This case was last updated from PACER on 03/13/2020 at 07:32:24 (UTC).

Lik v Doe

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 Lik filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Doe. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Donna M. Ryu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-00255

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donna M. Ryu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Peter Lik

Defendant

John Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William J. Goines

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP

1900 University Avenue, 5Th Floor

East Palo Alto, CA 94303

Mark George Tratos

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

10845 Griffith Peak Drive, Suite 600

Las Vegas, NV 89135

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Doe. Filed by Peter Lik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Goines, William) (Filed on 2/5/2020) Modified on 2/6/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/05/2020)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

#4

(#4) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding copyright infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

8 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #3

Summons

#10

(#10) Refund Status re #9 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#9

(#9) Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14063314 by Peter Lik. (Goines, William) (Filed on 2/6/2020) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#7

(#7) Refund Status re #6 Application for Refund DECLINED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2020) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#6

(#6) Application for Refund re #1 Complaint,, Receipt Number Case No. 20-254 by Peter Lik. (Goines, William) (Filed on 1/29/2020) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14063398.). Filed by Peter Lik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Goines, William) (Filed on 1/13/2020) Modified on 1/13/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/14/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#5

(#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Peter Lik.. (Goines, William) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#3

(#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Refund Status re #9 Application for Refund Approved. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-14063314 by Peter Lik. (Goines, William) (Filed on 2/6/2020) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Doe. Filed by Peter Lik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Goines, William) (Filed on 2/5/2020) Modified on 2/6/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Refund Status re #6 Application for Refund DECLINED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2020) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Application for Refund re #1 Complaint,, Receipt Number Case No. 20-254 by Peter Lik. (Goines, William) (Filed on 1/29/2020) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Peter Lik.. (Goines, William) (Filed on 1/27/2020) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding copyright infringement (cc: form mailed to register). (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 4/8/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/15/2020 01:30 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 4, 3rd Floor. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2020) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • #Electronic filing error. The Clerk's office will not issue blank Summons. This filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Peter Lik (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Donna M. Ryu. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 1/27/2020. (haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2020) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against John Doe ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-14063398.). Filed by Peter Lik. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Goines, William) (Filed on 1/13/2020) Modified on 1/13/2020 (amgS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/14/2020 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.