This case was last updated from PACER on 02/04/2020 at 08:24:22 (UTC).

Lightner-Peppard v. Performant Recovery, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/06/2019 Lightner-Peppard filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Performant Recovery, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly C Priest Johnson and Sean D. Jordan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00900

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kimberly C Priest Johnson

Presiding Judge

Sean D. Jordan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Deborah Lightner-Peppard

Defendant

Performant Recovery, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd

2500 South Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Nathan Charles Volheim

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd

2500 South Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

Eric Donald Coleman

Attorney at Sulaiman Law Group, Ltd

2500 South Highland Avenue, Suite 200

Lombard, IL 60148

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis on behalf of Deborah Lightner-Peppard (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Charles Volheim on behalf of Deborah Lightner-Peppard (Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#5

(#5) REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Judge Kimberly Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 1/6/2020. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deborah Lightner-Peppard. Performant Recovery, Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Performant Recovery, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7560579.), filed by Deborah Lightner-Peppard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REFERRAL ORDER. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and Local Rule CV-72, the undersigned hereby REFERS the cases set forth below to U. S. Magistrate Judge Kimberly Priest Johnson for all pretrial proceedings. Signed by District Judge Sean D. Jordan on 1/6/2020. (baf, ) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Deborah Lightner-Peppard. Performant Recovery, Inc. waiver sent on 12/10/2019, answer due 2/10/2020. (Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to District Judge Sean D. Jordan. (baf, ) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Taxiarchis Hatzidimitriadis on behalf of Deborah Lightner-Peppard (Hatzidimitriadis, Taxiarchis) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Charles Volheim on behalf of Deborah Lightner-Peppard (Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Performant Recovery, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-7560579.), filed by Deborah Lightner-Peppard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Volheim, Nathan) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less