This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/19/2022 at 07:46:38 (UTC).

Lilly v. Sandviks, Inc,

Case Summary

On 05/20/2022 Lilly filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Sandviks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Terrence G. Berg and Kimberly G. Altman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-11104

  • Filing Date:

    05/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence G. Berg

Referral Judge

Kimberly G. Altman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Teagan Lilly

Defendant

Sandviks, Inc,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Frank S. Hedin

Attorney at Hedin Hall LLP

1395 Brickell Ave, Suite 900

Miami, FL 33131

Gregory A. Mitchell

Attorney at The Miller Law Firm, P.C.

950 W. University Drive, Suite 300

Rochester, MI 48307

Philip L. Fraietta

Attorney at Bursor & Fisher, P.A.

888 Seventh Avenue

New York, NY 10019

Sharon S. Almonrode

Attorney at The Miller Law Firm, P.C.

950 West University Drive, Suite 300

Rochester, MI 48307

E. Powell Miller

Attorney at The Miller Law Firm

950 W. University Drive, Suite 300

Rochester, MI 48307

Defendant Attorney

Michael G. Brady

Attorney at Warner Norcross & Judd LLP

2715 Woodward Avenue, Ste. 300

Detroit, MI 48201-3030

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Teagan Lilly. Response due by 9/16/2022 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

1 #17

Exhibit Q- Californias Reader Privacy Act Signed into Law, Electronic Frontier F

1 #16

Exhibit P- Hann, et al., The Value of Online Information Privacy: An Empirical I

1 #15

Exhibit O- Tsai, Cranor, Acquisti, and Egelman, The Effect of Online Privacy Inf

1 #14

Exhibit N- Joshua Brustein, Start-Ups Seek to Help Users Put a Price on Their Pe

1 #13

Exhibit M- 2014 TRUSTe US Consumer Confidence Privacy Report, TRUSTe

1 #12

Exhibit L- Fraud Against Seniors: Hearing before the Senate Special Committee o

1 #11

Exhibit K- Charles Duhigg, Bilking the Elderly, With a Corporate Assist, N.Y. Ti

1 #10

Exhibit J- Prize Scams, Federal Trade Commission

1 #9

Exhibit I- Bipartisan Group of Lawmakers Query Data Brokers About Practices Invo

1 #8

Exhibit H- Letter from Senator John D. Rockefeller IV, Chairman, Senate Committe

1 #7

Exhibit G- Natasha Singer, You for Sale: Mapping, and Sharing, the Consumer Geno

1 #6

Exhibit F- Martha C. White, Big Data Knows What Youre Doing Right Now, TIME.com

1 #5

Exhibit E- Statement of FTC Commissioner Pamela Jones Harbour (Dec. 7, 2009)

1 #3

Exhibit C- The Information Marketplace: Merging and Exchanging Consumer Data (M

1 #2

Exhibit B- Privacy: Sales, Rentals of Videos, etc., House Legislative Analysis S

1 #1

Exhibit A-Early Moments Book Club Enhanced Masterfile Mailing List

1 #1

Main Document

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Teagan Lilly. Response due by 9/16/2022 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) STIPULATION AND ORDER to Extend Time to Respond re #1 Complaint, filed by Teagan Lilly. Response due by 7/18/2022 Signed by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketTEXT-ONLY ORDER Striking #9 Stipulation filed by Sandviks, Inc. Parties are directed to submit the stipulation and proposed order in one Word document via the Proposed Orders link in CM/ECF. Parties should not file their own stipulation on the docket. See, R11 of the Electronic Filing Policies and Procedures for the EDMI, available as an Appendix to this District's Local Rules. Issued by District Judge Terrence G. Berg. (AChu) (Entered: 06/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) [STRICKEN] STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT SANDVIKS, INC. TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Sandviks, Inc, (Brady, Michael) Modified on 6/27/2022 (AChu). (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael G. Brady on behalf of Sandviks, Inc,. (Brady, Michael) (Entered: 06/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip L. Fraietta on behalf of Teagan Lilly. (Fraietta, Philip) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Sandviks, Inc, served on 5/26/2022, answer due 6/16/2022. (Miller, E.) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Frank S. Hedin on behalf of Teagan Lilly. (Hedin, Frank) (Entered: 05/29/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Gregory A. Mitchell appearing on behalf of Teagan Lilly (Mitchell, Gregory) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sharon S. Almonrode appearing on behalf of Teagan Lilly (Almonrode, Sharon) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (LHos) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Sandviks, Inc,* (LHos) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Teagan Lilly against Sandviks, Inc, with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8919541 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne County - County Where Action Arose: Wayne County - County of 1st Defendant: Out of State. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Early Moments Book Club Enhanced Masterfile Mailing List, #2 Exhibit B- Privacy: Sales, Rentals of Videos, etc., House Legislative Analysis Section, H.B. No. 5331, Jan. 20, 1989, #3 Exhibit C- The Information Marketplace: Merging and Exchanging Consumer Data (Mar. 13, 2001), #4 Exhibit D- Webs Hot New Commodity: Privacy, WSJ (Feb. 28, 2011), #5 Exhibit E- Statement of FTC Commissioner Pamela Jones Harbour (Dec. 7, 2009), #6 Exhibit F- Martha C. White, Big Data Knows What Youre Doing Right Now, TIME.com (July 31, 2012), #7 Exhibit G- Natasha Singer, You for Sale: Mapping, and Sharing, the Consumer Genome, N.Y. Times (June 16, 2012), #8 Exhibit H- Letter from Senator John D. Rockefeller IV, Chairman, Senate Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation, to Scott E. Howe, Chief Executive Officer, Acxiom (Oct. 9, 2012), #9 Exhibit I- Bipartisan Group of Lawmakers Query Data Brokers About Practices Involving Consumers Personal Information, Website of Senator Ed Markey (July 24, 2012), #10 Exhibit J- Prize Scams, Federal Trade Commission, #11 Exhibit K- Charles Duhigg, Bilking the Elderly, With a Corporate Assist, N.Y. Times, May 20, 2007, #12 Exhibit L- Fraud Against Seniors: Hearing before the Senate Special Committee on Aging (August 10, 2000), #13 Exhibit M- 2014 TRUSTe US Consumer Confidence Privacy Report, TRUSTe, #14 Exhibit N- Joshua Brustein, Start-Ups Seek to Help Users Put a Price on Their Personal Data, N.Y. Times (Feb. 12, 2012), #15 Exhibit O- Tsai, Cranor, Acquisti, and Egelman, The Effect of Online Privacy Information on Purchasing Behavior, 22(2) Information Systems Research 254, 254 (2011), #16 Exhibit P- Hann, et al., The Value of Online Information Privacy: An Empirical Investigation (Oct. 2003), #17 Exhibit Q- Californias Reader Privacy Act Signed into Law, Electronic Frontier Foundation (Oct. 3, 2011)) (Miller, E.) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael G. Brady