/12/2021 (mp). (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Compliance by Albert L Bossier, Jr, Albert L Bossier, Jr, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Lamorak Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Melancon, David) (Entered: 01/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) EMERGENCY MOTION to Remand by Linda Crossland. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit Ex 1, #3 Exhibit Ex 2, #4 Exhibit Ex 3, #5 Exhibit Ex 4, #6 Notice of Submission)(Clark, Matthew) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Martin L.C. Feldman recused. Case reassigned to Judge Sarah S. Vance. Signed by Judge Martin L.C. Feldman on 1/4/2021.(cwa) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Wendy B Vitter recused. Case reassigned to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 1/3/2021.(jeg) (NEF: Sections D and F) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon recused. Case reassigned to Judge Wendy B Vitter. Signed by Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon on 12/31/2020.(ko) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Directive of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b)re: #1 Notice of Removal, filed by Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Albert L Bossier, Jr, Lamorak Insurance Company. By the Clerk. (bm) (Entered: 12/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • Docket(#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Mary Ann Vial Lemmon and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court, Parish of Orleans, case number 2020-7732 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-8664489) filed by Lamorak Insurance Company, Huntington Ingalls Incorporated, Albert L Bossier, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L Bossier, Jr(pty:3pp), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L Bossier, Jr(pty:crd), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Albert L Bossier, Jr(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney David Michael Melancon added to party Huntington Ingalls Incorporated(pty:crc).(Melancon, David) (Entered: 12/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Burmaster Land and Development, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where The Cajun Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Employers Insurance Company of Wausau is a litigant

Latest cases where Anco Insulation, Inc. is a litigant