This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/22/2020 at 08:26:09 (UTC).

Natalie Linarte v. HB USA Holdings, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 Natalie Linarte filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against HB USA Holdings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shashi H. Kewalramani and Jesus G. Bernal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-09748

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

Presiding Judge

Jesus G. Bernal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Natalie Linarte

Defendants

HB USA Holdings, Inc.

Does 1-10, Inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter J Farnese

Attorney at Beshada Farnese LLP

700 South Flower Street, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Peter J. Farnese

Attorney at Beshada Farnese LLP

700 South Flower Street, Suite 1000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant Attorney

Christopher Chorba

Attorney at Gibson Dunn and Crutcher LLP

333 South Grand Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

 

Court Documents

#14

(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE:HB USA Holdings, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

#13

(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant HB USA Holdings, Inc..(Chorba, Christopher) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Natalie Linarte. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Natalie Linarte. upon HB USA Holdings, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/28/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Christopher Chorba. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

#10

(#10) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:20-cv-01016 JGB(SHKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-09748 JGB(SHKx). Signed by Judge Jesus G. Bernal (rn) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

#8

(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant HB USA Holdings, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#5

(#5) DECLARATION of Peter J. Farnese Regarding Venue Pursuant To California Civil Code Section 1780(d) filed by Plaintiff Natalie Linarte. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Natalie Linarte, (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Natalie Linarte. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Natalie Linarte. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

1 #1

Exhibit A-K

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28682446 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Natalie Linarte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K) (Attorney Peter J Farnese added to party Natalie Linarte(pty:pla))(Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE:HB USA Holdings, Inc.'s Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #13 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant HB USA Holdings, Inc..(Chorba, Christopher) (Entered: 12/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Natalie Linarte. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Natalie Linarte. upon HB USA Holdings, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 10/28/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Christopher Chorba. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 10/30/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:20-cv-01016 JGB(SHKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver and Judge Christina A. Snyder to Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-09748 JGB(SHKx). Signed by Judge Jesus G. Bernal (rn) (Entered: 10/28/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant HB USA Holdings, Inc. (ghap) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Christina A. Snyder and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (ghap) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DECLARATION of Peter J. Farnese Regarding Venue Pursuant To California Civil Code Section 1780(d) filed by Plaintiff Natalie Linarte. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Natalie Linarte, (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Natalie Linarte. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Natalie Linarte. (Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-28682446 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Natalie Linarte. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-K) (Attorney Peter J Farnese added to party Natalie Linarte(pty:pla))(Farnese, Peter) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Peter J Farnese