Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 04:09:44 (UTC).

LIGHTING SCIENCE GROUP CORPORATION et al v. LEEDARSON LIGHTING CO., LTD. et al

Case Summary

On 10/07/2019 LIGHTING SCIENCE GROUP CORPORATION filed an Other lawsuit against LEEDARSON LIGHTING CO , LTD. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Carl J. Nichols. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-MC-00169

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Carl J. Nichols

 

Party Details

Respondents

OSRAM GMBH

OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH

MLS CO., LTD.

SIGNIFY NORTH AMERICA CORPORATION

ACUITY BRANDS LIGHTING, INC.

CURRENT LIGHTING SOLUTIONS, LLC

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY AND CONSUMER LIGHTING (U.S.), LLC

SIGNIFY N.V.

OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS, INC.

LUMILEDS HOLDING B.V.

OSRAM LICHT AG

NICHIA AMERICA CORPORATION

LEDVANCE GMBH

LEDVANCE LLC

ACUITY BRANDS, INC.

LEEDARSON AMERICA, INC.

LEEDARSON LIGHTING CO., LTD.

Not Classified By Court

GLOBAL VALUE LIGHTING, LLC

HEALTHE INC.

LIGHTING SCIENCE GROUP CORPORATION

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court Attorney

Kandis Chere Gibson

Attorney at FOSTER, MURPHY, ALTMAN & NICKEL, PC

1150 18Th Street, Nw, Suite 775

Washington, DC 20036

 

Court Documents

#2

(#2) ORDER granting #1 application to permit the taking of depositions as to Noboru Tanaka, Takahiro Amo, Masaki Hayashi, and Tomohide Miki. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 18, 2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

#1

(#1) MOTION for the Issuance of a Deposition Order/Commission upon recommendation of the U.S. International Trade Commission by GLOBAL VALUE LIGHTING, LLC, HEALTHE INC., LIGHTING SCIENCE GROUP CORPORATION (jf) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER granting #1 application to permit the taking of depositions as to Noboru Tanaka, Takahiro Amo, Masaki Hayashi, and Tomohide Miki. See Order for additional details. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on October 18, 2019. (zcdw) (Entered: 10/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • Filing fee received: $ 47.00, receipt number: 4616100934. (jf) (Entered: 10/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for the Issuance of a Deposition Order/Commission upon recommendation of the U.S. International Trade Commission by GLOBAL VALUE LIGHTING, LLC, HEALTHE INC., LIGHTING SCIENCE GROUP CORPORATION (jf) (Entered: 10/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MLS Co., Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Global Value Lighting, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Current Lighting Solutions LLC d/b/a GE Current, A Daintree Company doing business as GE Current is a litigant

Latest cases where Ledvance, LLC is a litigant