This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 08:52:08 (UTC).

Lincoln v. Central Billing LLC d/b/a Pacific Collection Group

Case Summary

On 02/07/2020 Lincoln filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Central Billing LLC d/b/a Pacific Collection Group. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is James Wesley Hendrix. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:20-CV-00012

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Wesley Hendrix

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stanley Lincoln

Defendants

Central Billing LLC d/b/a Pacific Collection Group

Central Billing LLC

Central Billing LLC doing business as Pacific Collection Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jody Berke Burton

Attorney at Lemberg Law LLC

43 Danbury Road, 3Rd Floor

Wilton, CT 06897

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Order: This case is administratively closed for statistical purposes without prejudice to its being reopened to enter a judgment or order of dismissal or for further proceedings if the settlement is not consummated. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 3/13/2020) (pnp) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Stanley Lincoln (Burton, Jody) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Central Billing LLC. Waiver sent on 2/20/2020. (Burton, Jody) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 2/18/2020) (pnp) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

6 #1

Proposed Order

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Stanley Lincoln (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Burton, Jody) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Central Billing LLC. (dsr) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#4

(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (dsr) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Stanley Lincoln. (Burton, Jody) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#2

(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stanley Lincoln. (Burton, Jody) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

1 #1

Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Stanley Lincoln filed by Stanley Lincoln. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10605799) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Burton, Jody) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Order: This case is administratively closed for statistical purposes without prejudice to its being reopened to enter a judgment or order of dismissal or for further proceedings if the settlement is not consummated. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 3/13/2020) (pnp) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Stanley Lincoln (Burton, Jody) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Central Billing LLC. Waiver sent on 2/20/2020. (Burton, Jody) (Entered: 03/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Proceed Without Local Counsel. (Ordered by Judge James Wesley Hendrix on 2/18/2020) (pnp) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Proceed without Local Counsel filed by Stanley Lincoln (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Burton, Jody) (Entered: 02/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Central Billing LLC. (dsr) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (dsr) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to issue Summons filed by Stanley Lincoln. (Burton, Jody) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Stanley Lincoln. (Burton, Jody) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against Stanley Lincoln filed by Stanley Lincoln. (Filing fee $400; Receipt number 0539-10605799) Plaintiff will submit summons(es) for issuance. In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the # Judges Copy Requirements is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here: # Attorney Information - Bar Membership. If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Attachments: #1 Cover Sheet) (Burton, Jody) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CENTRAL BILLING LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jody Berke Burton