This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:39:10 (UTC).

Lillibridge v. Tejada et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Lillibridge filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Tejada. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Helen C. Adams and Stephanie M. Rose. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00390

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Southern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Helen C. Adams

Presiding Judge

Stephanie M. Rose

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Holli Lillibridge

Defendants

Brian Batterson

Juan Tejada

City of Marshalltown

Michael Tupper

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jennifer J. Frese

Attorney at KAPLAN & FRESE LLP

111 E. Church Street

Marshalltown, IA 50158

Chad R Frese

Attorney at KAPLAN & FRESE LLP

111 E. Church Street

Marshalltown, IA 50158

Defendant Attorneys

Benjamin Russell Erickson

Attorney at BRADSHAW FOWLER PROCTOR & FAIRGRAVE, P.C.

801 Grand Ave, Suite 3700

Des Moines, IA 50309

Jason C Palmer

Attorney at BRADSHAW FOWLER PROCTOR & FAIRGRAVE, P.C.

801 Grand Ave, Suite 3700

Des Moines, IA 50309

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Russell Erickson on behalf of Brian Batterson, City of Marshalltown, Juan Tejada, Michael Tupper (Erickson, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C Palmer on behalf of Brian Batterson, City of Marshalltown, Juan Tejada, Michael Tupper (Palmer, Jason) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Holli Lillibridge Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3995019., filed by Holli Lillibridge. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 3/3/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frese, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin Russell Erickson on behalf of Brian Batterson, City of Marshalltown, Juan Tejada, Michael Tupper (Erickson, Benjamin) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason C Palmer on behalf of Brian Batterson, City of Marshalltown, Juan Tejada, Michael Tupper (Palmer, Jason) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure. (slg) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Holli Lillibridge Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0863-3995019., filed by Holli Lillibridge. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 3/3/2020. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 3/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Frese, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.